Carter v. Reese et al
Plaintiff: Darryl Carter
Defendant: Clyde Reese, III and Keith Horton
Case Number: 3:2012cv05537
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; TRANSFERRING FEDERAL CLAIMS; DISMISSING STATE CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING MARCH 1, 2013 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 13, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 27, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Reese et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Reese, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?