Crosthwaite et al v. Conterra Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: F. G. Crosthwaite, Russell E. Burns, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Heavy and Highway Committee and Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Conterra Group, Inc. and Javier Concepcion Herrera
Case Number: 3:2012cv05862
Filed: November 15, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 WRIT of Execution Issued in the amount of $98,291.27. (tnS) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 WRIT of Execution Issued in the amount of $95,632.76. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/01/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting re 11 REQUEST for Continuance of CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/19/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/4/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosthwaite et al v. Conterra Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. G. Crosthwaite
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy and Highway Committee
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conterra Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Concepcion Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?