Tung Tai Group v. Hyundai Merchant Marine (America) Inc.
Plaintiff: Tung Tai Group
Defendant: Hyundai Merchant Marine (America) Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06045
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 21 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying without prejudice 11 Motion to Stay or Dismiss. ORDER for Plaintiff to file amended complaint by April 10, 2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 13 Stipulation to Continue Defendant's Motion to Stay (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 9 Second and Final Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Hyundai Merchant Marine (America) Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/2/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tung Tai Group v. Hyundai Merchant Marine (America) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tung Tai Group
Represented By: William Nicholas Siamas
Represented By: Mark B. Fredkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Merchant Marine (America) Inc.
Represented By: James Arthur Henry Marissen
Represented By: Kristy Ann Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?