Haynes v. Bank of America Group Benefits Program et al
Plaintiff: Conrad Haynes
Defendant: Bank of America Group Benefits Program, Bank of America N.A., Bank of America Corporate Benefits Committee and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv05879
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SELECTING MEDIATION filed by Conrad Haynes. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 29, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AND NOTICE RE: ATTORNEY PADWAY'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 17, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/28/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Bank of America Group Benefits Program et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad Haynes
Represented By: Laurence Fred Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Group Benefits Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporate Benefits Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?