Shah v. Veterans Administration et al

Plaintiff: Fernando Shah
Defendant: Veterans Administration and Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2012cv05293
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Veteran Ben.
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 3 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and Dismissing Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
September 30, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
October 30, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/30/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012) Modified on 10/30/2012 (bpf, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shah v. Veterans Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.