Mendez et al v. Napolitano et al
Petitioner: Fernando Moreno Mendez and Maria Del Carmen Gomez
Respondent: Janet Napolitano, Timothy Aiken and Eric Holder, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06069
Filed: November 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/23/2015. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/10/2015. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/19/2014. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation To A Briefing Schedule; and [Proposed] Order filed by Eric Holder, et al. Set Deadlines as to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 1/4/2013. Replies due by 1/18/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez et al v. Napolitano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fernando Moreno Mendez
Represented By: James Todd Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maria Del Carmen Gomez
Represented By: James Todd Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: Timothy Michael Belsan
Represented By: Ila Casy Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Aiken
Represented By: Timothy Michael Belsan
Represented By: Ila Casy Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy Michael Belsan
Represented By: Ila Casy Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?