Young et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Craig A. Young and Michelle J. Ezell-Young
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05514
Filed: October 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER of reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/20/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER VACATING STAY; EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT re 37 Proposed Order filed by Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/10/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re joint status report. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/12/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re joint status report. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/22/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re joint status report. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/23/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re joint status report. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/22/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 26 Status Report filed by Bank of America, N.A., Michelle J. Ezell-Young, Craig A. Young. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/28/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying motion to dismiss and granting motion to stay (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/20/12. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig A. Young
Represented By: Jason Scott Buckingham
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Sarah N Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle J. Ezell-Young
Represented By: Jason Scott Buckingham
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Sarah N Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew James Brady
Represented By: Marc Albert Lackner
Represented By: David S. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?