Swinerton Builders et al v. American Home Assurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Swinerton Builders and Swinerton Incorporated
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and American Home Assurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv06047
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal of Action filed by Swinerton Builders, Swinerton Incorporated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/12/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, American Home Assurance Company Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/4/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER EESETTING CMC re 40 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Swinerton Builders Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 17 Defendants' Motion to to Stay Action Pending Arbitration and Compelling Arbitration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Swinerton Builders Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/18/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 17 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, American Home Assurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/15/13. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference and Proof of Service filed by Swinerton Builders Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/28/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swinerton Builders et al v. American Home Assurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swinerton Builders
Represented By: Joseph Louis Oliva
Represented By: Charles Leroy Fanning, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swinerton Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph Louis Oliva
Represented By: Charles Leroy Fanning, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?