Tall et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (MERS) et al
Plaintiff: Brian Tall and Joanne Olivas
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (MERS), Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, American Home Mortgage Assets Trust 2006-5 and American Home Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv05348
Filed: October 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting 20 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 25 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Hon. William Alsup denying 8 Motion for TRO.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TRO re 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Brian Tall, Joanne Olivas (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tall et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (MERS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Tall
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Peabody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Olivas
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Peabody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Assets Trust 2006-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?