Beckley v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Dennis Beckley
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2012cv06139
Filed: December 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/31/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STATUS ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/18/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 23 Stipulation and Agreement of Compromise and Settlement. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 17 Stipulation to continue Mediation and SJM deadlines. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING CMC
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 9 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Maria-Elena James granting 5 Stipulation selecting Mediation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckley v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Beckley
Represented By: John Lawrence Fleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Neill Tai Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?