Jackson v. Athem Blue Cross of California et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jackson
Defendant: Athem Blue Cross of California and Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv05471
Filed: October 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE filed by Kimberly Jackson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 16, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 22 NOTICE by Kimberly Jackson of Settlement. Dismissal or Status Report due by 7/26/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 14, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 14 . Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/15/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION re 12 . Further Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/5/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation 10 . Initial Case Management Conference continued to 2/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/11/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Athem Blue Cross of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jackson
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Represented By: Corinne Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athem Blue Cross of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?