Guido et al v. City of South San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Guido, Derrick Louis Lamar and Derrick Lamar Gaines
Defendant: City of South San Francisco, Michael Massoni and Joshua Cabillo
Case Number: 3:2012cv05578
Filed: October 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING re 78 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Joshua Cabillo, Michael Massoni, City of South San Francisco Further Case Management Conference re-set for 9/19/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/4/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH SPERO FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP WITH CASE 12-CV-5578-JCS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/16/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING re 57 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Joshua Cabillo, Michael Massoni, City of South San Francisco. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 3/21/14 at 2:00 PM has been re-set for 6/20/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/18/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [Reassigned Case] Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/21/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STRIKING 14 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT; DIRECTING PARTIES TO RE-FILE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/27/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guido et al v. City of South San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Guido
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Louis Lamar
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Lamar Gaines
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of South San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Massoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Cabillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?