Rodarte v. Spearman
Plaintiff: Gustavo Rodarte
Defendant: M. E. Spearman
Case Number: 3:2012cv05340
Filed: October 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME. Responses due by 5/28/2013. Replies due by NO LATER THAN 6/11/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/7/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013) Modified on 4/1/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Habeas Answer due by 5/28/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/26/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PAY FILING FEE; DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodarte v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Rodarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. E. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?