Avalos v. University of San Francisco, School of Nursing & Health Professions (USF) et al
Plaintiff: Lily V. Avalos
Defendant: University of San Francisco, School of Nursing & Health Professions (USF), Patricia Lynch, Mary Seed, Joan Mersch and Standford Hospital & Clinics
Case Number: 3:2012cv05290
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/29/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/19/2013 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 9/16/2013.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/31/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 19 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case referred to mediation. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2014 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 10/20/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 10/20/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/17/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avalos v. University of San Francisco, School of Nursing & Health Professions (USF) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lily V. Avalos
Represented By: Jean Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of San Francisco, School of Nursing & Health Professions (USF)
Represented By: Michael Joseph Vartain
Represented By: Linda K. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lynch
Represented By: Michael Joseph Vartain
Represented By: Linda K. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Seed
Represented By: Michael Joseph Vartain
Represented By: Linda K. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Mersch
Represented By: Michael Joseph Vartain
Represented By: Linda K. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standford Hospital & Clinics
Represented By: Michael Joseph Vartain
Represented By: Linda K. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?