Electrical Industry Service Bureau, Inc. et al v. Beaman's, Inc.
Plaintiff: National Electric Benefit Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 6 Vacation Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 6, Tim Donovan, Electrical Industry Service Bureau, Inc., Northern California Electrical Workers Pension Trust, San Francisco Electrical Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust and Electrical Workers Health & Welfare Trust
Defendant: Beaman's, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05662
Filed: November 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND CONTINGENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Contingent Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 28, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 15 MOTION for Default Judgment. Defendant to file motion to set aside default pursuant to Rule 55(c). Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/13/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 15 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/28/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 13 Default. Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/28/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electrical Industry Service Bureau, Inc. et al v. Beaman's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Electric Benefit Fund
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 6 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 6
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Donovan
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Industry Service Bureau, Inc.
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California Electrical Workers Pension Trust
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Electrical Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Health & Welfare Trust
Represented By: Eileen Marie Bissen
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaman's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?