v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: Liborio Hernandez and Rogelio Rodriguez-Perez
Defendant: Nor-Cal Moving Services
Case Number: 3:2012cv05552
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 40 Stipulation to continue case management conference and refer case to mediation. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re Substitution of Attorney: Douglas M. Bria 38 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Nor-Cal Moving Services. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/10/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Updated Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/20/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 27 Stipulation Granting Plaintiffs' Leave to file Second Amended Complaint. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James finding as moot 18 Motion to Dismiss (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2013 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/19/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 14 Stipulation to continue Case Management Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liborio Hernandez
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Rodriguez-Perez
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nor-Cal Moving Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?