Stokes v. Interline Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cory Stokes
Defendant: Interline Brands, Inc. and Cleansource, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05527
Filed: October 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AMENDED ORDER by Judge James Donato replacing #87 and denying #79 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 95 Receipt from San Francisco Superior Court. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #89 Motion to Remand (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 92 Statement of Non-Opposition re #89 MOTION to Remand (Renewed) filed byInterline Brands, Inc.. (Related document(s) #89 ) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 91 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #89 MOTION to Remand (Renewed). Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 90 RESPONSE to re #88 Case Management Conference - Further Declaration of Matthew C. Kane Pursuant to August 15, 2014 Minute Order by Interline Brands, Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 89 MOTION to Remand (Renewed) filed by Cory Stokes. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 9/12/2014. Replies due by 9/19/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Robin G. Workman, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 88 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/15/2014 before James Donato (Date Filed: 8/15/2014). (Recording #FTR: 10:58-11:00.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/15/2014)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying #79 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/11/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 85 PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY 85 , CLERK'S NOTICE ISSUED IN ERROR. SEE DOCKET ENTRY #86 INSTEAD. CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties and counsel of record that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu has amended her General Standing Order. Effective immediately, all parties shall follow Judge Ryu's revised General Standing Order which can be found on the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014) Modified on 8/11/2014 (ig, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order granting in part and denying in part #83 Stipulation to Continue entered by Hon. James Donato. The Court grants an across the board continuance on scheduling dates and sets a case management conference for August 15, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. At the conference, the parties should be prepared to address the amount in controversy for diversity jurisdiction, including whether class member damages can be aggregated for this purpose, and why the parties raised the Urbino decision, 726 F.3d 1118 (9th Cir. 2013) for the first time on August 6, 2014, as a basis for remand almost exactly one year after it was issued. The parties are advised that the Court has denied preliminary approval of the proposed settlement. A written order will follow. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 6, 2014 Filing 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #79 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement to Continue Scheduling Order Dates and Deadlines Pending Disposition of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement [Dkt. #79] and Request for Decision Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Interline Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
June 18, 2014 Filing 82 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2014 before James Donato (Date Filed: 6/18/2014) re #79 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Cory Stokes. (Court Reporter BELLE BALL.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2014)
May 21, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE by Interline Brands, Inc. re #79 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement NOTICE OF PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CLASS ACTION FAIRNESS ACT, 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1715 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Preliminary Approval Motion), #2 Exhibit 1 (Workman Declaration I/S/O Preliminary Approval Motion), #3 Exhibit 1 (Workman Decl. Exh. A), #4 Exhibit 1 (Workman Decl. Exhs. B-D), #5 Exhibit 1 (Workman Decl. Exhs. E-I), #6 Exhibit 1 (Workman Decl. Exhs. J-N), #7 Exhibit 1 (Workman Decl. Exhs. O-R), #8 Exhibit 1 (Workman Decl. Exhs. S-W), #9 Exhibit 1 (Workman Decl. Exhs. X-BB), #10 Exhibit 1 (Stokes Declaration I/S/O Preliminary Approval Motion), #11 Exhibit 1 (Stokes Decl. Exhs. A-C), #12 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order I/S/O Preliminary Approval Motion))(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 13, 2014 Filing 80 Declaration of Robin G. Workman in Support of #79 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (CORRECTED EXHIBITS) filed byCory Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-D, #3 Exhibit E-I, #4 Exhibit J-Q, #5 Exhibit R-AA)(Related document(s) #79 ) (Workman, Robin) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 13, 2014 Filing 79 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Cory Stokes. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 5/27/2014. Replies due by 6/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Robin G. Workman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B-D, #4 Exhibit E-I, #5 Exhibit J-N, #6 Exhibit O-R, #7 Exhibit S-W, #8 Exhibit X-BB, #9 Declaration Cory Stokes, #10 Exhibit A-C, #11 Proposed Order)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 78 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Cory Stokes. (Workman, Robin) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 16, 2014 CASE REASSIGNED to the Honorable James Donato, United States District Judge. All parties must review the reassignment order posted at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/jd-order.pdf and comply with its requirements, including submitting a case management statement. This is a text only docket entry. The reassignment order associated with this notice may be viewed at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/jd-order.pdf Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014. Signed by The Executive Committee on 04/16/14. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #76 Stipulation To Continue Reply Deadline (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 14, 2014 Filing 76 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #74 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Plaintiff's Third Cause of Action for Penalties Pursuant to Cal. Labor Code Section 2699 To Continue Reply Deadline filed by Interline Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 75 RESPONSE (re #74 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Plaintiff's Third Cause of Action for Penalties Pursuant to Cal. Labor Code Section 2699 ) filed byCory Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Cory Stokes)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 74 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Plaintiff's Third Cause of Action for Penalties Pursuant to Cal. Labor Code Section 2699 filed by Interline Brands, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:00 AM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 3/7/2014. Replies due by 3/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Robin Gibson Workman (Attachments: #1 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #71 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARINGS ON PENDING MOTIONS AND SCHEDULING ORDER DATES. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARINGS ON PENDING MOTIONS AND SCHEDULING ORDER DATES filed by Cory Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #66 Discovery Letter Brief. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 69 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD and GRANTED on 12/18/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #66 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Inspection Demand 25 and Interrogatories 5 and 6 filed by Cory Stokes. Written Order from the Court to follow. (FTR Recording 3:16-3:38) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 68 REPLY (re #61 MOTION to Strike ) filed byCory Stokes. (Workman, Robin) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #66 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Inspection Demand 25 and Interrogatories 5 and 6 : Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2013 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/13/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 66 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Inspection Demand 25 and Interrogatories 5 and 6 filed by Cory Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 65 REPLY (re #59 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitrations of Putative Class Members' Claims and/or Deny Class Certification, or, Alternatively, to Amend Plaintiff's Proposed Class Definition and/or Stay Action as to Claims of Putative Class Members with A ) filed byInterline Brands, Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 64 RESPONSE (re #61 MOTION to Strike ) filed byInterline Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Kane, #2 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 63 RESPONSE (re #59 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitrations of Putative Class Members' Claims and/or Deny Class Certification, or, Alternatively, to Amend Plaintiff's Proposed Class Definition and/or Stay Action as to Claims of Putative Class Members with A ) filed byCory Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Robin G. Workman, #2 Exhibit A-G, #3 Exhibit H-L, #4 Declaration Cory Stokes, #5 Proposed Order)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 62 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearingas to #50 MOTION for Protective Order and Corrective Class Notice, and #59 MOTION to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 61 MOTION to Strike filed by Cory Stokes. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 12/9/2013. Replies due by 12/16/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Robin G. Workman, #3 Exhibit A-E, #4 Exhibit F-K, #5 Exhibit L-Q)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying #58 Discovery Letter Brief.The joint discovery letter is denied without prejudice and the parties are ordered to meet and confer in person or by telephone regarding the disputes in the letter. If any disputes remain after the parties meet and confer, the parties shall file a joint discovery letter by December 11, 2013. A hearing on that letter, if any, will be held on December 18, 2013, at 2:30 p.m. Any position that is not substantially justified may result in the issuance of sanctions. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 18, 2013 Filing 59 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitrations of Putative Class Members' Claims and/or Deny Class Certification, or, Alternatively, to Amend Plaintiff's Proposed Class Definition and/or Stay Action as to Claims of Putative Class Members with Arbitration Agreements filed by Interline Brands, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 12/2/2013. Replies due by 12/9/2013. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Supporting Evidence - Part 1, #2 Appendix of Supporting Evidence - Part 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 58 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Inspection Demands 3, 4 and 25 and Interrogatories 5 and 6 filed by Cory Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part #47 Discovery Letter Brief, #48 Discovery Letter Brief, #49 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER TAKING DISCOVERY LETTERS #47 #48 #49 UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The November 14, 2013 hearing on the discovery letters is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/12/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 1, 2013 Filing 55 OBJECTIONS to re #53 Reply to Opposition/Response OBJECTIONS TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S NEW REPLY EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENTS IMPROPERLY SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CORRECTIVE CLASS NOTICE, INCLUDING SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ROBIN G. WORKMAN AND EXHIBITS THERETO by Interline Brands, Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
November 1, 2013 Filing 54 Appendix re #52 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byInterline Brands, Inc.. (Related document(s) #52 ) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 53 REPLY (re #50 MOTION for Protective Order and Corrective Class Notice ) filed byCory Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Robin G. Workman)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 52 RESPONSE (re #50 MOTION for Protective Order and Corrective Class Notice ) DEFENDANT INTERLINE BRANDS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CORRECTIVE CLASS NOTICE filed byInterline Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Kane, #2 Appendix of Putative Class Member Declarations, #3 Objections to Plaintiff's Proposed "Corrective Class Notice" And Protective Submission Of Alternative Proposed Notices to Putative Class Members, #4 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #49 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRe: Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #47 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Requests for Admissions, #48 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRe: Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents : Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/07/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 50 MOTION for Protective Order and Corrective Class Notice filed by Cory Stokes. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 10/18/2013. Replies due by 10/25/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Robin G. Workman, #2 Proposed Order)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 49 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRe: Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Interline Brands, Inc.. (Kim, Sylvia) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 48 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRe: Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Interline Brands, Inc.. (Kim, Sylvia) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 47 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Requests for Admissions filed by Cory Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 9, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE of Change of Address by Walter Lewis Haines (Haines, Walter) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Cory Stokes for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Workman, Robin) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 44 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 8, 2013, before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, Diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2013. (Related documents(s) #40 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE ORDER #42 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 16, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 16, 2013 Filing 42 Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order by Cory Stokes. (Workman, Robin) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 14, 2013 Filing 41 Letter from Robin G. Workman . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Workman, Robin) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 13, 2013 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Interline Brands, Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #35 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 39 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD on 8/8/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 8/8/2013) re #35 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Cory Stokes. Plaintiffs Motion to compel discovery and producea witness for the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition GRANTED. See minutes for more particulars. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/8/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE ON JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER. Motion Hearing #35 set for 8/8/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu at the U.S. District Court, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/02/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013) Modified on 7/2/2013 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on Jun 25, 2013. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 35 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Cory Stokes. (Workman, Robin) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina Alexis Beldner (Beldner, Sabrina) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 33 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/12/2013 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 4/15/2013). Jury Selection set for 10/8/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 10/14/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/15/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #30 STIPULATION selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 10, 2013 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Workman, Robin) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 10, 2013 Filing 30 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Cory Stokes and Interline Brands filed by Cory Stokes. (Workman, Robin) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 29 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Interline Brands, Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #27 Stipulated Order of Dismissal without Prejudice and Waiver of Costs as to defendant CSE Holdings. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 25, 2013 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WAIVER OF COSTS filed by Cleansource, Inc.. (Posard, Mark) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #25 STIPULATION to Continue Initial Case Managment Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/20/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Managment Conference filed by Interline Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
February 27, 2013 Filing 24 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byCleansource, Inc.. (Posard, Mark) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 27, 2013 Filing 23 Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint byInterline Brands, Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING #16 Motion to Remand Action and for an Award of Attorneys Fees, DENYING #10 Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike, and DENYING #13 Amended Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 13, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
December 17, 2012 Filing 21 REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Remand Action and for an Award of Attorneys Fees ) filed byCory Stokes. (Qualls, Daniel) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 10, 2012 Filing 20 RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Remand Action and for an Award of Attorneys Fees ) DEFENDANTS' JOINT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND ACTION AND FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES filed byInterline Brands, Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
December 6, 2012 Filing 19 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING as to #16 MOTION to Remand Action and for an Award of Attorneys Fees and #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1); CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 6, 2012 Filing 18 REPLY (re #13 Amended MOTION to Dismiss AND/OR STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) AND/OR 23(d)(1): ) filed byCleansource, Inc.. (Posard, Mark) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 28, 2012 Filing 17 RESPONSE (re #13 Amended MOTION to Dismiss AND/OR STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) AND/OR 23(d)(1): ) filed byCory Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Qualls, Daniel) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 26, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand Action and for an Award of Attorneys Fees filed by Cory Stokes. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 12/10/2012. Replies due by 12/17/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Cory Stokes, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Qualls, Daniel) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 26, 2012 Filing 15 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1) ) filed byInterline Brands, Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 16, 2012 Filing 14 RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1) ) filed byCory Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Qualls, Daniel) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 13 Amended MOTION to Dismiss AND/OR STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) AND/OR 23(d)(1): filed by Cleansource, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/29/2012. Replies due by 12/6/2012. (Attachments: #1 Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Noticein Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Posard, Mark) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss AND/OR STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) AND/OR 23(d)(1) filed by Cleansource, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/29/2012. Replies due by 12/6/2012. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Reques for Judicial Noticein Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Posard, Mark) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cory Stokes. (Roller, Aviva) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1) filed by Interline Brands, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/16/2012. Replies due by 11/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/2/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/2/12. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 1, 2012 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 31, 2012 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Interline Brands, Inc... (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 5 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Interline Brands, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate CSE Holdings, Inc. for Interline Brands, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 Filing 4 Declaration of Janice Ramsey in Support of re #1 Notice of Removal of Civil Action from State Court filed by Interline Brands, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 Filing 3 Declaration of Gary Fredkin in Support of re #1 Notice of Removal of Civil Action from State Court filed by Defendant Interline Brands, Inc..(Related document(s) #1 ) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 1/15/2013 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 1/22/2013 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - [No Process] from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-12-523274. [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611080021] Filed by Defendant Interline Brands, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2012: #1 Notice of Removal) (tn, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2012 AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Cleansource, Inc. & Interline Brands, Inc. Submitted by Cory Stokes (tn, COURT STAFF)
October 26, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. Interline Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Stokes
Represented By: Daniel Harvey Qualls
Represented By: Aviva N. Roller
Represented By: Robin Gibson Workman
Represented By: Walter Lewis Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interline Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Catherine C. Smith
Represented By: Michael David Mandel
Represented By: Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleansource, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Posard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?