Linares v. Alliance One Receivables Management Inc.
Plaintiff: Pedro Linares
Defendant: Alliance One Receivables Management Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05680
Filed: November 5, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re 61 Stipulation, filed by Alliance One Receivables Management Inc. Opposition due by 1/20/2014. Reply due 2/3/2014. Motion For Attorney Fees Hearing set for 2/20/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/18/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Re 58 Stipulation, filed by Alliance One Receivables Management Inc. Case Managemen t Conference set for 1/16/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Plaingiff's Motion for Attorney Fees Hearing set for 1/16/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/31/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re 50 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed by Pedro Linares and Finding as Moot Plaintiff's motion for class certification. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PRETRIAL ORDER (JURY): A Joint Case Management Statement (with updated information only) due by 8/29/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/3/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE: Attendance at Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/3/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linares v. Alliance One Receivables Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Linares
Represented By: Irving L. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance One Receivables Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?