Violan v. On Lok Senior Health Services,
Plaintiff: Eva Violan
Defendant: On Lok Senior Health Services,
Case Number: 3:2012cv05739
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/21/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. The defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED on the plaintiff's Third, Fourth, and Fifth Causes of Action and DENIED on the First and Second Causes of Action. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING ON 36 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. On Loks motion for summary judgment is CONTINUED for hearing until December 18, 2013 at 2 p.m. Plaintiff may file a new opposition to the motion for summary judgment by December 4, 2013, replacing what has been previously filed, and defendant may similarly file a new reply by December 11, 2013. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/07/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 26 Letter filed by On Lok Senior Health Services]. Response due by noon on 5/21/2013. Three-hour meet-and-confer from 10:00 AM TO 1:30 PM (with 30 minutes off for lunch at noo n) on 5/22/2013 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 5/22/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/20/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 25 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 19 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Eva Violan, 17 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 12, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/14/2013 11:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/7/2013. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/19/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Violan v. On Lok Senior Health Services,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Violan
Represented By: Spencer Freeman Smith
Represented By: Dow Wakefield Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Lok Senior Health Services,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?