Seifi et al v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Majeed Seifi and Tracey Deakin
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv05493
Filed: October 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/17/2015. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER denying 189 Motion to Intervene and Change Venue. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/29/2015. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 142 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Motion for Final Approval due 08/03/2015. Fairness Hearing set for 08/17/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER re: 142 motion for class action settlement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/25/2015. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION AND ORDER WITHDRAWING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 107 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/17/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER Rescheduling Hearing Date as to 107 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/24/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying 131 Plaintiffs' motion for relief from nondispositive pretrial order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/07/2015. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 113 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 117 Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 92 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 93 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 94 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 95 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 104 Discovery Letter Brief. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal without prejudice. Renewed Administrative Motion or Joint Stipulation due 12/10/2014. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/09/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting Exparte Request to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/30/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and to Strike Certain Allegations filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/09/13. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying briefing and hearing schedule on 49 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/28/2013. Replies due by 9/16/2013. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/15/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Dates re 43 . Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/04/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss and denying motion to strike class allegations. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 12 Motion to Transfer Case. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Briefing Deadlines and Hearing on Motion to Transfer Venue and to Postpone Case Management Conference. 12 Motion to Transfer Venue: Responses due by 2/25/2013; Replies due by 3/11/2013; Motion Hearing set for 4/1 /2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/07/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Vacating briefing and hearing schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Dates. Case Management Statement due by 4/22/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/03/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seifi et al v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Majeed Seifi
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Roy A. Katriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Deakin
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Roy A. Katriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?