Vanny v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Plaintiff: Ravy Vanny
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc. and McKesson Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv05752
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MDL TRANSFER ORDER TO US District Court, District of New Jersey. Signed by John G. Heyburn II for MDL Panel on 6/6/13. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Steven G. Reade (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER VACATING HEARINGS AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS 20 22 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/22/13 is continued to 6/21/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/14/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanny v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravy Vanny
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Represented By: Michael Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?