Morse v. San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District et al
Plaintiff: David Morse
Defendant: Dan Hartwig and San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District
Case Number: 3:2012cv05289
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Proposed Verdict Form. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Proposed Jury Instructions (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REFRESHMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/16/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Request for Authorization to Bring Equipment into the Courtroom filed by David Morse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/10/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Summary Judgment (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 62 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 59 Request to Amend Briefing Schedule Re: Motion for Summary Judgment(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) Granting Defendants' request for Deputy Chief Hartwig to be excused from personal appearance at the Settlement Conference re 48 Letter filed by San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District, Dan Hartwig, 49 Letter filed by San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District, Dan Hartwig. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/17/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REGARDING MODIFICATION OF CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/4/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 Letter requesting for telephone appearance filed by David Morse. Signed by Magsitrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/8/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Stipulated Protective Order filed by San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District and Dan Hartwig. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/4/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER EXCUSING DEFENDANT HARTWIG FROM PERSONAL ATTENDANCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/29/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/11/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morse v. San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Hartwig
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Morse
Represented By: Michael John Weills Siegel
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?