Flores et al v. Velocity Express, Inc.
Plaintiff: Phillip Flores and Darah Doung
Defendant: Velocity Express, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05790
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying as moot 341 Administrative Motion Requesting a Case Management Conference; granting 326 Motion for Settlement; denying 329 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 324 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULE FOR SUBMISSION OF PARTIES PROPOSED SETTLEMENT filed by Darah Doung, Phillip Flores. Motion due by 10/26/2018. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 23, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 319 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Case Management Order Deadlines filed by TransForce, Inc., Dynamex Operations East, LLC, Velocity Express, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 6, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS CHARLES CHAMBERS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 269 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017) (Entered: 08/11/2017) Correction of ECF No. 290
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART MOTION TO DISMISS OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY by Judge August 8, 2017 granting in part and denying in part 268 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 4:17-cv-02623-DMR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on May 8, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 241 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 251 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 247 Emergency Ex Parte Application to Supplement the Declaration of Timothy J. Becker Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(e)(1) filed by Dynamex Operations East, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 9, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 236 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Amend Dispositive Motion Deadline filed by Darah Doung, Phillip Flores. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 225 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Joint Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines filed by TransForce, Inc., Dynamex Operations East, LLC, Velocity Express, LLC. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/ 26/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 6/5/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 209 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines, Trial Date, and Associated Deadlines filed by Darah Doung, Phillip Flores. Case Pool Selection Discovery 9/30/2016. Expe rt Disclosures and Reports 10/14/2016. Expert Rebuttal Reports 11/11/2016. Expert Deposition Period 11/14/2016 - 12/9/2016. Party Identification of Bellwether Trial Selections 11/4/2016. Court Identification of Bellwether Trial Selection 11/18/2016. Dispositive Motion Deadline 12/16/2016. Jury Trial set for 3/27/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 202 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE AN UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by TransForce, Inc., Dynamex Operations East, LLC, Velocity Express, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 12, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 198 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amending Expert Dates filed by Darah Doung, Phillip Flores. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER APPROVING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE re 191 Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2: BELLWETHER TRIALS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 24, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 162 Motion to Amend/Correct. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENTre 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Successor Liability and Joint Employer Status filed by Darah Doung, Phillip Flores. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 23, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 162 MOTION to Amend/Correct 156 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment To Certify The Same For Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) filed by TransForce, Inc., Dynamex Operations East, LLC, Velocity Express, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 18, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (166 in 3:12-cv-05790-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Combine CMC and Motion Hearing Dates filed by Darah Doung, Phillip Flores. Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 19, 2015. This change in dates applies to all related cases.(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER ALTERING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL re 162 MOTION to Amend/Correct 156 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment To Certify The Same For Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) filed by TransForce, Inc., Dynamex Operations East, LLC, Velocity Express, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 14, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (160 in 3:12-cv-05790-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Change Case Management Conference Date filed by Darah Doung, Phillip Flores. Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 8, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 147 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PRODUCTION OF CUSTODIAL FILES AND NON-CUSTODIAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 25, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING ORDER, CONTINUING DISCOVERY, AND SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 135 Joint Case Management Statement filed by TransForce, Inc., Velocity Express, LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 135 Joint Case Manageme nt Statement. Motion due by 10/29/2014. Responses due by 11/13/2014. Replies due by 11/20/2014. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 30, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2014)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Changing the Class Definition filed by Darah Doung, Phillip Flores. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 17, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED ORDER CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING COLLECTIVE ACTION, APPROVING PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE, AND APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL re 26 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b), Approving the Proposed Class Notice, and Appointing Timothy J. Becker and Jason Thompson as Interim Class Counsel filed by Darah Doung, Phillip Flores. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 7, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING COLLECTIVE ACTION, APPROVING PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE, AND APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting re 26 Motion to Certify Class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES filed by Velocity Express, Inc.. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/23/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores et al v. Velocity Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Flores
Represented By: Caleb Lucas-Hansen Marker
Represented By: Christopher Paul Ridout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darah Doung
Represented By: Caleb Lucas-Hansen Marker
Represented By: Christopher Paul Ridout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?