Hadera v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Gebremedhin Hadera
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2012cv05315
Filed: October 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/30/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 17 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 for an Extension of Time filed by Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hadera v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gebremedhin Hadera
Represented By: Steven M. Chabre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?