Verinata Health, Inc. et al v. Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Verinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University and Illumina, Inc.
Defendant: Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings and Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05501
Filed: October 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 787 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 5/28/2021 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 786 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #785 Stipulation of Dismissal.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 785 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Joint Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 784 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING HEARING TO ZOOM. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2021 at 11:30 AM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 25, 2021 at 2:00 p.m..Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2021 11:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021) .
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 783 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 782 NOTICE by Illumina, Inc.(14-1921), Verinata Health, Inc. [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Christopher S. Lavin] (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 781 ORDER GRANTING re #780 Stipulation Request to Defer Ruling AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2021 at 03:00 PM - Telephonic Only.This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 5862990The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2021 03:00 PM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/14/2021. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 780 STIPULATION and Further Request to Defer Ruling filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 779 STIPULATION and Further Request to Defer Ruling filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 778 Order granting SIXTH Stipulation and Additional Request to Defer Ruling #777 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/9/21. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 777 STIPULATION and Joint Additional Request to Defer Ruling filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 776 Order granting FIFTH Stipulation and Additional Request to Defer Ruling #775 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/25/21. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 775 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION AND ADDITIONAL REQUEST TO DEFER RULING filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ORDER Granting FOURTH #773 STIPULATION and Joint Additional Request to Defer Ruling. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/12/2021. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 773 STIPULATION and Joint Additional Request to Defer Ruling filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 772 ORDER Granting THIRD #771 Stipulation and Additional Request to Defer Ruling on Motions for Pre Verdict and Post-Verdict Damages. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/10/2021. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 771 STIPULATION and Joint Additional Request to Defer Ruling on Motions for Pre-Verdict and Post-Verdict Damages filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 770 ORDER Granting re (769 in 3:12-cv-05501-SI) Stipulation and Joint Further Request to Defer Ruling on Motions for Pre-Verdict and Post-Verdict Damages filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/25/2021. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 769 STIPULATION and Joint Further Request to Defer Ruling on Motions for Pre-Verdict and Post-Verdict Damages filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 768 STIPULATION and Joint Request to Defer Ruling Regarding Motions for Pre-Verdict and Post-Verdict Damages filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 767 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2020 via Zoom webinar re #742 MOTION filed by Verinata Health, Inc., Illumina, Inc., #744 MOTION filed by Verinata Health, Inc., Illumina, Inc. Total Time in Court: 55 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2020)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 766 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Payne (Payne, Stephen) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 765 Declaration of Lisa S. Glasser in Support of #763 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Illumina's Sur, Sur-Reply In Support Of Its Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties] filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #763 ) (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 11/27/2020)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 764 REPLY (re #744 MOTION ) [Redacted Version of Illumina's Sur, Sur-Reply In Support Of Its Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties] filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 763 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Illumina's Sur, Sur-Reply In Support Of Its Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties] filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Lavin, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version Illumina's Sur, Sur-Reply In Support Of Its Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties, #4 Unredacted Version Illumina's Sur, Sur-Reply In Support Of Its Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 762 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion for Order Of Accounting, And For Awards Of Supplemental Damages, And Pre- And Post- Judgment Interest - #662 #742 #744 Hearing set for 12/18/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.u scourts.gov/si Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than December 11, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.ca nd.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (Related documents(s) #742 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 761 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting #760 Administrative Motion Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Plaintiff, if it chooses, has until 11/25/2020 at 2:00 PM PST to file a sur-sur reply.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Support of Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Motion for Post-Verdict Damages re #744 MOTION filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Responses due by 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Ariosa's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Illumina's Untimely Motion for Post-Verdict Damages Based on Alleged Lost Revenues, #2 Declaration of Stephen M. Payne in Support of Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply, #3 Proposed Order)(Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 759 Declaration of Lisa S. Glasser in Support of #757 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Illuminas Reply In Support Of Its Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #757 ) (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 758 REPLY (re #744 MOTION ) Redacted Version of Illuminas Reply In Support Of Its Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 757 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Illuminas Reply In Support Of Its Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Lavin, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Illuminas Reply In Support Of Its Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties, #4 Unredacted Version of Illuminas Reply In Support Of Its Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 756 REPLY (re #742 MOTION ) [Illuminas Reply In Support Of Its Renewed Motion For Award Of Pre-Verdict Supplemental Damages] filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 755 Declaration of Christopher S. Lavin in Support of #754 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Untimely Motion for Post-Verdict Damages Based on Alleged Lost Revenues and (2) Exhibit C filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Related document(s) #754 ) (Lavin, Christopher) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #744 MOTION, #742 MOTION, Replies due by 11/13/2020. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 754 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Untimely Motion for Post-Verdict Damages Based on Alleged Lost Revenues and (2) Exhibit C filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa S. Glasser in Support of Ariosa's Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Untimely Motion for Post-Verdict Damages Based on Alleged Lost Revenues, #4 Unredacted Version of Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Untimely Motion for Post-Verdict Damages Based on Alleged Lost Revenues, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 753 Declaration of Lisa S. Glasser in Support of #752 Brief, #751 Brief Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Renewed Motion for Pre-Verdict Supplemental Damages and Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Untimely Motion for Post-Verdict Damages Based on Alleged Lost Revenues filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (Redacted Version))(Related document(s) #752 , #751 ) (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 752 Brief re #744 Renotice motion hearing,, Redacted Version of Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Untimely Motion for Post-Verdict Damages Based on Alleged Lost Revenues filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #744 ) (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 751 Brief re #742 Renotice motion hearing, Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Renewed Motion for Pre-Verdict Supplemental Damages filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #742 ) (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 750 Declaration of Lisa S. Glasser in Support of #743 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Illumina's Notice Of Renewed Motion And Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties] filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #743 ) (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 749 Declaration of Lisa Glasser in Support of #746 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Joint Discovery Letter Regarding Ariosa's New Alleged Design Around] dated 10/12/2020 filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #746 ) (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 748 NOTICE by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. [Notice Of Withdrawal of Attorneys Christopher J. Cox and Hannah L. Jones] (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 747 Joint Discovery Letter Brief [Joint Discovery Letter Regarding Ariosa's New Alleged Design Around] filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 746 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Joint Discovery Letter Regarding Ariosa's New Alleged Design Around] filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Lavin, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Discovery Letter Regarding Ariosa's New Alleged Design Around, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Discovery Letter Regarding Ariosa's New Alleged Design Around, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 745 Declaration of Christopher S. Lavin in Support of #744 Re-notice of Motion Hearing [Illumina, Inc.'s Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties] filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #4 Exhibit 4 - Redacted, #5 Exhibit 5 - Redacted, #6 Exhibit 6 - Redacted, #7 Exhibit 7 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit 8 - Redacted, #9 Exhibit 9 - Redacted, #10 Exhibit 10 - Redacted, #11 Exhibit 11 - Redacted, #12 Exhibit 12 - Redacted, #13 Exhibit 13 - Redacted, #14 Exhibit 14 - Redacted, #15 Exhibit 15 - Redacted, #16 Exhibit 16 - Redacted, #17 Exhibit 17 - Redacted, #18 Exhibit 18 - Redacted, #19 Exhibit 19 - Redacted, #20 Exhibit 20 - Redacted, #21 Exhibit 21 - Redacted, #22 Exhibit 22 - Redacted, #23 Exhibit 23 - Redacted, #24 Exhibit 24 - Redacted, #25 Exhibit 25 - Redacted, #26 Exhibit 26 - Redacted, #27 Exhibit 27 - Redacted, #28 Exhibit 28 - Redacted, #29 Exhibit 29 - Redacted)(Related document(s) #744 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 744 Renewed Motion re #662 MOTION for Order Of Accounting, And For Awards Of Supplemental Damages, And Pre- And Post- Judgment Interest - [Redacted Version of Illumina's Notice Of Renewed Motion And Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties] filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Declaration Of James E. Malackowski In Support Of Plaintiff Illumina, Inc.'s Renewed Motion For Post-Verdict Royalties, #2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #662 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/9/2020) Modified on 11/2/2020 (tmiS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 743 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Illumina's Notice Of Renewed Motion And Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties] filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Lavin, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Illumina's Notice Of Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties, #4 Unredacted Version of Illumina's Notice Of Renewed Motion For Supplemental Damages And Accounting For Post-Verdict Royalties, #5 Redacted Version of Declaration Of James E. Malackowski In Support Of Plaintiff Illumina, Inc.'s Renewed Motion For Post-Verdict Royalties, #6 Unredacted Version of Declaration Of James E. Malackowski In Support Of Plaintiff Illumina, Inc.'s Renewed Motion For Post-Verdict Royalties, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit 6, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #17 Redacted Version of Exhibit 7, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #19 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #21 Redacted Version of Exhibit 9, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #23 Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, #24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #25 Redacted Version of Exhibit 11, #26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, #27 Redacted Version of Exhibit 12, #28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, #29 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13, #30 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, #31 Redacted Version of Exhibit 14, #32 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #33 Redacted Version of Exhibit 15, #34 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #35 Redacted Version of Exhibit 16, #36 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #37 Redacted Version of Exhibit 17, #38 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #39 Redacted Version of Exhibit 18, #40 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #41 Redacted Version of Exhibit 19, #42 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #43 Redacted Version of Exhibit 20, #44 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, #45 Redacted Version of Exhibit 21, #46 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21, #47 Redacted Version of Exhibit 22, #48 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, #49 Redacted Version of Exhibit 23, #50 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 23, #51 Redacted Version of Exhibit 24, #52 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24, #53 Redacted Version of Exhibit 25, #54 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 25, #55 Redacted Version of Exhibit 26, #56 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, #57 Redacted Version of Exhibit 27, #58 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27, #59 Redacted Version of Exhibit 28, #60 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 28, #61 Redacted Version of Exhibit 29, #62 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, #63 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 742 Renewed Motion re #662 MOTION for Order Of Accounting, And For Awards Of Supplemental Damages, And Pre- And Post- Judgment Interest - [Illumina's Notice Of Renewed Motion And Renewed Motion For Award Of Pre-Verdict Supplemental Damages; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities] filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #662 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/9/2020) Modified on 11/2/2020 (tmiS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 741 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/11/2020. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston.Total Time in Court: 27 minutes. Court Reporter: Not recorded or reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Derek Walter, Edward Reines. Defendant Attorney: Lisa Glasser. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/15/2020)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 740 CLERK'S NOTICE Advancing Telephonic Further Case Management Conference. Telephonic Further Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2020 at 02:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 5862990The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2020 02:00 PM. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 739 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Joint Further Case Management Conference Statement] filed by Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 738 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Further Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2020 at 03:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 5862990The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2020 03:00 PM. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 737 NOTICE by Verinata Health, Inc. [Request For Subsequent Case Management Conference] (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 736 MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to Federal Circuit case nos. 2018-2198, 2018-2303, 2018-2305, 2018-2306, 2018-2307). (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 735 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to Federal Circuit case nos. 2018-2198, 2018-2303, 2018-2305, 2018-2306, 2018-2307. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 734 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Casey May Curran (Curran, Casey) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 733 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Molly Jean Russell Notice of Withdrawal of Molly J. Russell (Russell, Molly) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 732 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Lisa Sharrock Glasser Notice of Withdrawal of Sandra L. Haberny (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 731 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Lisa Sharrock Glasser Notice of Withdrawal of David I. Gindler (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 730 USCA for the Federal Circuit JUDGMENT as to Federal Circuit case nos. 2018-2198, 2018-2303, 2018-2305, 2018-2306, 2018-2317. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 729 USCA for the Federal Circuit Opinion as to Federal Circuit case nos. 2018-2198, 2018-2303, 2018-2305, 2018-2306, 2018-2307. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 728 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to #727 Amended Notice of Appeal, by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Filing fee (not paid). Appeal Record due by 11/28/2018. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/29/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 727 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. as to #721 Order, #705 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,, Order on Motion for New Trial,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings,,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, . Appeal Record due by 11/26/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 726 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to #723 Amended Notice of Appeal,,, #724 Amended Notice of Appeal,,,. (Amended Notice of Appeal NO FEE PAID ). Appeal Record due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Ariosa Transmittal Letter)(sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 725 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. as to #517 Document Sealed, #642 Judgment, #721 Order, #89 Order, #561 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #199 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #705 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,, Order on Motion for New Trial,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings,,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, #547 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #375 Order on Stipulation #633 and #709 . Appeal Record due by 11/9/2018. (Gunther, Robert) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 724 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. as to #517 Document Sealed, #642 Judgment, #721 Order, #89 Order, #561 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #199 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #705 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,, Order on Motion for New Trial,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings,,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, #547 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #375 Order on Stipulation #633 and #709 . Appeal Record due by 11/9/2018. (Gunther, Robert) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 723 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc as to #517 Document Sealed, #642 Judgment, #721 Order, #89 Order, #561 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #199 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #705 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,, Order on Motion for New Trial,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings,,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, #547 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and #709 . Appeal Record due by 11/9/2018. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER of USCA as to (718 in 3:12-cv-05501-SI) Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,, filed by Verinata Health, Inc., Illumina, Inc., (56 in 3:14-cv-01921-SI) Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Illumina, Inc. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER RE: CLARIFICATION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 720 Letter from Edward R. Reines Seeking Clarification of the Court's July 19, 2018 Order Pursuant to Direction From the Federal Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 719 USCA Case Number 18-2317 USCA Federal Circuit for #718 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,, filed by Verinata Health, Inc., Illumina, Inc.. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. Filing fee $ 505. re #718 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 705 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,, Order on Motion for New Trial,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings,,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Appeal Record due by 9/28/2018. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) Modified on 8/29/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 718 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to #705 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,, Order on Motion for New Trial,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings,,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-12632503. [Plaintiffs' Protective Notice of Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit] Appeal Record due by 9/27/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 717 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 0971-12603751. Appeal Record due by 9/17/2018. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 716 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 0971-12604343. Appeal Record due by 9/17/2018. (Gunther, Robert) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 715 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12603751 paid.) (Gindler, David) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 714 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Illumina, Inc.. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 26B58OKG - [Corrected Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit] Appeal Record due by 8/22/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 713 Letter from Edward R. Reines in Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Letter Regarding Entry of Judgment. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 712 Letter from David Gindler in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Regarding Entry of Judgment. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 8/8/2018) Modified on 8/9/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 711 Letter from Edward R. Reines to the Court Regarding Entry of Judgment. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 710 Notice of Docketing- USCA Case Number 18-2198 USCA Fedeal Circuit for #706 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,, filed by Verinata Health, Inc., Illumina, Inc.. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 709 Costs Taxed in amount of $201,457.64 Re: #647 Bill of Costs against Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. et al. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 708 Letter from Edward R. Reines Regarding Second Clerk's Notice of Deficiency in Bill of Costs. (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit 5, #2 Amended Exhibit 6, #3 Amended Exhibit 7, #4 Amended Exhibit 8)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 707 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to #706 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,,. Filing fee $ 505. Appeal Record due by 8/23/2018. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 706 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to #705 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,, Order on Motion for New Trial,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings,,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-12536230. Appeal Record due by 8/22/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 705 ORDER RE POST-TRIAL MOTIONS, PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PERMANENT INJUNCTION, AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEALdenying #648 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying #648 Motion for New Trial; denying #649 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying #649 Motion for New Trial; denying #650 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings; denying #660 Motion for Permanent Injunction; granting #661 Motion ; denying #662 Motion ; denying #666 Motion for Permanent Injunction; granting #684 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #697 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 704 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY IN BILL OF COSTS. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 703 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Motion Hearing held on 6/8/2018. 1) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and New Trial #648 - HELD, 2) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and New Trial #649 - HELD, 3) Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings #650 - HELD, 4) Motion for Permanent Injunction #660 - HELD, 5) Motion Re: Challenging Validity #661 - HELD, 6) Motion Re: Pre and Post Judgment Interest #662 - HELD. ALL MOTIONS ARE DEEMED SUBMITTED. Total Time in Court: 2 hours and 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Vicki Eastvold. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/8/2018) Modified on 6/8/2018 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #700 Stipulation regarding equipment for 6/8/18 hearing. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER RELATING CASES 11-cv-6391 SI, 12-cv-5501 SI, 14-cv-1921 SI, 15-cv-2216 SI, 18-cv-1662 SI to 18-cv-2847 LHK., Motions terminated: (288 in 3:11-cv-06391-SI) MOTION to Relate Case [Plaintiffs Illumina, Inc. and Sequenom, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant To Civil Local Rule 3-12] filed by Illumina, Inc., Sequenom, Inc.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/6/17. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018).
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 700 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING COURTROOM EQUIPMENT FOR THE MOTIONS HEARING ON JUNE 8, 2018 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 699 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: 6/8/18 Motion Hearing Date.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #661 MOTION Rule 52 For A Finding That Assignor Estoppel Bars Ariosa From Challenging The Validity Of The '794 Patent , #649 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Plaintiffs Bore The Burden Of Proof, #660 MOTION for Permanent Injunction , #684 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #666 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Revised Public Redacted Version, #662 MOTION Order Of Accounting, And For Awards Of Supplemental Damages, And Pre- And Post- Judgment Interest , #650 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Under Rules 52(a) And (c), #648 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Ariosa Bore The Burden Of Proof, #697 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal . Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2018 09:15 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 698 OBJECTIONS to re #692 Letter Ariosa's Supplemental Objections to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Documentation in Support of their Bill of Costs by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Adina Stohl)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 697 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply In Support of Illumina, Inc.'s Motion For A Permanent Injunction, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply In Support of Illumina, Inc.'s Motion For A Permanent Injunction, #5 Redacted Version of Reply In Support Of Plaintiff Illumina, Inc.'s Motion Pursuant to Rule 52 For A Finding That Assignor Estoppel Bars Ariosa From Challenging The Validity Of The '794 Patent, #6 Unredacted Version of Reply In Support Of Plaintiff Illumina, Inc.'s Motion Pursuant to Rule 52 For A Finding That Assignor Estoppel Bars Ariosa From Challenging The Validity Of The '794 Patent, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 696 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #695 Reply to Opposition/Response, #693 Reply to Opposition/Response, #694 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #695 , #693 , #694 ) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 695 REPLY (re #660 MOTION for Permanent Injunction ) filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 694 REPLY (re #661 MOTION Rule 52 For A Finding That Assignor Estoppel Bars Ariosa From Challenging The Validity Of The '794 Patent ) filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 693 REPLY (re #662 MOTION Order Of Accounting, And For Awards Of Supplemental Damages, And Pre- And Post- Judgment Interest ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 692 Letter from Edward R. Reines in Response to the Clerk's Notice of Deficiency in Bill of Costs (Dkt. No. 690). (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 691 OBJECTIONS to re #686 Reply to Opposition/Response by Illumina, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 690 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY IN BILL OF COSTS. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 689 Declaration of Christopher Lavin in Support of #684 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Related document(s) #684 ) (Lavin, Christopher) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 688 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #682 Opposition/Response to Motion, #684 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #687 Declaration in Support,, PROOF OF SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL Acknowledgement filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 687 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny in Support of #680 Reply to Opposition/Response, #685 Opposition/Response to Motion, #682 Opposition/Response to Motion, #686 Reply to Opposition/Response, #683 Opposition/Response to Motion, #681 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 115B, #2 146, #3 322, #4 461A, #5 462, #6 493, #7 513, #8 514, #9 607, #10 615, #11 642, #12 662, #13 1028, #14 1032, #15 1044, #16 1177, #17 1656, #18 1664, #19 E, #20 F, #21 G, #22 H, #23 I, #24 J, #25 K, #26 L, #27 M)(Related document(s) #680 , #685 , #682 , #686 , #683 , #681 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 686 REPLY (re #650 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Under Rules 52(a) And (c) ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 685 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #662 MOTION Order Of Accounting, And For Awards Of Supplemental Damages, And Pre- And Post- Judgment Interest ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 684 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sandra L Haberny ISO Motion to FUS, #2 Exhibit Ariosa's Opposition to Plaintiffs PI Motion - Sealed, #3 Exhibit Ariosa's Opposition to Plaintiffs PI Motion - Redacted, #4 Exhibit Sterling Declaration - Sealed, #5 Exhibit Sterling Declaration - Redacted, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 462 - Sealed, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 462 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Sealed, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - Redacted, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - Sealed, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I - Redacted, #12 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 683 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #661 MOTION Rule 52 For A Finding That Assignor Estoppel Bars Ariosa From Challenging The Validity Of The '794 Patent ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 682 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #666 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Revised Public Redacted Version ) Public Redacted Version filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Marks, #2 Declaration of Nick Sterling)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 681 REPLY (re #648 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Ariosa Bore The Burden Of Proof ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 680 REPLY (re #649 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Plaintiffs Bore The Burden Of Proof ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 679 AMENDED ORDER RELATING CASES: 11-CV-6391 SI, 12-CV-0132 SI, 12-CV-0865 SI, 18-cv-1662 EJD, 14-cv-1921 SI, 15-cv-2216 SI, 12-cv-5501 SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/17/18. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/17/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORDER RELATING CASES 11-CV-6391 SI, 12-CV-0132 SI, 12-CV-0865 SI, 12-CV-1312 MMC, 18-cv-1662 EJD, 14-cv-1921 SI, 15-cv-2216 SI, 12-cv-5501 SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/17/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (283) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:11-cv-06391-SI. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 675 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 674 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #668 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #667 Declaration in Support, 666 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Revised Public Redacted Version filed by Illumina, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 673 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny in Support of #669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions Of Its Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.s Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law Under Rule 50(b) And Motion For New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Plaintiffs Bore Burden Of Pr filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #669 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 672 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #648 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Ariosa Bore The Burden Of Proof ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 671 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #650 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Under Rules 52(a) And (c) ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Illuminas Proposed Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 670 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #649 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Plaintiffs Bore The Burden Of Proof ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit A)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions Of Its Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.s Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law Under Rule 50(b) And Motion For New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Plaintiffs Bore Burden Of Proof And Exhibit A Thereto filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Plaintiffs Opposition To Ariosas Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law Under Rule 50(B) And For New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Plaintiffs Bore Burden Of Proof, #4 Unredacted Plaintiffs Opposition To Ariosas Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law Under Rule 50(B) And For New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Plaintiffs Bore Burden Of Proof, #5 Redacted Exhibit A, #6 Unredacted Exhibit A, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 668 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #667 Declaration in Support, #666 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Revised Public Redacted Version filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Lavin, Christopher) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 667 Declaration of Jeffrey Eidel in Support of #666 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Revised Public Redacted Version filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Related document(s) #666 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 666 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Revised Public Redacted Version filed by Illumina, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 5/4/2018. Replies due by 5/25/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 665 Declaration of Sandra L Haberny in Support of #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #659 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 664 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. re #659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 663 Declaration of Christopher Lavin in Support of #661 MOTION Rule 52 For A Finding That Assignor Estoppel Bars Ariosa From Challenging The Validity Of The '794 Patent , #660 MOTION for Permanent Injunction , #662 MOTION Order Of Accounting, And For Awards Of Supplemental Damages, And Pre- And Post- Judgment Interest filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 400, #2 Exhibit 493, #3 Exhibit 715, #4 Exhibit 726, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) #661 , #660 , #662 ) (Lavin, Christopher) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 662 MOTION Order Of Accounting, And For Awards Of Supplemental Damages, And Pre- And Post- Judgment Interest filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 5/4/2018. Replies due by 5/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Malackowski, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 661 MOTION Rule 52 For A Finding That Assignor Estoppel Bars Ariosa From Challenging The Validity Of The '794 Patent filed by Illumina, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 5/4/2018. Replies due by 5/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 660 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Illumina, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 5/4/2018. Replies due by 5/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Eidel, #2 Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Lavin, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Illumina's Motion For Permanent Injunction, #4 Unredacted Version of Illumina's Motion For Permanent Injunction, #5 Redacted Version of Jeffrey Eidel's Declaration In Support Of Illumina's Motion For a Permanent Injunction, #6 Unredacted Version of Jeffrey Eidel's Declaration In Support Of Illumina's Motion For a Permanent Injunction, #7 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion For An Order Of Accounting, #8 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion For An Order Of Accounting, #9 Redacted Version of James Malacowski's Declaration In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For An Order of Accounting, #10 Unredacted Version of James Malacowski's Declaration In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For An Order of Accounting, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to James Malackowski's Declaration, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to James Malackowski's Declaration, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 400, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 400, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #17 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #19 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #21 Redacted Version of Exhibit G, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, #23 Redacted Version of Exhibit H, #24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, #25 Redacted Version of Exhibit I, #26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I, #27 Redacted Version of Exhibit J, #28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit J, #29 Redacted Version of Exhibit M, #30 Unredacted Version of Exhibit M)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Received Document: REDACTED TRIAL EXHIBIT #66 re 658 Clerk's Notice,,, #655 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 658 CLERK'S NOTICE RE FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER. The Court directed the following:Document No. #655 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #652 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The docket clerk shall remove Ariosa's trial exhibit #66 from the defendant's public trial binders and place into the sealed trial binders. Ariosa is directed to submit a redacted version of it's #66 to the Clerk's Office, which will be substituted in place of the removed exhibit, before the close of business on 3/2/18. Counsel shall comply with the Court's Order by close of business 3/14 and file a proof of service, or file a status report regarding the failure to comply with the order. (. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #656 Stipulation To Modify Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Post-Trial Motions. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #649 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Plaintiffs Bore The Burden Of Proof, #648 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Ariosa Bore The Burden Of Proof, #650 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Under Rules 52(a) And (c). Responses due by 4/6/2018. Replies due by 5/25/2018. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 656 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Modify Briefing And Hearing Schedule For Plaintiffs Illumina, Inc. And Verinata Health, Inc.s And Defendant Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.s Post-Trial Motions filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #652 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The docket clerk shall remove Ariosa's trial exhibit #66 from the defendant's public trial binders and place into the sealed trial binders. Ariosa is directed to submit a redacted version of it's #66 to the Clerk's Office, which will be substituted in place of the removed exhibit, before the close of business on 3/2/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 654 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #652 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 66 (Trial Exhibit 66) To The Declaration Of Sandra L. Haberny ISO Ariosa's Motions Proof fo Service of Documents Filed Under Seal (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 653 OBJECTIONS to re #647 Bill of Costs, by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 652 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 66 (Trial Exhibit 66) To The Declaration Of Sandra L. Haberny ISO Ariosa's Motions filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Redacted, #3 Exhibit Sealed, #4 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 651 Declaration of Sandra Haberny in Support of #648 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Ariosa Bore The Burden Of Proof, #649 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Plaintiffs Bore The Burden Of Proof, #650 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Under Rules 52(a) And (c) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit 461A, #6 Exhibit 493, #7 Exhibit 507A, #8 Exhibit 513, #9 Exhibit 514, #10 Exhibit 607, #11 Exhibit 615, #12 Exhibit 727, #13 Exhibit 1044, #14 Exhibit 1172, #15 Exhibit 1175, #16 Exhibit 1177, #17 Exhibit 1655)(Related document(s) #648 , #649 , #650 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 650 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Under Rules 52(a) And (c) filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 3/12/2018. Replies due by 3/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 649 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b), MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Plaintiffs Bore The Burden Of Proof filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 3/12/2018. Replies due by 3/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 648 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b), MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 On Issues For Which Ariosa Bore The Burden Of Proof filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 3/12/2018. Replies due by 3/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 647 BILL OF COSTS by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Objections due by 2/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward Reines, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ADMITTED TRIAL EXHIBITS: PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS VOL. 1-5 + TRIAL WITNESS PHOTOS + JOINT TRIAL EXHIBITS NOT SUBMITED TO JURY (BOX 1 OF 2 IN SHELF 93) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ADMITTED TRIAL EXHIBITS: JOINT TRIAL EXHIBITS VOL. 1-3 + JOINT SEALED REDACTED EXHIBITS (BOX 2 OF 2 IN SHELF 93) + DEFENDANT'S 3 CIVIL CHARTS (WALL B)(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) filed by (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018).
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ADMITTIED TRIAL EXHIBITS : JOINT SEALED/CONFIDENTIAL UNREDACTED TRIAL EXHIBITS (SHELF 94) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) filed by (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 643 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 642 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/26/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 641 Master Index for Jury Trial Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/8/2018 through 1/25/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 640 Jury Notes. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 639 Transcript of Proceedings, Jury Trial Volume 11, held on 1/25/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 638 Clerk's Working Copy of Defendant's Exhibit List. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 637 Clerk's Working Copy of Plaintiff's Exhibit List. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 636 Clerk's trial worksheet (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 635 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: SEALED TRIAL EXHIBITS. Counsel shall submit redacted versions of trial exhibits that were conditionally sealed on January 29, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 634 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Jury Trial held on 1/25/2018. Verdict in favor of plaintiff and against defendant. Filed with the Clerk's Office (trial witness photos are contained with exhibits).Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 633 JURY VERDICT. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ERRATA re #623 Errata Ariosa's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Notice of Errata and Motion to Correct Errors in Trial Transcript by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ERRATA re #617 Errata Ariosa's Amended Notice of Errata and Motion to Correct Errors in Trial Transcript by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 630 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Further Jury Deliberations held on 1/24/2018.Total Time in Court: 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2018)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 629 Transcript of Proceedings, Jury Trial Volume 10, held on 1/24/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 628 Transcript of Proceedings, Jury Trial Volume 9, held on 1/23/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 627 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Jury Trial held on 1/23/2018. The Court provided final jury instruction. All parties provided closing statements. Jury out for deliberations. *Sealed trial exhibits were submitted to jury, however will be redacted prior to being filed with the Clerk's Office. Total Time in Court: 4:18. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 626 VERDICT FORM (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 625 JURY INSTRUCTIONS (FINAL) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 624 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Jury Trial held on 1/22/2018. Testimony was provided by the following witnesses: 1) Gregory Cooper (continued), 2) James Malachkowski, and 3) Ryan Sullivan. All parties have rested their rebuttal. The Court held the jury instruction conference (off record). Rule 50 motions were argued and were either denied without prejudice or taken under submission. Total Time in Court: 5/17. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ERRATA Plaintiffs' Notice of Errata and Motion to Correct Errors In Trial Transcript by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 622 OBJECTIONS to Final Jury Instructions by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 621 VERDICT FORM (AMENDED) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 620 VERDICT FORM (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 619 Transcript of Proceedings, Jury Trial Volume 8, held on 1/22/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 618 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(a) and Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings Under Rule 52(c); Memorandum in Support filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2018 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Replies due by 2/12/2018. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ERRATA Ariosa's Notice of Errata and Motion to Correct Errors in Trial Transcript by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER For Jury Refreshments. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/22/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 615 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Contract Counterclaims and Damages filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2018 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Replies due by 2/12/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 614 EXHIBITS Rebuttal Trial Presentation of James Malackowski filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 613 EXHIBITS Rebuttal Trial Presentation (1/22/2018) of Gregory Cooper, Ph.D. filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Lavin, Christopher) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 612 EXHIBITS Opening Trial Presentation of James Malackowski filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Lavin, Christopher) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 611 EXHIBITS Rebuttal Trial Presentation (1/18/2018) of Gregory Cooper, Ph.D. filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Lavin, Christopher) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 610 EXHIBITS Redacted Version of Opening Trial Presentation of Gregory Cooper, Ph.D. filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Lavin, Christopher) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 609 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opening Trial Presentation of Gregory Cooper, Ph.D. filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Lavin, #2 Exhibit 1 (Redacted Version of Opening Trial Presentation of Gregory Cooper, Ph.D.), #3 Exhibit 1 (Unredacted Version of Opening Trial Presentation of Gregory Cooper, Ph.D.), #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lavin, Christopher) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 608 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Infringement of the Patents-In-Suit filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Replies due by 2/12/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 607 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Validity of the Patents-In-Suit filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Replies due by 2/12/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 606 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding Assignor Estoppel filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2018 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Replies due by 2/12/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 605 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding No Express License to the '794 Patent filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2018 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Replies due by 2/12/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 604 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Regarding the Sale and Supply Agreement's Limitation of Liability Clause filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2018 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Replies due by 2/12/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 603 AMENDED Transcript of Proceedings, Jury Trial Volume 5, held on 1/16/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2018)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 602 Proposed Jury Instructions by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. [Plaintiffs' Addendum]. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 601 Proposed Form of Verdict by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. . (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 600 Proposed Jury Instructions by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. [JOINT]. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 599 Proposed Form of Verdict by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Revised Proposed Form of Verdict. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 598 Transcript of Proceedings, Jury Trial Volume 7, held on 1/18/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 597 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Jury Trial held on 1/18/2018. Testimony was provided by the following witnesses: 1) John Quackenbush (continued), 2) Charles Cantor, 3) Crane Harris (via video depo in lieu of live testimony), 4) Jean Wee, 5) Ryan Sullivan, and 6) Gregory Cooper. Total Time in Court: 5:36. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 596 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Jury Trial held on 1/17/2018. T estimony was provided by the following witnesses: 1) Jeffrey Eidel (continued), 2) James Malackowski, 3) Kenneth Song, 4) Eric Wang, and 5) John Quackenbush.Total Time in Court: 5:22. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/18/2018)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 595 Transcript of Proceedings, Jury Trial Volume 6, held on 1/17/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018) Modified on 1/22/2018: Changed 'year' of hearing to 2018. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 594 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(a); Memorandum in Support filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/31/2018. Replies due by 2/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 593 *** DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR (SEE DOCKET #603) *** Transcript of Proceedings, Jury Trial Volume 5, held on 1/16/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) Modified on 1/22/2018 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 592 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #589 MOTION To Preclude Ariosa's "Refund" Damages Theory ) Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Opposition to Illumina's Motion to Preclude "Refund" Damages Theory filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 591 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Jury Trial held on 1/16/2018. Testimony was provided by the following witnesses: 1) Gregory Cooper, 2) Arnold Oliphant, and 3) Jeffrey Eidel.Total Time in Court: 5:32. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/16/2018)
January 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 590 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #583 MOTION to Preclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski re: Alleged Lost Test Fees re #561 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Renewed Motion ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/15/2018)
January 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 589 MOTION To Preclude Ariosa's "Refund" Damages Theory filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/29/2018. Replies due by 2/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/15/2018)
January 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 588 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Exhibits, Source Code, and Close Courtroom to Safeguard Confidentiality filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/15/2018)
January 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 587 RESPONSE to re #584 Objection, [Plaintiffs' Response To Ariosa's Objection To Plaintiffs' Proposed Introduction Of Deposition Testimony of Xiang-Dong Fu From Post-Grant Proceedings At Trial] by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/15/2018)
January 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 586 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #581 MOTION To Strike Testimony and Request For Jury Instruction Regarding Same re #547 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/15/2018)
January 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 585 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #580 MOTION To Strike Testimony and Request For Jury Instruction Regarding Same re #547 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/15/2018)
January 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 584 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Proposed Introduction of Deposition Testimony of Xiang-Dong Fu from Post-Grant Proceedings at Trial by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/14/2018)
January 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 583 MOTION to Preclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski re: Alleged Lost Test Fees re #561 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Renewed Motion filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/29/2018. Replies due by 2/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/14/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 582 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Exhibits, Source Code, and Close Courtroom to Safeguard Confidentiality filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny in support of Motion)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 581 MOTION To Strike Testimony and Request For Jury Instruction Regarding Same re #547 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, MIL No. 4 [Anti-Competitive Activity] filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/26/2018. Replies due by 2/2/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 580 MOTION To Strike Testimony and Request For Jury Instruction Regarding Same re #547 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, MIL No. 12 [Advice of Counsel] filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/26/2018. Replies due by 2/2/2018. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 579 Transcript of Proceedings, Jury Trial Volume 4, held on 1/11/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 578 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Jury Trial held on 1/11/2018. Testimony was provided by the following witnesses: 1) Jay Flatley (continued), and 2) John Stuelpnagel. Total Time in Court: 5:28. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2018)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 577 Transcript of Proceedings, Jury Trial Volume 3, held on 1/10/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 576 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Jury Trial held on 1/10/2018. Testimony was provided by the following witnesses: 1) Nicholas Naclerio (continued), and 2) Jay Flatley.Total Time in Court: 5:34. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/10/2018)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Transcript of Proceedings, Jury Trial Volume 2, held on 1/9/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 574 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Jury Trial held on 1/9/2018. Testimony was provided by the following witnesses: 1) Jeff Bird, 2) Richard Rava, and 3) Nicholas Naclerio.Total Time in Court: 4:55. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/9/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 573 Transcript of Proceedings, Jury Trial Volume 1, held on 1/8/2018, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #546 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, #557 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2018. (Related documents(s) #546 , #557 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 572 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Jury Trial held on 1/8/2018. 8 member jury panel selected and sworn. Parties provided opening statements. Total Time in Court: 4:05. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 20, 2017, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #558 Transcript Order, #562 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2018. (Related documents(s) #558 , #562 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 570 OBJECTIONS to re #565 Proposed Form of Verdict [Special Verdict Questions] by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/7/2018)
January 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 569 Proposed Form of Verdict by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. [Second Revised]. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/7/2018)
January 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 568 Proposed Form of Verdict by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. . (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/6/2018)
January 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Proposed Jury Instructions by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. [JOINT]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/6/2018)
January 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Statement [Joint Neutral Statement of the Case] by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/6/2018)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 565 Proposed Form of Verdict by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc - Revised Proposed Form of Verdict. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL #394 #397 #398 #399 #403 #405 #421 #423 #425 #427 #429 #432 #435 #436 #447 #449 #452 #453 #454 #457 #500 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 563 NOTICE by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Aaron Y. Huang (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 562 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2017 before Judge Susan Illston by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER RE MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF JAMES MALACKOWSKI #418 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 560 REDACTED VERSION ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MOTIONS TO STRIKE, AND MOTION TO PERCLUDE TESTIMONY at Doc. No. #517 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/11/18 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #551 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 558 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2017 before Judge Susan Illston by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 557 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #550 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER RE MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. CANTOR (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order THE TRIAL WILL PROCEED AS ORDERED. A 10 day jury trial to begin on 1/8/18, for 10 trial days. There has been NO order directing otherwise. The trial dates set as a docket notation on ecf was a docketing function to add the trial to the Court's calendar. If there is any questions, please contact the Court Clerk. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 554 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING SCHEDULING: The Court has reviewed and approved Mr. Reines' request to begin testimony on 1/9/18.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for 1/8/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 1/10/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 1/17/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 1/18/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing Jury Trial set for 1/23/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 553 Statement of Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Cantor #518 by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/27/2017) Modified on 12/28/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 552 Letter from Edward R. Reines to The Honorable Susan Illston. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 551 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal December 11, 2017 Order Re Motions for Summary Judgment, Motions to Strike, and Motion to Preclude Testimony [D.I. 517] filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny in support of motion to file under seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit REDACTED Version Of Order Sought To Be Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit UNREDACTED Highlighted Version Of Order Sought To Be Filed Under Seal)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 550 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document re D.I. 549 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adina Stohl in support of motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal THE COURTS DECEMBER 11, 2017 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MOTIONS TO STRIKE, AND MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY [D.I. 517] filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sandra L Haberny ISO Motion to FUS, #2 Exhibit 1 - Unredacted, #3 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, #4 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 548 Statement re #517 Document Sealed JOINT STATEMENT ON SEALING OF THE COURTS DECEMBER 11, 2017 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MOTIONS TO STRIKE, AND MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY [D.I. 517] by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Sandra L Haberny ISO Joint Statement, #3 Exhibit 1 to Haberny Declaration)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 547 FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER #395 #400 #401 #416 #442 #471 #490 #492 #494 #497 #498 #499 #502 #503 #504 #505 #506 #507 #508 #509 #510 #511 #512 #513 #518 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 546 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 545 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Pretrial Conference held on 12/20/2017.Total Time in Court: 3 hours. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 544 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey May Curran (Curran, Casey) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 543 REPLY (re #503 MOTION in Limine #3 To Exclude Any Reference to Illumina As Misusing Tandem/Ariosas Confidential Information, #511 MOTION in Limine #11 To Exclude Dr. Cantor's Improper Reliance on Hearsay, #506 MOTION in Limine #6 To Exclude Testimony of Nicholas Godici, #510 MOTION in Limine #10 To Exclude Invalidity Arguments Barred By IPR Estoppel, #500 MOTION in Limine #1 To Exclude Any Reference To Illumina As An Arms Dealer, #502 MOTION in Limine #2 To Exclude From Trial Evidence of Jay Flatleys Personal Investment In Tandem/Ariosa, #508 MOTION in Limine #8 To Preclude The Testimony Of Dr. Brian Shaffer, #513 MOTION in Limine #13 To Preclude Certain Recurring Prejudice Arguments and Theories, #509 MOTION in Limine #9 To Exclude Testimony Of Dr. Ryan Sullivan, #507 MOTION in Limine #7 To Preclude Testimony of Dr. John Quackenbush, Ph. D. Regarding Whether Golden Gate Embodies The 794 Patent, #504 MOTION in Limine #4 To Exclude Any Argument That Illumina Has Engaged In Illegal Or Tortious Anti-Competitive Activity, #505 MOTION in Limine #5 To Preclude Trial Evidence and Argument Regarding Ariosas Equitable Defenses, #512 MOTION in Limine #12 To Preclude Ariosa From Relying Upon Advice Of Counsel ) [Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants Illumina, Inc.'s and Verinata Health, Inc.'s Omnibus Reply Explaining Status of Each Motion] filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 542 NOTICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc Notice of Withdrawal of David Schwarz as Counsel for Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff, Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 541 NOTICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc Notice of Withdrawal of Lauren Drake as Counsel for Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff, Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc Notice of Withdrawal of Joshua Gordon as Counsel for Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff, Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 539 NOTICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc Notice of Withdrawal of Andrei Iancu as Counsel for Defendant and Counterclaim-Plaintiff, Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 538 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny in Support of #535 Opposition/Response to Motion, #526 Opposition/Response to Motion, #533 Opposition/Response to Motion, #537 Opposition/Response to Motion, #529 Opposition/Response to Motion, #534 Opposition/Response to Motion, #530 Opposition/Response to Motion, #528 Opposition/Response to Motion, #531 Opposition/Response to Motion, #536 Opposition/Response to Motion, #532 Opposition/Response to Motion, #527 Opposition/Response to Motion, #525 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 14, #3 Exhibit 15, #4 Exhibit 16, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 19, #8 Exhibit 22, #9 Exhibit 26, #10 Exhibit 27, #11 Exhibit 28, #12 Exhibit 29, #13 Exhibit 30, #14 Exhibit 31, #15 Exhibit 32, #16 Exhibit 33, #17 Exhibit 34, #18 Exhibit 35, #19 Exhibit 36, #20 Exhibit 37, #21 Exhibit 38, #22 Exhibit 39, #23 Exhibit 40, #24 Exhibit 41, #25 Exhibit 42)(Related document(s) #535 , #526 , #533 , #537 , #529 , #534 , #530 , #528 , #531 , #536 , #532 , #527 , #525 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 537 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #513 MOTION in Limine #13 To Preclude Certain Recurring Prejudice Arguments and Theories ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 536 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #512 MOTION in Limine #12 To Preclude Ariosa From Relying Upon Advice Of Counsel ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 535 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #511 MOTION in Limine #11 To Exclude Dr. Cantor's Improper Reliance on Hearsay ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 534 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #510 MOTION in Limine #10 To Exclude Invalidity Arguments Barred By IPR Estoppel ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 533 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #509 MOTION in Limine #9 To Exclude Testimony Of Dr. Ryan Sullivan ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 532 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #508 MOTION in Limine #8 To Preclude The Testimony Of Dr. Brian Shaffer ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 531 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #507 MOTION in Limine #7 To Preclude Testimony of Dr. John Quackenbush, Ph. D. Regarding Whether Golden Gate Embodies The 794 Patent ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 530 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #506 MOTION in Limine #6 To Exclude Testimony of Nicholas Godici ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 529 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #505 MOTION in Limine #5 To Preclude Trial Evidence and Argument Regarding Ariosas Equitable Defenses ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 528 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #504 MOTION in Limine #4 To Exclude Any Argument That Illumina Has Engaged In Illegal Or Tortious Anti-Competitive Activity ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 527 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #503 MOTION in Limine #3 To Exclude Any Reference to Illumina As Misusing Tandem/Ariosas Confidential Information ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 526 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #502 MOTION in Limine #2 To Exclude From Trial Evidence of Jay Flatleys Personal Investment In Tandem/Ariosa ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 525 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #500 MOTION in Limine #1 To Exclude Any Reference To Illumina As An Arms Dealer ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 524 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #499 MOTION in Limine Number 6 ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 523 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #498 MOTION in Limine Number 5 ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 522 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #497 MOTION in Limine Number 4 ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 521 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #494 MOTION in Limine Number 3 ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 520 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #492 MOTION in Limine Number 2 ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 519 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #490 MOTION in Limine Number 1 ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 518 MOTION to Strike [Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Dr. Cantor] filed by Verinata Health, Inc.. Responses due by 12/27/2017. Replies due by 1/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Document sealed. ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MOTIONS TO STRIKE, AND MOTION TO PERCLUDE TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/11/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 516 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Jean Russell (Russell, Molly) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 515 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah L Jones (Jones, Hannah) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 514 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Cox (Cox, Christopher) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MOTION in Limine #13 To Preclude Certain Recurring Prejudice Arguments and Theories filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 512 MOTION in Limine #12 To Preclude Ariosa From Relying Upon Advice Of Counsel filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 511 MOTION in Limine #11 To Exclude Dr. Cantor's Improper Reliance on Hearsay filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 510 MOTION in Limine #10 To Exclude Invalidity Arguments Barred By IPR Estoppel filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 509 MOTION in Limine #9 To Exclude Testimony Of Dr. Ryan Sullivan filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 508 MOTION in Limine #8 To Preclude The Testimony Of Dr. Brian Shaffer filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 507 MOTION in Limine #7 To Preclude Testimony of Dr. John Quackenbush, Ph. D. Regarding Whether Golden Gate Embodies The 794 Patent filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 506 MOTION in Limine #6 To Exclude Testimony of Nicholas Godici filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 505 MOTION in Limine #5 To Preclude Trial Evidence and Argument Regarding Ariosas Equitable Defenses filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 504 MOTION in Limine #4 To Exclude Any Argument That Illumina Has Engaged In Illegal Or Tortious Anti-Competitive Activity filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 503 MOTION in Limine #3 To Exclude Any Reference to Illumina As Misusing Tandem/Ariosas Confidential Information filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 502 MOTION in Limine #2 To Exclude From Trial Evidence of Jay Flatleys Personal Investment In Tandem/Ariosa filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 501 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny in Support of #492 MOTION in Limine Number 2, #494 MOTION in Limine Number 3, #498 MOTION in Limine Number 5, #499 MOTION in Limine Number 6, #490 MOTION in Limine Number 1, #497 MOTION in Limine Number 4 filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) #492 , #494 , #498 , #499 , #490 , #497 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 500 MOTION in Limine #1 To Exclude Any Reference To Illumina As An Arms Dealer filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 499 MOTION in Limine Number 6 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ariosa's Motion In Limine No. 6)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 498 MOTION in Limine Number 5 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ariosa's Motion In Limine No. 5)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 497 MOTION in Limine Number 4 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ariosa's Motion In Limine No. 4)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Proposed Voir Dire by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. . (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Proposed Form of Verdict by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. . (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 494 MOTION in Limine Number 3 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ariosa's Motion In Limine No. 3)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 493 Proposed Jury Instructions by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. [JOINT]. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MOTION in Limine Number 2 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ariosa's Motion In Limine No. 2)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 491 Pretrial Conference Statement by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. [JOINT]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 490 MOTION in Limine Number 1 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Ariosa's Motion In Limine 1)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 489 Proposed Voir Dire by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc . (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Proposed Form of Verdict by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc . (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 487 Sealed Portion of Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/12/17, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/12/17, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #485 Transcript Order, #484 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2018. (Related documents(s) #485 , #484 ) (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 485 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/12/2017 before Judge Susan Illston by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 484 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/12/2017 before Judge Susan Illston by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc., for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 483 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2017. Total Time in Court: 2:38. Court Reporter: Rhonda Aquilina. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/13/2017)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 482 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Sharrock Glasser Notice of Appearance of Lisa S. Glasser (Glasser, Lisa) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #479 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING COURTROOM EQUIPMENT FOR THE MOTIONS HEARING ON OCTOBER 12, 2017 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 480 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #400 MOTION to Strike [Illumina, Inc.'s Special Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Second and Third Counterclaims], #442 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Corrected Expert Report and Deposition Testimony of Gregory Cooper, Ph.D. and to Preclude Reliance Thereon [Corrected Redacted Version], #416 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #401 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Gregory Cooper , #395 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #418 MOTION Preclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski . Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 479 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING COURTROOM EQUIPMENT FOR THE MOTIONS HEARING ON OCTOBER 12, 2017 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 478 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Michele A. Gauger by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/4/2017) Modified on 10/6/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Brief re #428 Opposition/Response to Motion, Plaintiffs Illumina, Inc.s and Verinata Health, Inc.s Memorandum in Opposition to Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 2 to Plaintiffs Opposition [D.I. 428-2], and to Remove this Document as Currently Filed from Public Access, and to File Under Seal filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Lavin)(Related document(s) #428 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 476 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Lavin (Lavin, Christopher) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 475 EXHIBITS re #425 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Gregory Cooper In Support of Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Gregory Cooper, #427 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion to Strike, #471 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ARIOSAS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE CORRECTED EXPERT REPORT AND DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GREGORY COOPER, PH.D. [D.I. 427-03 & 428], EXHIBIT 2 TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION [D.I. 428-0 #473 filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted DECLARATION OF GREGORY COOPER, Ph.D. IN SUPPORT OF ILLUMINA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO ARIOSA DIAGNOSTICS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OF ILLUMINA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO ARIOSA DIAGNOSTICS, INC.S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF GREGORY COOPER, Ph.D DI0425-3, #2 Redacted DECLARATION OF GREGORY COOPER, Ph.D. IN SUPPORT OF ILLUMINA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO ARIOSA DIAGNOSTICS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OF ILLUMINA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO ARIOSA DIAGNOSTICS, INC.S MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF GREGORY COOPER, Ph.D DI0426, #3 Unredacted PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO ARIOSAS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE CORRECTED EXPERT REPORT AND DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GREGORY COOPER, Ph.D DI0427-4, #4 Redacted PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO ARIOSAS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE CORRECTED EXPERT REPORT AND DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GREGORY COOPER, Ph.D DI0427-3, #5 Redacted PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO ARIOSAS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE CORRECTED EXPERT REPORT AND DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GREGORY COOPER, Ph.D DI0428, #6 Unredacted Exhibit 2 to PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO ARIOSAS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE CORRECTED EXPERT REPORT AND DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GREGORY COOPER, Ph.D DI0428-2, #7 Redacted Exhibit 2 to PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO ARIOSAS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE CORRECTED EXPERT REPORT AND DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GREGORY COOPER, Ph.D DI0428-2)(Related document(s) #425 , #427 , #471 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 474 AMENDED Declaration of Derek C. Walter re #447 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Re Motion to Preclude Testimony of Malackowski, #436 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny, #452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny, #405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Haberny Declaration in support of Ariosa's Motions, #403 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Preclude Testimony of Malackowski, #432 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to anti-SLAPP Motion filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 Unredacted, #2 Exhibit 16 Redacted, #3 Exhibit 17 Unredacted, #4 Exhibit 17 Redacted, #5 Exhibit 24, #6 Exhibit 25, #7 Exhibit 42 Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 42 Redacted, #9 Exhibit 49 Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 49 Redacted, #11 Exhibit 62 Unredacted, #12 Exhibit 62 Redacted, #13 Exhibit 67 Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 67 Redacted, #15 Exhibit 68 Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 68 Redacted, #17 Exhibit 77, #18 Unredacted Ariosa Motion to Preclude Testimony of Malackowski, #19 redacted Ariosa Motion to Preclude Testimony of Malackowski, #20 Proposed Order, #21 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #447 , #436 , #452 , #405 , #403 , #432 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/29/2017) Modified on 10/3/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL Re: Docket No. 471. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/29/17. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 472 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #471 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ARIOSAS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE CORRECTED EXPERT REPORT AND DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GREGORY COOPER, PH.D. [D.I. 427-03 & 428], EXHIBIT 2 TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION [D.I. 428-0 Proof of Service of Documents Filed Under Seal (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ARIOSAS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE CORRECTED EXPERT REPORT AND DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GREGORY COOPER, PH.D. [D.I. 427-03 & 428], EXHIBIT 2 TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION [D.I. 428-02], AND THE DECLARATION OF GREGORY COOPER, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ARIOSAS MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ARIOSAS MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF GREGORY COOPER [D.I. 425-03 & 426] AND TO REMOVE THESE DOCUMENTS AS CURRENTLY FILED FROM PUBLIC ACCESS, AND TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT A TO S. ADINA STOHLS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF THIS MOTION filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of S Adina Stohl, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Opposition - Sealed, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Opposition - Redacted, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Opposition - Sealed, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Opposition - Redacted, #6 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Cooper Declaration - Sealed, #7 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Cooper Declaration - Redacted, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A - Sealed, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A - Redacted, #10 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order *administrative docket maintenance (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 470 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #464 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 469 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #467 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, #464 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, #460 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, #459 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, #462 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, #465 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 468 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #425 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Gregory Cooper In Support of Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Gregory Cooper ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Adina Stohl in Support of Defendant's Partial Opposition, #2 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 467 DECLARATION & EXHIBITS re #425 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Gregory Cooper In Support of Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Gregory Cooper Declaration of Sandra L Haberny in Support of Motion to File Under Seal filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory Cooper Unredacted Under Seal, #2 Declaration of Gregory Cooper Redacted, #3 Exhibit B Unredacted under seal, #4 Exhibit Redacted, #5 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #425 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/26/2017) Modified on 9/27/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #447 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Re Motion to Preclude Testimony of Malackowski, #436 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny, #405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Haberny Declaration in support of Ariosa's Motions, #452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny, #403 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Preclude Testimony of Malackowski, #432 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to anti-SLAPP Motion filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Related document(s) #447 , #436 , #405 , #452 , #403 , #432 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 465 DECLARATION & EXHIBITS re #429 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Opposition to Preclude Malackowski Testimony Declaration of Sandra L Haberny in Support of Motion to File Under Seal filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Opposition Brief Unredacted Under Seal, #2 Plaintiff's Opposition Brief Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3 Unredacted Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 3 Redacted, #5 Exhibit 4 Unredacted Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 4 Redacted, #7 Exhibit 5 Unredacted Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 5 Redacted, #9 Exhibit 9 Unredacted Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 9 Redacted, #11 Exhibit 10 Unredacted Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 10 Redacted, #13 Exhibit 11 Unredacted Under Seal, #14 Exhibit 11 Redacted, #15 Exhibit 12 Unredacted Under Seal, #16 Exhibit 12 Redacted, #17 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #429 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/26/2017) Modified on 9/27/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 464 DECLARATION & EXHIBITS re #454 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Reply In Support of Summary Judgment Motion Declaration of Sandra L Haberny in Support of Motion to File Under Seal filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Illumina's Reply Brief Unredacted Under Seal, #2 Illumina's Reply Brief Redacted, #3 Exhibit 6 Unredacted Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 6 Redacted, #5 Exhibit 11 Unredacted Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 11 Redacted, #7 Exhibit 12 Unredacted Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 12 Redacted, #9 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #454 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/26/2017) Modified on 9/27/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 463 DECLARATION re #457 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Reply In Support of Special Anti-SLAPP Motion Declaration of Sandra L Haberny in Support of Motion to File Under Seal filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #457 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/26/2017) Modified on 9/27/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 462 DECLARATION & EXHIBITS re #421 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment Declaration of Sandra L Haberny in Support of Motion to File Under Seal filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 Unredacted Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3 Unredacted Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 3 Redacted, #5 Exhibit 6 Unredacted Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 Redacted, #7 Exhibit 8 Unredacted Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8 Redacted, #9 Exhibit 10 Unredacted Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 10 Redacted, #11 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #421 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/26/2017) Modified on 9/27/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 461 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan J. Heinrich (Heinrich, Alan) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 460 DECLARATION & EXHIBITS re #427 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion to Strike Declaration of Sandra L Haberny in Support of Motion to File Under Seal filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Illumina's Opposition Unredacted Under Seal, #2 Illumina's Opposition Redacted, #3 Exhibit 1 Unredacted Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 1 Redacted, #5 Exhibit 2 Unredacted Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 2 Redacted, #7 Exhibit 3 Unredacted Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 3 Redacted, #9 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #427 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/26/2017) Modified on 9/27/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 459 DECLARATION & EXHIBITS re #423 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Opposition to Preclude Cooper Testimony Declaration of Sandra L Haberny in Support of Motion to File Under Seal filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Unredacted Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 1 Redacted, #3 Exhibit 2 Unredacted Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 2 Redacted, #5 Exhibit 3 Unredacted Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 3 Redacted, #7 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #423 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/26/2017) Modified on 9/27/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 458 REPLY (re #400 MOTION to Strike [Illumina, Inc.'s Special Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Second and Third Counterclaims] ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 457 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Reply In Support of Special Anti-SLAPP Motion filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Illumina's Reply In Support of Special Anti-SLAPP Motion, #4 Unredacted Version of Illumina's Reply In Support of Special Anti-SLAPP Motion)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 456 PROOF OF SERVICE re #447 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Re Motion to Preclude Testimony of Malackowski, #449 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply re Motion to Strike Cooper Report and Testimony and Preclude Reliance Thereon, #452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny, #453 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in support of Motion for Summary Judgment Proof of Service of Documents Filed Under Seal by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/22/2017) Modified on 9/25/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 455 REPLY (re #395 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 454 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Reply In Support of Summary Judgment Motion filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Illumina's Reply In Support of Summary Judgment Motion, #4 Unredacted Version of Illumina's Reply In Support of Summary Judgment Motion, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 6, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 9, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 11, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit 12, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 453 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO motion to file under seal Reply re MSJ, #2 Proposed Order ISO motion to file under seal Reply re MSJ, #3 Redacted Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO motion to file under seal exhibits, #2 Proposed Order ISO motion to file under seal exhibits, #3 Exhibit 71 redacted, #4 Exhibit 71 unredacted, #5 Exhibit 77 redacted, #6 Exhibit 77 unredacted)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny in Support of #445 Reply to Opposition/Response, #450 Reply to Opposition/Response, #446 Reply to Opposition/Response, #448 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 69, #2 Exhibit 70, #3 Exhibit 72, #4 Exhibit 73, #5 Exhibit 74, #6 Exhibit 75, #7 Exhibit 76, #8 Exhibit 78)(Related document(s) #445 , #450 , #446 , #448 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 450 REPLY (re #416 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Redacted filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 449 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply re Motion to Strike Cooper Report and Testimony and Preclude Reliance Thereon filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO filing under seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting motion to file under seal, #3 Redacted Reply re Motion to Strike, #4 Unredacted Reply re Motion to Strike)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 448 REPLY (re #442 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Corrected Expert Report and Deposition Testimony of Gregory Cooper, Ph.D. and to Preclude Reliance Thereon [Corrected Redacted Version] ) Redacted filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Re Motion to Preclude Testimony of Malackowski filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Reply, #4 Unredacted Reply)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 446 REPLY (re #418 MOTION Preclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski ) Redacted filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 445 REPLY (re #401 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Gregory Cooper ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #443 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend LR 79-5(e) Deadline for Submission of Declarations in Support of Motions to Seal at D.I. 421, 423, 425, 427, 429, 432, 435 & 436 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 443 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend LR 79-5(e) Deadline for Submission of Declarations in Support of Motions to Seal at D.I. 421, 423, 425, 427, 429, 432, 435 & 436 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 442 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Corrected Expert Report and Deposition Testimony of Gregory Cooper, Ph.D. and to Preclude Reliance Thereon [Corrected Redacted Version] filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/15/2017. Replies due by 9/22/2017. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Electronic filing error for failure to comply with civil local rule 3-4. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #440 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 441 Proposed Order re #432 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to anti-SLAPP Motion Proposed Order granting motion to file under seal filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #432 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/17/2017) Modified on 9/18/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE DISREGARD. EXHIBITS re #436 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny Exhibit 45 redacted filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #436 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/17/2017) Modified on 9/18/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #428 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Strike Portions of the Corrected Expert Report of Gregory Cooper Ph.D. filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #428 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/17/2017)
September 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Statement Proof of Service by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/16/2017)
September 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 437 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny in Support of #436 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny, #431 Opposition/Response to Motion, #434 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 26, #4 Exhibit 27, #5 Exhibit 30, #6 Exhibit 33, #7 Exhibit 34, #8 Exhibit 38, #9 Exhibit 39, #10 Exhibit 43, #11 Exhibit 57, #12 Exhibit 60, #13 Exhibit 61, #14 Exhibit 64)(Related document(s) #436 , #431 , #434 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/16/2017)
September 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 436 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 20 redacted, #4 Exhibit 20 unredacted, #5 Exhibit 22 redacted, #6 Exhibit 22 unredacted, #7 Exhibit 23 redacted, #8 Exhibit 23 unredacted, #9 Exhibit 24 redacted, #10 Exhibit 24 unredacted, #11 Exhibit 25 redacted, #12 Exhibit 25 unredacted, #13 Exhibit 28 redacted, #14 Exhibit 28 unredacted, #15 Exhibit 29 redacted, #16 Exhibit 29 unredacted, #17 Exhibit 31 redacted, #18 Exhibit 31 unredacted, #19 Exhibit 32 redacted, #20 Exhibit 32 unredacted, #21 Exhibit 35 redacted, #22 Exhibit 35 unredacted, #23 Exhibit 36 redacted, #24 Exhibit 36 unredacted, #25 Exhibit 37 redacted, #26 Exhibit 37 unredacted, #27 Exhibit 40 redacted, #28 Exhibit 40 unredacted, #29 Exhibit 41 redacted, #30 Exhibit 41 unredacted, #31 Exhibit 42 redacted, #32 Exhibit 42 unredacted, #33 Exhibit 44 redacted, #34 Exhibit 44 unredacted, #35 Exhibit 45 redacted, #36 Exhibit 45 unredacted, #37 Exhibit 46 redacted, #38 Exhibit 46 unredacted, #39 Exhibit 47 redacted, #40 Exhibit 47 unredacted, #41 Exhibit 48 redacted, #42 Exhibit 48 unredacted, #43 Exhibit 49 redacted, #44 Exhibit 49 unredacted, #45 Exhibit 50 redacted, #46 Exhibit 50 unredacted, #47 Exhibit 51 redacted, #48 Exhibit 51 unredacted, #49 Exhibit 52 redacted, #50 Exhibit 52 unredacted, #51 Exhibit 53 redacted, #52 Exhibit 53 unredacted, #53 Exhibit 54 redacted, #54 Exhibit 54 unredacted, #55 Exhibit 55 redacted, #56 Exhibit 55 unredacted, #57 Exhibit 56 redacted, #58 Exhibit 56 unredacted, #59 Exhibit 58 redacted, #60 Exhibit 58 unredacted, #61 Exhibit 59 redacted, #62 Exhibit 59 unredacted, #63 Exhibit 62 redacted, #64 Exhibit 62 unredacted, #65 Exhibit 63 redacted, #66 Exhibit 63 unredacted, #67 Exhibit 65 redacted, #68 Exhibit 65 unredacted, #69 Exhibit 66 redacted, #70 Exhibit 66 unredacted, #71 Exhibit 67 redacted, #72 Exhibit 67 unredacted, #73 Exhibit 68 redacted, #74 Exhibit 68 unredacted)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/16/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 435 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Motio to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of document to file under seal, #4 Unredacted document to be filed under seal)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 434 DISREGARD ENTRY - ERRONEOUS ENTRY - OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #395 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/15/2017) Modified on 9/19/2017 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 433 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #395 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Redacted Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to anti-SLAPP Motion filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting motion to file under seal, #3 redacted version of opposition sought to be sealed, #4 Unredacted version of opposition sought to be sealed)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 431 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #400 MOTION to Strike [Illumina, Inc.'s Special Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Second and Third Counterclaims] ) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Anti-SLAPP Motion filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 430 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #418 MOTION Preclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 429 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Opposition to Preclude Malackowski Testimony filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Illumina's Opposition to Preclude Malackowski Testimony, #4 Unredacted Version of Illumina's Opposition to Preclude Malackowski Testimony, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit 6, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #17 Redacted Version of Exhibit 7, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #19 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #21 Redacted Version of Exhibit 9, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #23 Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, #24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #25 Redacted Version of Exhibit 11, #26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, #27 Redacted Version of Exhibit 12, #28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, #29 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13, #30 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 428 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #417 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Corrected Expert Report of Gregory Cooper, Ph.D. and to Preclude Reliance Thereon ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion to Strike filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion to Strike, #4 Unredacted Version of Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion to Strike, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 426 Declaration of Gregory Cooper, Ph. D. in Support of #424 Opposition/Response to Motion, #422 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #424 , #422 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 425 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Gregory Cooper In Support of Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Gregory Cooper filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of the Declaration of Gregory Cooper In Support of Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Gregory Cooper, #4 Unredacted Version of the Declaration of Gregory Cooper In Support of Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Preclude the Testimony of Gregory Cooper, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit H, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 424 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #401 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Gregory Cooper ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Opposition to Preclude Cooper Testimony filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Illumina's Opposition to Preclude Cooper Testimony, #4 Unredacted Version of Illumina's Opposition to Preclude Cooper Testimony, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 422 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #416 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Illumina's Opposition to Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 6, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 7, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #17 Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #19 Redacted Version of Exhibit 12, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston DENYING #414 Discovery Letter Brief. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #415 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 418 MOTION Preclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/15/2017. Replies due by 9/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ERRONEOUS ENTRY. CONFIDENTIAL INFO FILED. PLEASE DISREGARD & SEE DKT 442. MOTION to Strike Portions of the Corrected Expert Report of Gregory Cooper, Ph.D. and to Preclude Reliance Thereon filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/15/2017. Replies due by 9/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/7/2017) Modified on 9/19/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/19/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 416 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/15/2017. Replies due by 9/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 415 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibit A to the Joint Discovery Letter Regarding The Deposition of Dr. John Quackenbush filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward R. Reines, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A Redacted, #4 Exhibit A Unredacted, #5 Declaration of S. Adina Stohl, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Dr. John Quackenbush filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 413 CLERK'S NOTICE REl ARIOSA DIAGNOSTIC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL AT DOCKET NO. #398 . Counsel is reminded that Civ. L.R. 79-5(d)(1)(C) requires the filing of "A redacted version of the document that is sought to be filed under seal. The redacted version shall prominently display the notation REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT(S) SOUGHT TO BE SEALED. Counsel shall properly calendar all motions on the Court's calendar.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 412 Statement Proof of Service of Documents Sought to Be Filed Under Seal by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 411 EXHIBITS re #397 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina, Inc.'s Special Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Second and Third Counterclaims Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny ISO Motion to File Under Seal filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Redacted, #2 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Sealed, #3 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Redacted, #4 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Sealed, #5 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Redacted, #6 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Sealed, #7 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Sealed, #9 Exhibit Ex. 13 - Redacted, #10 Exhibit Ex. 13 - Sealed, #11 Exhibit Ex. 14 - Redacted, #12 Exhibit Ex. 14 - Sealed, #13 Exhibit Ex. 15 - Redaxcted, #14 Exhibit Ex. 15 - Sealed, #15 Exhibit Ex. 16 - Redaxcted, #16 Exhibit Ex. 16 - Sealed, #17 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #397 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny in Support of #394 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants Illumina, Inc. and Verinata Health, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1, 3-4, 10, 12-16, 19, 23-24, 26-33 Thereto filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #394 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 409 EXHIBITS re #394 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants Illumina, Inc. and Verinata Health, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1, 3-4, 10, 12-16, 19, 23-24, 26-33 Thereto filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Redacted, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Sealed, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Redacted, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Sealed, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Redacted, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Sealed, #7 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Sealed, #9 Exhibit Ex. 24 - Redacted, #10 Exhibit Ex. 24 - Sealed, #11 Exhibit Ex. 28 - Redacted, #12 Exhibit Ex. 28 - Sealed, #13 Exhibit Ex. 30 - Redacted, #14 Exhibit Ex. 30 - Sealed, #15 Exhibit Ex. 31 - Redacted, #16 Exhibit Ex. 31 - Sealed, #17 Exhibit Ex. 32 - Redacted, #18 Exhibit Ex. 32 - Sealed, #19 Exhibit Ex. 33 - Redacted, #20 Exhibit Ex. 33 - Sealed)(Related document(s) #394 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 408 NOTICE by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc. re #395 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants Illumina, Inc, and Verinata Health, Inc.'s Notice of Motion For Summary Judgment] (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 407 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: ARIOSA DIAGNOSTIC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL AT DOCKET NOS. #403 and #405 . Counsel is reminded that Civ. L.R. 79-5(d)(1)(C) requires the filing of "A redacted version of the document that is sought to be filed under seal. The redacted version shall prominently display the notation REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT(S) SOUGHT TO BE SEALED. Counsel shall properly calendar all motions on the Court's calendar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #395 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Statement Proof of Service of Documents Sought to Be Filed Under Seal by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/2/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Haberny Declaration in support of Ariosa's Motions filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of motion to file under seal, #2 Proposed Order granting motion to file under seal, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 6, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 7, #14 Unredactd Version of Exhibit 7, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #17 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, #19 Redacted Version of Exhibit 14, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #21 Redacted Version of Exhibit 16, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #23 Redacted Version of Exhibit 17, #24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #25 Redacted Version of Exhibit 19, #26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny in support of Ariosa's motions for summary judgment, to strike Cooper opinions, and to preclude testimony of Cooper and Malackowski filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit 18)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Preclude Testimony of Malackowski filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of motion to file under seal, #2 Proposed Order granting motion to file under seal, #3 Unredacted Version of Motion to Preclude Testimony of Malackowski)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #400 MOTION to Strike [Illumina, Inc.'s Special Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Second and Third Counterclaims] filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #400 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MOTION to Preclude Testimony of Gregory Cooper filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/15/2017. Replies due by 9/22/2017. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MOTION to Strike [Illumina, Inc.'s Special Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Second and Third Counterclaims] filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/15/2017. Replies due by 9/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike Portions of Cooper Opinions filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of motion to file under seal, #2 Proposed Order granting motion to file under seal, #3 LOCKED PER FILER'S REQUEST. SEE DKT. 442 FOR CORRECTED VERSION Redacted Version of Motion to Strike Cooper Opinions, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Strike Cooper Opinions)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/19/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/19/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/19/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/19/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in support of motion to file under seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting motion to file under seal, #3 Redacted Version of Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Ariosa's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 397 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Illumina, Inc.'s Special Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Second and Third Counterclaims filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Illumina, Inc.'s Special Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Second and Third Counterclaims, #4 Unredacted Version of Illumina, Inc.'s Special Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Second and Third Counterclaims, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #8 Redacted Version of Exhibit 6, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #10 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #12 Redacted Version of Exhibit 9, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #14 Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #16 Redacted Version of Exhibit 11, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, #18 Redacted Version of Exhibit 12, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, #20 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, #22 Redacted Version of Exhibit 14, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #24 Redacted Version of Exhibit 15, #25 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #26 Redacted Version of Exhibit 16, #27 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #29 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #395 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Proposed Order, #48 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #395 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. Responses due by 9/15/2017. Replies due by 9/22/2017. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants Illumina, Inc. and Verinata Health, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1, 3-4, 10, 12-16, 19, 23-24, 26-33 Thereto filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 12, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, #17 Redacted Version of Exhibit 14, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #19 Redacted Version of Exhibit 15, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #21 Redacted Version of Exhibit 16, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #23 Redacted Version of Exhibit 19, #24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #25 Redacted Version of Exhibit 23, #26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 23, #27 Redacted Version of Exhibit 24, #28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24, #29 Redacted Version of Exhibit 26, #30 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, #31 Redacted Version of Exhibit 27, #32 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27, #33 Redacted Version of Exhibit 28, #34 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 28, #35 Redacted Version of Exhibit 29, #36 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, #37 Redacted Version of Exhibit 30, #38 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30, #39 Redacted Version of Exhibit 31, #40 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31, #41 Redacted Version of Exhibit 32, #42 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, #43 Redacted Version of Exhibit 33, #44 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #45 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 393 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Adina Stohl (Stohl, Sara) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 392 NOTICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Cathy T. Moses (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 391 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) "Reserved" Motion Hearing date set for for 10/13/17 has been advanced to 10/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #389 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 389 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robert Vlasis, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11621158) filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order **clerical administrative docket update. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER, Motions terminated: #386 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO MODIFY DEADLINES filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/28/17. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 386 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines and to Continue Hearing on Dispositive Motions filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 385 EXHIBITS re #382 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - [Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Joint Discovery Letter Regarding Non-Disclosure of Inventor Disclosure Forms Dkt 361] filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #382 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 383 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/9/2017. Jury Selection set for 1/8/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 1/8/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.Total Time in Court 25 minutes. Court Reporter Name n/a. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/12/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL #361 #363 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 381 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER RE: MOTION TO SEAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY #374 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 5/15/2017. Case did not settle. (Not Reported) (Time: 4 hours)Attorney for Plaintiffs: Edward Reines. Attorneys for Defendants: Andrei Iancu; Sandy Haberny. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #373 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Discovery and Defendant Entities. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Discovery Letter Briefre: Deposition of Dr. Jian-Bing Fan filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 373 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Discovery and Defendant Entities filed by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.. (Thompson, Aaron) (Filed on 4/28/2017) Modified on 5/1/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 372 RESPONSE to #370 Declaration of Marcus Burch by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Moses, Cathy) (Filed on 4/26/2017) Modified on 4/27/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 4/26/2017. Plaintiff shall make a settlement demand on Defendant by May 5, 2017. The parties shall submit their settlement conference statements in accordance with the Court's April 17, 2017 Order by May 11, 2017. (Not Reported)Attorney for Plaintiffs: Edward Reines. Attorneys for Defendants: David Gindler (Ariosa); Robert Gunther (Roche). This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/26/2017)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Declaration of Marcus Burch in Support of #366 Order on Discovery Letter Brief, filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Related document(s) #366 ) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 5/15/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Terminate deadlines. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 369 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 4/26/2017 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Settlement Conference set for 5/15/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/17/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 368 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #361 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Discovery Letter re: Non-Disclosure of Inventor Disclosure Forms filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Related document(s) #361 ) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Declaration of Cathy Moses in Support of #363 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A To The Joint Discovery Letter Regarding Non-Disclosure Of Inventor Disclosure Forms filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #363 ) (Moses, Cathy) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY #357 #360 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 365 AMENDED MINUTES to #364 Minutes of Further Case Management Conference. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 364 (AMENDED by #365 Amended Minute Entry)Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/7/2017. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. Expert reports due 6/2/2017; rebuttal due 6/30/2017; Close of Expert Discovery due by 7/28/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/4/2017; oppositions due 8/18/2017; replies due 8/25/2017. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.Total Time in Court 35 Minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorneys: Edward Reines. Defendant Attorneys: Keith Slenkovich, Andrei Iancu. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/7/2017) Modified on 4/10/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/10/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A To The Joint Discovery Letter Regarding Non-Disclosure Of Inventor Disclosure Forms filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A Part 1, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A Part 2, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A Part 3, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #361 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Discovery Letter re: Non-Disclosure of Inventor Disclosure Forms Proof of Service of Documents Filed Under Seal (Moses, Cathy) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Discovery Letter re: Non-Disclosure of Inventor Disclosure Forms filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cathy Moses, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 (Unredacted - Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted - Filed Under Seal))(Moses, Cathy) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Discovery Letter Briefre: Non-Disclosure of Inventor Disclosure Forms filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal))(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 359 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A and B to Discovery Letter Seeking an Order Compelling Responses to Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Requests for Admission Nos. 124-29 and Portion of Discovery Letter (Moses, Cathy) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A and B to Discovery Letter Seeking an Order Compelling Responses to Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Requests for Admission Nos. 124-29 and Portion of Discovery Letter filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cathy Moses, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Discovery Letter Brief, #4 Unredacted Discovery Letter Brief (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit A (Unredacted - Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit B (Unredacted - Filed Under Seal))(Moses, Cathy) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Discovery Letter Brief Seeking an Order Compelling Responses to Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.s' Requests for Admission Nos. 124-29 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal))(Moses, Cathy) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 356 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ANSWER to Counterclaim [PLAINTIFFS ANSWER TO #352 ARIOSA DIAGNOSTICS, INC.S FOURTH AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS] byVerinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/17/2017) Modified on 3/20/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 354 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Christian Bunker for Illumina, Inc. (Bunker, Jared) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 353 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Andrew Edward Morrell re: withdrawal of Andrew E. Morrell as counsel for Illumina (Morrell, Andrew) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Answer to #349 Amended Complaint (Fourth), COUNTERCLAIM against Verinata Health, Inc. byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 3/10/2017) Modified on 3/17/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #326 Notice of Docketing (2017- 109): The petition is denied.(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 3 and Portions of Exhibits 5-8 to Declaration of Sandra Haberny In Support of Ariosa's Portion of Plaintiffs' Letter Seeking to Compel Depositions of Drs. Jacob Zahn and Eric Wang filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/8/17. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT for the Patent Infringement against Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Filed byVerinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/9/2017) Modified on 3/10/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #326 Notice of Docketing (2017- 109): The motion is granted. The brief is accepted for filing.(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #346 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dismissal of Stanford University and Claims Based on U.S. Patent No. 8,296,076, and Certain of Ariosa's Affirmative Defenses. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 346 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dismissal of Stanford University and Claims Based on U.S. Patent No. 8,296,076, and Certain of Ariosa's Affirmative Defenses filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER RE:DISCOVERY #338 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy Tran Moses (Moses, Cathy) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTICE of Appearance by David Abba Schwarz (Schwarz, David) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Sandra Linette Haberny Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Arka Chatterjee (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Letter from Sandra L. Haberny Regarding Deposition of Jian-Bing Fan. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #338 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 3 and Portions of Exhibits 5-8 to Declaration of Sandra Haberny In Support of Ariosa's Portion of Plaintiffs' Letter Seeking to Compel Depositions of Drs. Jacob Zahn and Eric Wang filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Related document(s) #338 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 339 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #338 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 3 and Portions of Exhibits 5-8 to Declaration of Sandra Haberny In Support of Ariosa's Portion of Plaintiffs' Letter Seeking to Compel Depositions of Drs. Jacob Zahn and Eric Wang (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 3 and Portions of Exhibits 5-8 to Declaration of Sandra Haberny In Support of Ariosa's Portion of Plaintiffs' Letter Seeking to Compel Depositions of Drs. Jacob Zahn and Eric Wang filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandra Haberny, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted Version Sought to Be Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 5 (Unredacted Version Sought to Be Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 6 (Unredacted Version Sought to Be Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 7 (Unredacted Version Sought to Be Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 8 (Unredacted Version Sought to Be Filed Under Seal))(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Declaration of Sandra Haberny in Support of #336 Letter (Ariosa's Portion) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal))(Related document(s) #336 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Letter from Edward R. Reines Regarding Deposition Witnesses. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/17/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Total Time in Court 20 minutes. Court Reporter Name n/a. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/21/2017)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Amir Naini (Naini, Amir) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 333 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Further Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #322 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #321 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER DENYING ILLUMINA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS #309 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 328 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Joint] filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by Elaine Zhong On Behalf Of Defendant Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. (Zhong, Elaine) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit: Briefing Schedule. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Declaration of Sandra Haberny in Support of #322 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Illumina's Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions and Exhibit E filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #322 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Notice of Docketing from USCA for the Federal Circuit (17-109). (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 323 REPLY (re #309 MOTION for Leave to File Illumina Inc.'s Amended Infingement Contentions ) filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Illumina's Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions and Exhibit E filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Illumina's Reply, #4 Unredacted Version of Illumina's Reply, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit E to Illumina's Reply, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E to Illumina's Reply, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #309 MOTION for Leave to File Illumina Inc.'s Amended Infingement Contentions. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. * Counsel is reminded to schedule all motion hearings during the docketing process, otherwise it will not be on the Court's calendar. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Sandra Haberny in Support of Opposition to Illumina Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandra Haberny, #2 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted), #3 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #4 Proposed Order)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 320 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #309 MOTION for Leave to File Illumina Inc.'s Amended Infingement Contentions ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandra Haberny, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS' INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS. GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART #300 plaintiffs motion to strike. Denying #316 Roches motion for leave to file a sur-reply. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/19/2017) Modified on 1/20/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 318 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #316 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply ) filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Letter from Edward R. Reines To District Judge Susan Illston. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in support of #308 its opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proposed Surreply)(Thompson, Aaron) (Filed on 1/16/2017) Modified on 1/17/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Letter from Sandra L. Haberny and Robert J. Gunther Regarding Citation of Supplemental Authority. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/16/2017)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Declaration of Sandra Haberny in Support of #310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A,B and C to Declaration of Derek C. Walter In Support of Illumina Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #310 ) (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #311 Reply to Opposition/Response, #312 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28, #2 Exhibit 29, #3 Exhibit 30, #4 Exhibit 31, #5 Exhibit 32, #6 Exhibit 33, #7 Exhibit 34, #8 Exhibit 35, #9 Exhibit 36, #10 Exhibit 37, #11 Exhibit 38, #12 Exhibit 39, #13 Exhibit 40, #14 Exhibit 41, #15 Exhibit 42, #16 Exhibit 43, #17 Exhibit 44, #18 Exhibit 45, #19 Exhibit 46, #20 Exhibit 47, #21 Exhibit 48, #22 Exhibit 49)(Related document(s) #311 , #312 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 REPLY to #307 Opposition to (re #300 Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s [Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Contentions] ) [Illumina's Reply to Ariosa's Opposition to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Contentions] filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/6/2017) Modified on 1/9/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 311 REPLY to #308 Opposition to (re #300 Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.'s [Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Contentions] ) filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/6/2017) Modified on 1/9/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/9/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A,B and C to Declaration of Derek C. Walter In Support of Illumina Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MOTION for Leave to File Illumina Inc.'s Amended Infingement Contentions filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 308 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #300 MOTION to Strike [Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Contentions] ) filed byRoche Molecular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Thompson, Aaron) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #300 MOTION to Strike [Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Contentions] ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #300 MOTION to Strike [Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Contentions]. Opposition/Responses due by 12/23/2016. Replies due by 1/6/2017. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (303) Stipulation on Briefing Scheudle re 300 [Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Contentions in case 3:12-cv-05501-SI. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (304) Stipulation Regarding Protective Order in case 3:12-cv-05501-SI. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 304 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Protective Order filed by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.. (Thompson, Aaron) (Filed on 12/9/2016) Modified on 12/12/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 303 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER on Briefing Scheudle re #300 [Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Contentions] Stipulation and Proposed Order to Modify Briefing Schedule filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 12/8/2016) Modified on 12/9/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 302 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #300 MOTION to Strike [Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Contentions]. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #300 MOTION to Strike [Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Contentions] filed byIllumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(Related document(s) #300 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MOTION to Strike [Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Invalidity Contentions] filed by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/15/2016. Replies due by 12/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 299 [ILLUMINA, INC.S ANSWER TO #291 ROCHE MOLECULAR SYSTEMS, INC.S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS TO ILLUMINA, INC.S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT] byIllumina, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 11/7/2016) Modified on 11/8/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 298 JUDGE ILLSTON'S PRETRIAL INSTRUCTIONS (STANDING ORDER). (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #296 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10900435.) filed by Roche Molecular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix)(Khan, Omar) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 295 AMENDED Minute Entry (correcting the time of the pretrial conference) for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/28/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 10/2/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 10/2/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2017 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.Total Time in Court 23 minutes(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 294 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/31/16. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2016: #2 Standing Order) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 * See Document #295 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/28/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 10/2/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 10/2/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.Total Time in Court 23 minutes. Court Reporter Name n/a. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/31/2016) Modified on 11/1/2016 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Shawn Thompson (Thompson, Aaron) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 First Amended ANSWER to First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Illumina, Inc.(14-1921) byRoche Molecular Systems, Inc.. (Slenkovich, Keith) (Filed on 10/24/2016) Modified on 10/25/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 [ILLUMINA, INC.S ANSWER TO #284 ROCHE MOLECULAR SYSTEMS, INC.S COUNTERCLAIMS TO ILLUMINA, INC.S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT] byIllumina, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/21/2016) Modified on 10/24/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 288 [ILLUMINA, INC.S ANSWER TO #283 ARIOSA DIAGNOSTICS, INC.S COUNTERCLAIMS TO ILLUMINA, INC.S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT byIllumina, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/21/2016) Modified on 10/24/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 287 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Morrell as counsel for Illumina, Inc. (Morrell, Andrew) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan E Bachand as counsel for Illumina, Inc. (Bachand, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 285 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Illumina, Inc. byRoche Molecular Systems, Inc.. (Slenkovich, Keith) (Filed on 9/30/2016) Modified on 10/3/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s ANSWER to First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Illumina, Inc. by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/30/2016) Modified on 10/3/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order *VACATE 10/28/16 RESERVED DATE FOR RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Letter from Andrei Iancu regarding First Amended Complaint in Case No. 15-cv-02216. (Gordon, Joshua) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Letter from Keith L. Slenkovich regarding Docket No. 278. (Slenkovich, Keith) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 280 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re (267 in 3:12-cv-05501-SI),(56 in 3:14-cv-01921-SI).(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MANDATE of USCA as to (267 in 3:12-cv-05501-SI) Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Illumina, Inc., (56 in 3:14-cv-01921-SI) Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Illumina, Inc. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/1/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.Total Time in Court 23 minutes. Court Reporter Name n/a. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/1/2016)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Gunther, Jr On Behalf Of Defendant Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. (Gunther, Robert) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Leonard Slenkovich On Behalf Of Defendant Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. (Slenkovich, Keith) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 275 CLERK'S NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco, consolidated with C-14-1921 and C-15-2216. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/29/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Letter from Edward R. Reines to District Judge Susan Illston. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 272 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Illumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 271 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Further Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Counsel shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement one week prior to the conference. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Notice of Entry of USCA JUDGMENT Accompanied by Opinion as to #267 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit: Affirmed.(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc. of Withdrawal of Attorney Anant N. Pradhan (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Notice of Docketing - USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 15-1970 USCA for the Federal Circuit for #267 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Illumina, Inc.. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Appeal Remark: Notice of Appeal #267 forwarded to US Court of Federal Circuit by e-mail. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Illumina, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-9799914. Appeal Record due by 9/30/2015. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION #250 #251 #261 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 REPLY (re #250 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 4 ) filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Exhibits 1 and 2 Thereto filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Related document(s) #261 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTIONS TO DISMISS #27 #28 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/10/2015) Modified on 8/10/2015 (tfS, COURT STAFF). * Case consolidated with C-12-5501 SI. (Future filings shall be made in lead case C-12-5501 SI)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Exhibits 1 and 2 Thereto (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Exhibits 1 and 2 Thereto filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #4 Unredacted Version of Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 RESPONSE to (re #250 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 4); -Ariosa's Opposition to Illumina's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #2 Exhibit 1 (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal))(Gindler, David) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #258 Stipulation to Modify Briefing and continuing hearing date to 9/4/15 at 9:00 a.m. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #250 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 4. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #250 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 4; -Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Modify Briefing Schedule filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LIMITED LIFT OF STAY #249 #256 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Administrative Motion To Take Illumina, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration Off Calendar filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Responses due by 8/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 RESPONSE (re #249 MOTION [ILLUMINA, INC.S ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR LIMITED LIFT OF STAY] ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Order Granting Temporary, Limited Lift of Stay)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Declaration of Lauren N. Drake in Support of #251 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO 9 U.S.C. 4 AND EXHIBITS 1, 2, 5, 6, AND 9 THROUGH 12 THERETO filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #251 ) (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Sonal N. Mehta by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/23/2015) Modified on 7/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to #249 MOTION [ILLUMINA, INC.S ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR LIMITED LIFT OF STAY] (Reason: Correcting an error) filed byIllumina, Inc.. Responses due by 7/24/2015. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO 9 U.S.C. 4 AND EXHIBITS 1, 2, 5, 6, AND 9 THROUGH 12 THERETO filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #5 Exhibit 1 Redacted Version, #6 Exhibit 1 CONF Unredacted Version, #7 Exhibit 2 Redacted Version, #8 Exhibit 2 CONF Unredacted Version, #9 Exhibit 5 Redacted Version, #10 Exhibit 5 CONF Unredacted Version, #11 Exhibit 6 Redacted Version, #12 Exhibit 6 CONF Unredacted Version, #13 Exhibit 9 Redacted Version, #14 Exhibit 9 CONF Unredacted Version, #15 Exhibit 10 Redacted Version, #16 Exhibit 10 CONF Unredacted Version, #17 Exhibit 11 Redacted Version, #18 Exhibit 11 CONF Unredacted Version, #19 Exhibit 12 Redacted Version, #20 Exhibit 12 CONF Unredacted Version, #21 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Pursuant To 9 U.S.C. 4 filed by Illumina, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/3/2015. Replies due by 8/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MOTION [ILLUMINA, INC.S ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR LIMITED LIFT OF STAY] filed by Illumina, Inc.. Responses due by 8/3/2015. Replies due by 8/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER RELATING CASE to C-15-2216 SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/2/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Illumina, Inc. re #245 MOTION to Relate Case [No. 15-cv-02216 Pursuant To Civil Local Rule 3-12(b)], #246 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Illumina, Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION to Relate Case [No. 15-cv-02216 Pursuant To Civil Local Rule 3-12(b)] filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward R. Reines, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL #236 #238 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Declaration of Lauren N. Drake in Support of #236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 10 To Plaintiffs Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.s Third Motion To Stay And Portions Of Exhibit 15 To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.s Reply In Support Of Motion To Stay filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #236 ) (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Declaration of Michele A. Gauger in Support of #238 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Dkt. Nos. 216-11, 224, 225-7, and 225-27 filed byIllumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Related document(s) #238 ) (Gauger, Michele) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 CLERK'S NOTICE : the motion to stay case filed was docketed as if it were a pending motion. This motion has been resolved and was just being refilled pursuant to the order ruling on motions to seal. The June 26, 2015 hearing date is vacated as there is not a pending motion. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #233 MOTION to Stay. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #238 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Dkt. Nos. 216-11, 224, 225-7, and 225-27 (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Dkt. Nos. 216-11, 224, 225-7, and 225-27 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren N. Drake, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Dkt. No. 216-11, #4 Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 216-11, #5 Redacted Version of Dkt. No. 224, #6 Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 224, #7 Redacted Version of Dkt. No. 225-7, #8 Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 225-7, #9 Redacted Version of Dkt. No. 225-27, #10 Unredacted Version of Dkt. No. 225-27)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 RESPONSE/Opposition to #208 Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Third Motion to Stay by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc. re #231 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/1/2015) Modified on 5/1/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 10 To Plaintiffs Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.s Third Motion To Stay And Portions Of Exhibit 15 To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.s Reply In Support Of Motion To Stay filed by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele A. Gauger, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Exhibit 13 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ariosa's Third Motion to Stay (Dkt. No. 216-17) Resubmitted Pursuant to Court's Order (Dkt. No. 231) by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #231 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(Gindler, David) (Filed on 5/1/2015) Modified on 5/4/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/4/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Exhibit 7 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ariosa's Third Motion to Stay (Dkt. No. 216-5) Resubmitted Pursuant to Court's Order (Dkt. No. 231) by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #231 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 5/1/2015) Modified on 5/4/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Motion to Stay Litigation (Dkt. No. 208-3) Resubmitted Pursuant Court's Order (Dkt. No. 231) by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #231 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 5/1/2015) Modified on 5/4/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #231 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Ariosa's Motion to Stay (Dkt. No. 208-3) by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART THE PARTIES' MOTIONS TO SEAL #208 #216 #225 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER DISMISSING MOTIONS PENDING STAY #179 #180 #186 #189 #202 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Vacating hearing on all motions due to stay. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order vacating trial dates due to stay (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S THIRD MOTION TO STAY #179 #189 #207 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Ariosa's Reply and Exhibits Thereto filed byIllumina, Inc., Verinata Health, Inc.. (Related document(s) #225 ) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonal N. Mehta (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Ariosa's Reply and Exhibits Thereto (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 1/24/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Ariosa's Reply and Exhibits Thereto filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Ex. 2, #4 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2, #5 Redacted Version of Ex. 3, #6 Unredacted Version of Ex. 3, #7 Redacted Version of Ex. 4, #8 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4, #9 Redacted Version of Ex. 5, #10 Unredacted Version of Ex. 5, #11 Redacted Version of Ex. 6, #12 Unredacted Version of Ex. 6, #13 Redacted Version of Ex. 9, #14 Unredacted Version of Ex. 9, #15 Redacted Version of Ex. 10, #16 Unredacted Version of Ex. 10, #17 Redacted Version of Ex. 11, #18 Unredacted Version of Ex. 11, #19 Redacted Version of Ex. 12, #20 Unredacted Version of Ex. 12A, #21 Unredacted Version of Ex. 12B, #22 Redacted Version of Ex. 13, #23 Unredacted Version of Ex. 13A, #24 Unredacted Version of Ex. 13B, #25 Redacted Version of Ex. 14, #26 Unredacted Version of Ex. 14, #27 Redacted Version of Ex. 15, #28 Unredacted Version of Ex. 15, #29 Redacted Version of Ex. 16, #30 Unredacted Version of Ex. 16)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 REPLY (re #207 MOTION to Stay ) Reply ISO Ariosa's Motion to Stay filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/21/2015.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time n/a. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Declaration of Lauren N. Drake in Support of #216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Third Motion To Stay filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #216 ) (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Roche Molecular Systems, Inc. for Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc. re #216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Third Motion To Stay (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Declaration of Gautam Kollu in Support of #217 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byIllumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Related document(s) #217 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Declaration of Anant N. Pradhan in Support of #217 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byIllumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 [Redacted], #8 Exhibit 8 [Redacted], #9 Exhibit 9 [Redacted], #10 Exhibit 10 [Redacted], #11 Exhibit 11 [Redacted], #12 Exhibit 12 [Redacted], #13 Exhibit 13 [Redacted], #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15 [Redacted])(Related document(s) #217 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 RESPONSE (re #207 MOTION to Stay ) [Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Third Motion To Stay]] filed byIllumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Third Motion To Stay filed by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele A. Gauger, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Third Motion To Stay, #4 Unredacted Confidential Version of Of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Third Motion To Stay, #5 Exhibit 7 [Redacted Version], #6 Exhibit 7 [Unredacted Confidential Version], #7 Exhibit 8 [Redacted Version], #8 Exhibit 8 [Unredacted Confidential Version], #9 Exhibit 9 [Redacted Version], #10 Exhibit 9 [Unredacted Confidential Version], #11 Exhibit 10 [Redacted Version], #12 Exhibit 10 [Unredacted Confidential Version], #13 Exhibit 11 [Redacted Version], #14 Exhibit 11 [Unredacted Confidential Version], #15 Exhibit 12 [Redacted Version], #16 Exhibit 12 [Unredacted Confidential Version], #17 Exhibit 13 [Redacted Version], #18 Exhibit 13 [Unredacted Confidential Version], #19 Exhibit 15 [Redacted Version], #20 Exhibit 15 [Unredacted Confidential Version])(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/16/2015) Modified on 1/20/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 CLERK'S NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2015 03:00 PM (instead of 10 a.m.) in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #189 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions, #179 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. All motions pending in this case are now scheduled for hearing on 2/6/15. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (211) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-05501-SI; enlarging time for Illumina's Opposition. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to (207 in 3:12-cv-05501-SI) MOTION to Stay . Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME FOR ILLUMINAS OPPOSITION re #207 MOTION to Stay filed by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 1/2/2015) Modified on 1/5/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ariosa's Motion to Stay Litigation and Exhibits Thereto filed byIllumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Related document(s) #208 ) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ariosa's Motion to Stay Litigation and Exhibits Thereto (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ariosa's Motion to Stay Litigation and Exhibits Thereto filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Ariosa's Motion to Stay Litigation, #4 Unredacted Version of Ariosa's Motion to Stay Litigation, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit Q, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Q, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit R, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit R, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit S, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit S, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit V, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit V)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION to Stay filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/16/2015. Replies due by 1/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F (Under Seal), #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q (Under Seal), #19 Exhibit R (Under Seal), #20 Exhibit S (Under Seal), #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V (Under Seal), #24 Proposed Order)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 REPLY (re #189 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny, #2 Exhibit A)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Declaration of Lauren N. Drake in Support of #202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File Amended Invalidity Contentions and Exhibits 2, 11, 12 and 13 Thereto filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #202 ) (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #203 Opposition/Response to Motion, Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File Amended Invalidity Contentions filed byIllumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted Version, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 - Redacted Version, #12 Exhibit 12 - Redacted Version, #13 Exhibit 13 - Redacted Version)(Related document(s) #203 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 RESPONSE (re #189 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions ) [Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File Amended Invalidity Contentions] filed byIllumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File Amended Invalidity Contentions and Exhibits 2, 11, 12 and 13 Thereto filed by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele A. Gauger, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted - Public Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File Amended Invalidity Contentions, #4 Unredacted - Confidential Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File Amended Invalidity Contentions, #5 Exhibit 2 - Redacted Version, #6 Exhibit 2 - Unredacted Confidential Version, #7 Exhibit 11 - Redacted Version, #8 Exhibit 11 - Unredacted Confidential Version, #9 Exhibit 12 - Redacted Version, #10 Exhibit 12 - Unredacted Confidential Version, #11 Exhibit 13 - Redacted Version, #12 Exhibit 13 - Unredacted Confidential Version, #13 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/16/14, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Official Reporter, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (198 in 3:12-cv-05501-SI) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2015. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Gauger, Michele) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER RE: US PATENT NO. 7,955,794 #171 #176 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 12/16/2014.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time Katherine Sullivan. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (195) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-05501-SI for Courtroom Equipment (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request and [Proposed] Order Regarding Courtroom Equipment for Claim Construction Hearing filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 CLERK'S NOTICE Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/16/2014 10:00 AM. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 REPLY (re #179 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims ) Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Leave to File Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/4/14, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Official Reporter, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #185 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/30/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2015. (Related documents(s) #185 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Declaration of Arka D. Chatterjee in Support of #186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Answer And Counterclaims and Exhibits 2-8 Thereto filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #186 ) (Chatterjee, Arka) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/19/2014. Replies due by 12/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arka D. Chatterjee, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 12/5/2014) Modified on 12/8/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Declaration of Derek C. Walter in Support of #187 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byIllumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #187 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 RESPONSE/Opposition to (re #179 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims ) filed byIllumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/4/2014) Modified on 12/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Answer And Counterclaims and Exhibits 2-8 Thereto filed by Illumina, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele A. Gauger, #2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), #3 Unredacted Version - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Answer And Counterclaims, #4 Redacted Version - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Answer And Counterclaims, #5 Exhibit 2 - Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, #7 Exhibit 3 - Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #9 Exhibit 4 - Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 4 - Redacted, #11 Exhibit 5 - Unredacted, #12 Exhibit 5 - Redacted, #13 Exhibit 6 - Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 6 - Redacted, #15 Exhibit 7 - Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 7 - Redacted, #17 Exhibit 8 - Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 8 - Redacted, #19 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Tutorial Hearing held on 12/4/2014.Court Reporter Name Katherine Sullivan. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/4/2014)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER re Courtroom Equipment for the Technology Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing by Judge Susan Illston granting (182) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-05501-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Courtroom Equipment for the Technology Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ariosa's Proposed Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ariosa's Proposed Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arka D. Chatterjee, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Ariosa's Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims, #4 Unredacted Version of Ariosa's Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/4/2014. Replies due by 12/11/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arka D. Chatterjee, #2 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 11/20/2014) Modified on 11/21/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Declaration of Arka D. Chatterjee in Support of #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Illumina, Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 5 Thereto filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Related document(s) #176 ) (Chatterjee, Arka) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 REDACTED REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (re #171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ILLUMINA, INC.S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF and Exhibit 1 Thereto, #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Illumina, Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 5 Thereto ) filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 5 Redacted)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 11/14/2014) Modified on 11/17/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Illumina, Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 5 Thereto filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Illumina, Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief, #4 Unredacted Illumina, Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief, #5 Redacted Exhibit 5 Regarding Illumina, Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief, #6 Unredacted Exhibit 5 Regarding Illumina, Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Responsive Claim Construction Brief For U.S. Patent No. 7,955,794 filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11 Part 1, #13 Exhibit 11 Part 2)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 CLERK'S NOTICE advancing hearing times for both the tutorial and claims construction hearing. Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/11/2014 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 12/4/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Declaration of Arka D. Chatterjee in Support of #171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ILLUMINA, INC.S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF and Exhibit 1 Thereto filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #171 ) (Chatterjee, Arka) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Declaration of Derek C. Walter In Support of Illumina, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byIllumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ILLUMINA, INC.S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF and Exhibit 1 Thereto filed by Illumina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of ILLUMINA, INC.S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF, #4 Unredacted Version of ILLUMINA, INC.S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF, #5 Exhibit 1 Redacted version, #6 Exhibit 1 Unredacted version, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL #167 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 CLERK'S NOTICE : The parties are reminded to comply with Civil Local Rule 3-4(b) when filing documents. The Court has noticed that some document are filed in one case and not in another. Counsel shall file in the lead case only and caption the document according to the local rule. Civil Local Rule 3-4(b): (b) Caption for Consolidated Cases. When filing papers in cases consolidated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42, the caption of each paper must denote the lead case number above all consolidated case numbers. Duplicate originals, however, are not required for associated cases. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
September 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #167 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Deposition Transcript of Dr. Craig Struble (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 9/28/2014)
September 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Deposition Transcript of Dr. Craig Struble filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Yu, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to the Discovery Letter Regarding Craig Struble's Deposition (Case No. 12-5501, Dkt. No. 151; Case No. 14-1921, Dkt. No. 48), #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to the Discovery Letter Regarding Craig Struble's Deposition (Case No. 12-5501, Dkt. No. 151; Case No. 14-1921, Dkt. No. 48))(Gindler, David) (Filed on 9/28/2014)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL -- CORRECTED (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL #163 in case 3:12-cv-05501-SI; #69 in case 3:14-cv-01921-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #163 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Deposition Transcripts of Drs. Jacob Zahn and Craig Struble (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Deposition Transcripts of Drs. Jacob Zahn and Craig Struble filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Yu, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to the Discovery Letter Regarding Jacob Zahn's Deposition (Case No. 12-5501, Dkt. No. 149; Case No. 14-1921, Dkt. No. 45), #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to the Discovery Letter Regarding Jacob Zahn's Deposition (Case No. 12-5501, Dkt. No. 149; Case No. 14-1921, Dkt. No. 45), #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to the Discovery Letter Regarding Craig Struble's Deposition (Case No. 12-5501, Dkt. No. 151; Case No. 14-1921, Dkt. No. 48), #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to the Discovery Letter Regarding Craig Struble's Deposition (Case No. 12-5501, Dkt. No. 151; Case No. 14-1921, Dkt. No. 48))(Gindler, David) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL #160 in case 3:12-cv-05501-SI; #61 in case 3:14-cv-01921-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc re #160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Deposition Transcripts of Drs. Jacob Zahn and Craig Struble (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Deposition Transcripts of Drs. Jacob Zahn and Craig Struble filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sandra L. Haberny, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to the Discovery Letter Regarding Jacob Zahn's Deposition (Case No. 12-5501, Dkt. No. 149; Case No. 14-1921, Dkt. No. 45), #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to the Discovery Letter Regarding Jacob Zahn's Deposition (Case No. 12-5501, Dkt. No. 149; Case No. 14-1921, Dkt. No. 45), #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to the Discovery Letter Regarding Craig Struble's Deposition (Case No. 12-5501, Dkt. No. 151; Case No. 14-1921, Dkt. No. 48), #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to the Discovery Letter Regarding Craig Struble's Deposition (Case No. 12-5501, Dkt. No. 151; Case No. 14-1921, Dkt. No. 48))(Gindler, David) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER : (1) RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES; AND (2) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL #148 #149 #150 #151 3:12-cv-05501-SI; #44 #45 #47 #48 3:14-cv-01921-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Letter from David I. Gindler re: Plaintiffs' Letter Dated September 1, 2014. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Letter from Edward Reines Regarding Ariosa's September 1 Filings Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Resumed Depositions of Jacob Zahn and Craig Struble. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Letter from David I. Gindler Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Ariosa's Cross-Motion for a Protective Order with respect to the Deposition of Dr. Craig Struble. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 9/1/2014)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Letter from David I. Gindler re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Dr. Jacob Zahn to Appear for a Second Day of Deposition Questioning. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 9/1/2014)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Letter from David I. Gindler re: Plaintiffs' Letter Dated August 26, 2014. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Letter from Edward R. Reines Regarding Citation of Supplemental Authority Regarding Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Patent Local Rule 4-2 and 4-3 Deadlines filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A to Joint Discovery Letter Re Dr. Craig Struble filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re Dr. Craig Struble filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (filed under seal))(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A to Joint Discovery Letter Re Dr. Jacob Zahn filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re Dr. Jacob Zahn filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal))(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (146) Stipulated Protective Order in case 3:12-cv-05501-SI; granting (41) Stipulation in case 3:14-cv-01921-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER, Motions terminated: (144 in 3:12-cv-05501-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE filed by Verinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, (33 in 3:14-cv-01921-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE filed by Illumina, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/11/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/11/2014 03:30 PM. (corrected date from previous entry) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE #142 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Ariosa Depositions filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/5/2014 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 6/6/2014). The Court ordered these cases consolidated. Counsel shall draft a proposed scheduling order Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/11/2014 03:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2015 03:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 7/27/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 7/27/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Tutorial Hearing set for 12/4/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 6/6/14 has been advanced to Thursday, 6/5/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Supplemental JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. A joint case management conference statement must be filed in both cases one week prior to the conference. The 7/23/14 case management conference previously scheduled in 12-5501 is vacated. this is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #131 Motion to Relate Case signed by Judge Illston on 5/8/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER RELATING CASE to 14-1921 JD. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/8/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 REPLY (re #131 MOTION to Relate Case to 14-cv-01921-JD ) In Support of Motion to Relate Cases filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 RESPONSE (re #131 MOTION to Relate Case to 14-cv-01921-JD ) filed byThe Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Letter from Edward R. Reines On Behalf of Verinata Health, Inc. and The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Regarding Newly Filed Illumina Lawsuit. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Letter from David I. Gindler On Behalf of Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Regarding Newly Filed Illumina Lawsuit. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION to Relate Case to 14-cv-01921-JD filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josh B. Gordon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS #117 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Amir Naini (Naini, Amir) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE #126 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL #120 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Custodial Discovery filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 REPLY (re #117 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions ) filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Declaration of Lauren N. Drake in Support of #120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1, 3, and 4 to Opposition to Ariosa's Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #120 ) (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 EXHIBITS re #111 Order [REDACTED EXHIBIT 9 TO OPPOSITION TO ARIOSA'S SECOND MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION] filed byThe Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Related document(s) #111 ) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc. re #120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1, 3, and 4 to Opposition to Ariosa's Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 RESPONSE (re #117 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions ) filed byThe Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 4 (Redacted))(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1, 3, and 4 to Opposition to Ariosa's Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek Walter, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Benjamin Gordon (Gordon, Joshua) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Nicole Drake (Drake, Lauren) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 4/1/2014. Replies due by 4/8/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David I. Gindler, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #115 Stipulation Re: ORDER OF DISMISSAL REGARDING LABCORP. only (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL (REGARDING LABCORP) filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #112 Motion to Amend/Correct. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Declaration of Derek Walter in Support of #112 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions Pursuant To Patent L.R. 3-6 filed byThe Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #112 ) (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/12/2014) Modified on 2/13/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions Pursuant To Patent L.R. 3-6 filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 2/26/2014. Replies due by 3/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 2/12/2014) Modified on 2/13/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL re #104 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/29/2014) Modified on 1/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Supplemental Declaration of Amir Naini in Support of #109 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Sealing Exhibit 9 To Verinata's Opposition to Ariosa's Second Motion to Stay filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #109 ) (Naini, Amir) (Filed on 1/20/2014) Modified on 1/21/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL #104 . This denial is without prejudice to Ariosa refiling its declaration, no later than January 20, 2014. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/13/2014) Modified on 1/14/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION TO STAY #103 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REPLY (re #103 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review ) ISO Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David I. Gindler, #2 Exhibit 28, #3 Exhibit 29, #4 Exhibit 30, #5 Exhibit 31, #6 Exhibit 32, #7 Exhibit 33, #8 Exhibit 34)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Declaration of Amir Naini in Support of #104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 9 to Opposition to Ariosa's Second Motion to Stay Litigation filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #104 ) (Naini, Amir) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RESPONSE (re #103 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review ) filed byThe Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 9 to Opposition to Ariosa's Second Motion to Stay Litigation filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order Denying Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/27/2013. Replies due by 1/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Gindler, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Proposed Order)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #101 Stipulation REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/15/13. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 11/15/2013). Re: 11-6391 -Final judgment will issue. Re: 12-0132 -The parties will file a jointly submitted form of judgment. Re: 12-0865 -Trial scheduled. Motion: 9/19/14 (file 8/15/14, oppose 8/29/14, reply 9/5/14), Pretrial: 10/21/14, 2 wk Jury Trial: 11/3/14. Counsel shall submit a proposed order with the litigation schedule. Re: 12-5501 -Trial scheduled. Motion: 12/19/14 (file 11/14/14, oppose 12/1/14, reply 12/8/14), Pretrial 2/10/15, 2 wk Jury Trial: 2/23/15. Counsel shall submit a proposed order with the litigation schedule. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing Jury Selection set for 2/23/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 2/23/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2014 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2015 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/13/13 is continued to 11/14/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 11/6/13 is continued to 11/13/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/5/13. Motions terminated: (143 in 3:12-cv-00865-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Verinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, (257 in 3:11-cv-06391-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Schedule For Further Case Management Statement filed by Sequenom, Inc, (139 in 3:12-cv-00132-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Schedule For Further Case Management Statement filed by Sequenom, Inc, (96 in 3:12-cv-05501-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Verinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (251) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06391-SI; granting (135) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-00132-SI; granting (139) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-00865-SI; granting (93) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-05501-SI. Stipulated Addendum To Protective Order (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Stipulated Addendum to Protective Order] filed by Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER, Motions terminated: (91 in 3:12-cv-05501-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Verinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, (136 in 3:12-cv-00865-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Verinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/21/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Letter from Edward R. Reines & David I. Gindler Regarding Production of Computer Source Code. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/1/13 is continued to 11/6/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc for Court Reporter Connie Kuhl. (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Minute Entry: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 9/16/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 9/17/2013). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc. for Court Reporter Connie Kuhl. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Minute Entry: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 9/12/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 9/13/2013). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/13/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/16/2013 10:00 AM to 12:00 PM (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (222) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06391-SI; granting (125) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-00132-SI; granting (126) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-00865-SI re: equipment (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Statement Technology Tutorial by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2)(Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 CLERKS NOTICE Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/12/2013 09:30 AM. The Court has consolidated the claims construction hearing for all cases and has schedule all cases for September 12, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 9/13/13 is continued to 11/1/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Claims Construction Hearing set for August 22, 2013 in case no. 12-5501 has been continued to THURSDAY SEPTEMBER 12, 2013 at 9:30am. The claims construction hearing for the remaining cases will remain as scheduled (8/22/2013 at 09:30 AM.) This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/22/2013 09:30 AM and 9/12/2013 at 9:30 AM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/12/2013 09:30 AM. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Letter from Edward R. Reines Regarding Claim Construction Hearing Scheduling. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Statement [Technology Tutorial Presentation] by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Technology Tutorial Presentation Part 2)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CLERKS NOTICE: Claims Construction Hearing set for August 6, 7 and 8, 2013 has been continued to THURSDAY, AUGUST 22, 2013. The hearing will be held 9:00 a.m. to 4:30 p.m. Counsel shall allocate their time accordingly (8/22/2013 09:30 AM.)This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/22/2013 09:30 AM. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/31/13, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2013. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 8/4/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Chatterjee, Arka) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Chatterjee, Arka) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 7/31/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 8/1/2013). (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2013)
July 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL #97 in case 3:12-cv-00865-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/21/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Brief re #68 Claim Construction Statement,, [VERINATA AND STANFORDS REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF FOR U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,296,076 AND 8,318,430] filed byThe Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Ariosa and LabCorp's Responsive Claim Construction Brief for '076 and '430 Patents filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Arka D. Chatterjee, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Anant N. Pradhan as counsel for Verinata Health, Inc., and The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University (Pradhan, Anant) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ON MOTION TO CLARIFY OR MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER #175 #193 in case 3:11-cv-06391-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO STAY #166 in case 3:11-cv-06391-SI; #77 in case 3:12-cv-00865-SI; #61 in case 3:12-cv-05501-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT FOR U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,296,076 AND 8,318,430 filed by The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek C. Walter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY (re #61 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review Of The '430 And '076 Patent ) Reply ISO Motion To Stay Pending Inter Partes Review Of The '430 And '076 Patents filed byAriosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amir Naini, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 15, #11 Exhibit 16)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE (re #61 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review Of The '430 And '076 Patent ) filed byThe Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review Of The '430 And '076 Patent filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 5/24/2013. Replies due by 5/31/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amir Naini, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order Granting Stay Pending IPR)(Gindler, David) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 9/6/113 is continued to 9/13/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Susan lllston granting #55 Stipulation Re: Document Production (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #54 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS A AND B by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Letter from Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Counsel JOINT LETTER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT AND PREHEARING STATEMENT [JOINT] filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [DOCUMENT PRODUCTION ORDER] filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ON MOTION TO SEAL #50 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #49 Stipulation re: Protective Order. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 EXHIBITS C TO THE PARTIES' [CONFIDENTIAL] JOINT LETTER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE filed byVerinata Health, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [THE PARTIES' JOINT LETTER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND EXHIBITS A AND B THERETO] filed by Verinata Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Walter, Derek) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER] filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/19/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 4/24/2013). Markman hearing set for 8/6/2013 03:30 PM. Markman hearing set for 8/7/2013 03:30 PM. Markman hearing set for 8/8/2013 03:30 PM. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/24/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. and Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings byThe Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [JOINT] filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Verinata Health, Inc.. (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Certificate of Interested Entities by Verinata Health, Inc. FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE OF NON-PARTY INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 7.1(a) & CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-16 (Walter, Derek) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc's and Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings' ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Verinata Health, Inc. and The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs byLaboratory Corporation of America Holdings, Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Arka Dev Chatterjee (Chatterjee, Arka) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Linette Haberny (Haberny, Sandra) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Amir Naini (Naini, Amir) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement against Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. Filed byVerinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement against Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. Filed byVerinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER setting claim construction schedule re #36 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/27/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013) Modified on 3/1/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco as well as September 6, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION re #33 Clerks Notice, re Claim Construction Schedule filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Iancu, Andrei) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE LETTER BRIEFS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re #27 . The Second Amended Complaint must be filed within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/20/2013) Modified on 2/21/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED MINUTES (FILED IN 12-5501 THAT NOW APPLIES TO ALL REALTED CASES) Further Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Tutorial Hearing set for 7/31/2013 03:30 PM. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/8/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 2/12/2013). Further Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/7/2013 03:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 7/31/2013 03:30 PM. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/12/2013)