Life Long Driver, LLC v. The American Automobile Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Life Long Driver, LLC
Defendant: The American Automobile Association, Inc. and AAA Foundation for Traffic Safety
Case Number: 3:2012cv05429
Filed: October 19, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Report due by 3/4/2014. Status Conference set for 3/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 2/10/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MODIFIED STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Mediation and to Adjust Claim Construction Briefing and Hearing Schedule filed by Life Long Driver, LLC, The American Automobile Association, Inc., AAA Foundation for Traffic Safety. The deadline to complete mediation is 9/6/2013. Claims Construction Hearing set for 1/24/2014 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/25/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MODIFIED STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION re 22 Clerks Notice, to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference filed by The American Automobile Association, Inc., AAA Foundation for Traffic Safety. Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 3/25/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Life Long Driver, LLC v. The American Automobile Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Long Driver, LLC
Represented By: Warren James Krauss
Represented By: Robert Michael Harkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Automobile Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Foundation for Traffic Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?