Lincoln General Insurance Company v. Schoepp Construction Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lincoln General Insurance Company
Defendant: Michael Dayan, Civitello-Joy Remodeling, Jean Jacques Bienaime, Jennifer Bienaime, Schoepp Construction Inc and Gregory Schoepp
Case Number: 3:2012cv05835
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STAY PENDING MEDIATION 53 . Updated case management statement due 6/4/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/21/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 50 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/1/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER TO SUBMIT PROOF OF ELIGIBILITY TO PRACTICE LAW. Mark Hooper shall submit his proof to the Court no later than 9/24/2013. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/10/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013).
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS MODIFIED 43 . Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/5/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 13 . Initial Case Management Conference continued to 4/3/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Joint case management statement due 3/27/2013. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/22/2013. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lincoln General Insurance Company v. Schoepp Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civitello-Joy Remodeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Jacques Bienaime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Bienaime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schoepp Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Schoepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincoln General Insurance Company
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Represented By: Mark Allen Hooper
Represented By: David Gray Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?