Diop v. County of Marin et al
Plaintiff: Rama Diop
Defendant: Richard Meredith Owens, Tracy Barrett, Esq., Mill Valley Police Department, County of Marin, Marin County Health & Human Services, City of Mill Valley and Marin County Superior Court
Case Number: 3:2012cv06332
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISMISSING THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/9/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE EXHIBITS TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/17/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/6/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting 6 Report and Recommendations; denying 10 Motion to Vacate (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diop v. County of Marin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Meredith Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Barrett, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mill Valley Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin County Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mill Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rama Diop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?