Beauty Weapons, LLC et al v. Gennaro et al
Plaintiff: Beauty Weapons, LLC, Sabrina Denebeim and Veronica Bryan
Defendant: DOES 1 TO 20 and John Gennaro
Case Number: 3:2012cv05383
Filed: October 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/22/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT's STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 1, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION 21 TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 15, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 30, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Plaintiffs are ordered to immediately submit a chambers copy of the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 23, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 14, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 **Filed in wrong case. Please disregard.**
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beauty Weapons, LLC et al v. Gennaro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 TO 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gennaro
Represented By: Stephen L. Davis
Represented By: Mark R. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beauty Weapons, LLC
Represented By: Mark Russell Meyer
Represented By: Joseph Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Denebeim
Represented By: Mark Russell Meyer
Represented By: Joseph Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Bryan
Represented By: Mark Russell Meyer
Represented By: Joseph Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?