Strasser v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Nicole Strasser
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Case Number: 3:2012cv05975
Filed: November 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 25 AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 20 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 21 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE UPON CONSENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strasser v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Strasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?