Niranjan v. Bank of America , N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Sneh Niranjan
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A., ReconTrust Company, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv05706
Filed: November 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup [denying 37 Motion to Amend/Correct]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting 12 Motion to Dismiss]. Plaintiff may seek leave to amend the complaint and will have until May 3, 2013, to file a motion, noticed on the normal 35-day track, for leave to file an amended complaint. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER STRIKING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE [re 27 Amended Complaint, filed by Sneh Niranjan, 22 Notice (Other), filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Bank of America, N.A., ReconTrust Company, Mortg age Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.]. Reply due by noon on 4/8/2013. Opposition due by noon on 4/1/2013. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/27/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 3/21/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/19/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Bank of America, N.A., ReconTrust Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, 22 Notice (Other), filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Bank of America, N.A., ReconTrust Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niranjan v. Bank of America , N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sneh Niranjan
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?