Schneider v. Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.
Plaintiff: Steven Schneider
Defendant: Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06369
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/29/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 29, 2013 Filing 44 Joint MOTION to Dismiss individual claims with prejudice and putative class claims without prejudice filed by Steven Schneider. Responses due by 11/12/2013. Replies due by 11/19/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
September 16, 2013 Filing 43 CLERKS NOTICE DENYING MOTIONS TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. . (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 16, 2013 Filing 42 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/31/2013 01:30 PM. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 16, 2013 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the Order to Show Cause Hearing filed by Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Teeters, Danielle) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 13, 2013 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the September 19, 2013, hearing re status of dismissal filed by Steven Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/19/2013 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 9/13/2013. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/8/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 8, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE by Steven Schneider of Settlement (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 37 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Stuart L. Gasner as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case referred to mediation. Motion for class certificaion set for 8/29/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/8/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT re Proposed Schedule for Proceedings through Class Certification by Steven Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kazerounian, Seyed) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 28, 2013 Filing 34 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/28/2013 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 3/28/2013). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 33 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Rule 26(f) Report filed by Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.. (Teeters, Danielle) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 32 CLERKS NOTICE Parties shall appear telephonically at their case management conference scheduled for 11:00 a.m. on Thursday, March 28, 2013. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the March 28, 2013, Initial Case Management Conference filed by Steven Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE #29 SUBSTITUTION AND WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/21/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by June D. Coleman and Withdrawal of Attorney for Defendant Bishop, White, Marshall & Weibel, P.S. (Coleman, June) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial byBishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.. (Coleman, June) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 27 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.. (Coleman, June) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 5, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE by Steven Schneider re #25 Amended Complaint Notice of Errata (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
March 5, 2013 Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Steven Schneider. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 3/5/2013) Modified on 3/6/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2013 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rosenberg, Marc) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 27, 2013 Filing 23 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Steven Schneider filed by Steven Schneider. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 27, 2013 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 21, 2013 Filing 20 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/21/2013 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 2/21/2013). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/21/2013)
January 30, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE by Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S. of Unavailability from January 30 to February 4, 2013 (Rosenberg, Marc) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 30, 2013 Filing 18 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, Rule 12(b)(6) ) filed byBishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.. (Rosenberg, Marc) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 17 RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, Rule 12(b)(6) ) filed bySteven Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Opposition, Part 2 of 2, #2 Declaration of Steven Schneider, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kazerounian, Seyed) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 22, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Lodgment of Exhibit 1 (CD) to the declaration of Marc Rosenberg on defendant's motion to dismiss by Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 11, 2013 Filing 15 Declaration of Marc Rosenberg in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byBishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.. (Rosenberg, Marc) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 11, 2013 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 1/25/2013. Replies due by 2/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Marc) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 8, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Marc) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MARC ROSENBERG PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 8, 2013 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/8/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 7, 2013 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 4, 2013 Filing 8 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.. (Yalon, Jerome) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
January 4, 2013 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Yalon, Jerome) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
January 4, 2013 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S... (Yalon, Jerome) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
January 4, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome Michael Yalon, Jr (Yalon, Jerome) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
January 4, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION and [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7382272.) filed by Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenberg, Marc) (Filed on 1/4/2013) Modified on 1/7/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2012 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2013 03:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 12/14/12. (Attachments: #1 NC Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611081528.). Filed bySteven Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider v. Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bishop, Whtie, Marshall & Weibel, P.S.
Represented By: Jerome Michael Yalon, Jr.
Represented By: Marc Rosenberg
Represented By: June D. Coleman
Represented By: Danielle Renee Teeters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Schneider
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Represented By: Matthew Michael Loker
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?