Gonzalez et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mirna Gonzalez, Alfonso Reyes, Marlin Messick and Linda Messick
Defendant: Organon International, Inc., Organon Biosciences NV, Akzo Nobel NV, Schering-Plough Corporation, Merck & Company, Inc., Organon USA, Inc. and Organon Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06161
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by the MDL Panel on 4/1/2013. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER NOT RELATING CASES. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignment shall occur. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 14 Motion to Stay; terminating 16 Motion to Remand (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/18/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organon International, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Yoo
Represented By: Jaclyn M. Setili
Represented By: Lynn Ann Combs
Represented By: Steven J. Boranian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organon Biosciences NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Nobel NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schering-Plough Corporation
Represented By: Thomas J. Yoo
Represented By: Jaclyn M. Setili
Represented By: Lynn Ann Combs
Represented By: Steven J. Boranian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Boranian
Represented By: Lynn Ann Combs
Represented By: Jaclyn M. Setili
Represented By: Thomas J. Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organon USA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Yoo
Represented By: Jaclyn M. Setili
Represented By: Lynn Ann Combs
Represented By: Steven J. Boranian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organon Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Yoo
Represented By: Jaclyn M. Setili
Represented By: Lynn Ann Combs
Represented By: Steven J. Boranian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirna Gonzalez
Represented By: Brian J. Perkins
Represented By: Peter De La Cerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Reyes
Represented By: Brian J. Perkins
Represented By: Peter De La Cerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlin Messick
Represented By: Brian J. Perkins
Represented By: Peter De La Cerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Messick
Represented By: Brian J. Perkins
Represented By: Peter De La Cerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?