Braun v. Primary Distributor Doe Number 1 et al
Plaintiff: Axel Braun
Defendant: Primary Distributor Doe Number 1 and Does 2 through 38
Case Number: 3:2012cv05786
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion for Leave to File. Given Plaintiffs reliance on the Courts previous orders in this case, Plaintiff may use the previously subpoenaed information in order to attempt resolution through investigation and possible settlement prior to re-filing complaints against the severed Doe Defendants. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SEVERING ALL DOES EXCEPT DOE 1; ORDER REMOVING RELATED CASE DESIGNATION., Case association terminated: between 3:12-cv-05813-MEJ and 3:12-cv-05786-MEJ, between 3:12-cv-05786-MEJ and 3:12-cv-05812-MEJ, between 3:12-cv-05812-MEJ and 3:12-cv-05813-MEJ, between 3:12-cv-05813-MEJ and 3:12-cv-05814-MEJ, between 3:12-cv-05814-MEJ and 3:12-cv-05786-MEJ. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/11/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2013 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/22/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER VACATING CMC. Status Report due by 2/21/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/8/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting (6) Motion for expedited Discovery in case 3:12-cv-05786-MEJ; granting (5) Motion for expedited Discovery in case 3:12-cv-05812-MEJ; granting (5) Motion for expedited Discovery in case 3:12-cv-05813-MEJ; granting (6) Motion for expedited Discovery in case 3:12-cv-05814-MEJ (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun v. Primary Distributor Doe Number 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axel Braun
Represented By: D. Gill Sperlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Distributor Doe Number 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2 through 38
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?