St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company et al v. Paul Ryan Associates
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company and Travelers Indemnity Company
Defendant: Paul Ryan Associates
Case Number: 3:2012cv05577
Filed: October 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/20/2014 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 3/17/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON FURTHER STIPULATION RE: DISCOVERY AND EXPERT DEADLINES AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/12/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY AND EXPERT DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/31/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 3/10/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 3/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/28/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company et al v. Paul Ryan Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ryan Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?