Rahimi v. Nintendo of America Inc.
Plaintiff: Joubin Rahimi
Defendant: Nintendo of America Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06351
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/27/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 11 Motion to Compel and Staying Proceedings Pending the Completion of Arbitration; denying as moot 12 motion for temporary stay. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 6-2. Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2013, and all associated dealines (including ADR dealines) are taken off-calendar. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/25/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/10/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rahimi v. Nintendo of America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joubin Rahimi
Represented By: Roy Arie Katriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?