Mission et al v. Polimeno et al
Plaintiff: Simrat Kaur Mission and Hakam Singh Mission
Defendant: Kristie Polimeno, Enrico John Polimeno, Lisa G. Beresford-Wood, Blake Rasmussen, Katy Laubach, 551 Carnegie Street, LLC, Diana Contreras, Old Republic Title Company, CB Richard Ellis, Inc. and Wildcat Metals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06359
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 36 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 18 Motion to Dismiss; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 19 Motion for Joinder; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/5/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/21/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/31/2013 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/17/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/9/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mission et al v. Polimeno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristie Polimeno
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Represented By: Marc Burton Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrico John Polimeno
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Represented By: Marc Burton Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa G. Beresford-Wood
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Represented By: Marc Burton Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Rasmussen
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Represented By: Marc Burton Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katy Laubach
Represented By: Bradley Marie Matteoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 551 Carnegie Street, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Marie Matteoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Contreras
Represented By: Jeffrey Howard Lowenthal
Represented By: Jayne Ann Peeters
Represented By: Edward Egan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Title Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Howard Lowenthal
Represented By: Jayne Ann Peeters
Represented By: Edward Egan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CB Richard Ellis, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Represented By: Marc Burton Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wildcat Metals, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Marie Matteoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simrat Kaur Mission
Represented By: Sunita Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hakam Singh Mission
Represented By: Sunita Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?