Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Westech Roofing
Plaintiff: Doug Ziegler and Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Defendant: Westech Roofing
Case Number: 3:2012cv05655
Filed: November 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 54 Motion for Permanent Injunction (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL MATERIALS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE WESTECHS REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY. Additional materials due August 15, 2014. Defendant's response due August 31, 2014. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 25, 2014. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 41 Motion for Default Judgment (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE BRIEFING ON AMENDED MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 25, 2014. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 37 Motion to Set Aside Default and vacating January 17, 2014 hearing. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR RESPONSE AND CONTINUING OCTOBER 4, 2013 MOTION HEARING TO OCTOBER 11, 2013 AT 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 26, 2013. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING re 17 Case Management Statement filed by Doug Ziegler, Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund to continue case management conference set for 7/12/13 at 1:30 PM. Motion for Default Judgment due by 7/12/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/10/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Case Management Conference re-set for 7/12/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/7/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, signed 4/11/13, re 10 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Doug Ziegler, Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/11/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Westech Roofing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westech Roofing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Ziegler
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?