Gutowski v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jason T. Gutowski
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company and McKesson Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv06056
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 22 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 17 Motion to Remand and awarding costs (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Claudia Wilken. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/19/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutowski v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: Janet Hejae Kwuon
Represented By: James Mark Neudecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Pavan L. Rosati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason T. Gutowski
Represented By: Andrew Scott Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?