Roybal-de-Aguero v. Wells Fargo, N.A.
Plaintiff: Fedelina Roybal-de-Aguero
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05977
Filed: November 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 38 Ex Parte Application to Reopen Case. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/22/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/1/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/4/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roybal-de-Aguero v. Wells Fargo, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fedelina Roybal-de-Aguero
Represented By: Peter Leo Kutrubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Represented By: David Michael Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?