Tobin v. Conopco, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Colleen Tobin
Defendant: Ben & Jerry's Homemade Inc and Conopco Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv05881
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 22 Motion to Intervene. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 32 Stipulation Selecting ADR Process. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 19, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 15, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER NOT RELATING CASES. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobin v. Conopco, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben & Jerry's Homemade Inc
Represented By: RONALD J. LEVINE
Represented By: William Lewis Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco Inc
Represented By: William Lewis Stern
Represented By: RONALD J. LEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Tobin
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER VINCENT LANGONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?