Hays v. John Deere Landscapes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brandon S. Hays
Defendant: John Deere Landscapes, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05823
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISCOVERY BRIEF re 26 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Terminating Sanctions filed by John Deere Landscapes, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 15, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2013)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION BETWEEN JUNE 10 AND 13 AND SANCTIONING PLAINTIFF $5,808.40. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 5, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 11 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hays v. John Deere Landscapes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon S. Hays
Represented By: James Jeffery Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Deere Landscapes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?