Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. et al v. Blank et al
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., The Humane Society of the United States, Cetacean Society International, League for Coastal Protection, Ocean Futures Society, Jean-Michel Cousteau and Michael Stocker
Defendant: Rebecca Blank, National Marine Fisheries Service, Sam Rauch, Jane Lubchenco, Department of the Navy and Jonathan Greenert
Case Number: 3:2012cv05380
Filed: October 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motions terminated as moot: 65 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Sam Rauch, Rebecca Blank, Jonathan Greenert, National Marine Fisheries Service, Department of the Navy, Jane Lubchenco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/28/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 38 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/8/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 6/26/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REGARDING EXTRA-RECORD EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 6/5/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM THE ADR MILTI-OPTION PROGRAM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 12/10/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc. et al v. Blank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Joel Robert Reynolds
Represented By: Stephen Zak Smith
Represented By: Rachel Justine Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Joel Robert Reynolds
Represented By: Stephen Zak Smith
Represented By: Rachel Justine Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cetacean Society International
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Joel Robert Reynolds
Represented By: Stephen Zak Smith
Represented By: Rachel Justine Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League for Coastal Protection
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Joel Robert Reynolds
Represented By: Stephen Zak Smith
Represented By: Rachel Justine Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocean Futures Society
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Joel Robert Reynolds
Represented By: Stephen Zak Smith
Represented By: Rachel Justine Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean-Michel Cousteau
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Joel Robert Reynolds
Represented By: Stephen Zak Smith
Represented By: Rachel Justine Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stocker
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Joel Robert Reynolds
Represented By: Stephen Zak Smith
Represented By: Rachel Justine Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Blank
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Michael D. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Michael D. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Rauch
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Michael D. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Lubchenco
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Michael D. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Navy
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Michael D. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Greenert
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Michael D. Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?