California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc. et al v. Chapman et al
Plaintiff: Gail Dawson and California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc.
Defendant: Country Villa Service Corp., Ron Chapman, Steven Reissman, Edmund G. Brown, Jr., C.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC and Country Villa East, LP
Interested Party: Los Feliz Healthcare Center LLC, North Point Health & Wellness Center LLC, Country Villa East LP, Belmont Heights Healthcare Center LLC, Plaza Healthcare Center LLC, Country Villa Southbay LLC, Westwood Healthcare Center LP, Mountainside Operating Company LLC, Country Villa Nursing Center Inc., North Healthcare Center LLC, East Healtcare Center LLC, Plaza Convalescent Center LP, Wilshire Healthcare Center LLC, Westwood Healthcare Center LLC, South Healthcare Center LLC, Sheraton Healthcare Center LLC, Claremont Healthcare Center Inc., Country Villa Imperial LLC and RRT Enterprises LP
Case Number: 3:2012cv06408
Filed: December 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2014 Filing 65 Acknowledgment of Receipt of certified copy of remand order and certified copy of docket entries from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda. (tnS) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #62 Motion for Leave to File; denying #63 Motion for Joinder. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION for Joinder in re #62 State Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Remanding this Case to State Court filed by C.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Steven Reissman. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order, #(2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Phleger, Dawn) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Remanding this Case to State Court filed by Ron Chapman. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order, #(2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Elias, Nimrod) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 61 Mailed certified copy of remand order and certified docket entries to Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. (tnS) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING RULE 60(B) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying #54 Motion for Reconsideration. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE of Filing of Petition for Relief Under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code, 11 U.S.C. Section 101, et seq., and Imposition of Automatic Stay filed by Belmont Heights Healthcare Center LLC, Claremont Healthcare Center Inc., Country Villa East LP, Country Villa Imperial LLC, Country Villa Nursing Center Inc., Country Villa Southbay LLC, East Healtcare Center LLC, Los Feliz Healthcare Center LLC, Mountainside Operating Company LLC, North Healthcare Center LLC, North Point Health & Wellness Center LLC, Plaza Convalescent Center LP, Plaza Healthcare Center LLC, RRT Enterprises LP, Sheraton Healthcare Center LLC, South Healthcare Center LLC, Westwood Healthcare Center LLC, Westwood Healthcare Center LP, Wilshire Healthcare Center LLC (tnS, ) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re #54 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 27, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
December 16, 2013 Filing 57 RESPONSE (re #54 MOTION for Reconsideration ) Opposition to Motion for Relief filed byRon Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Elias, Nimrod) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 56 Request for Judicial Notice re #55 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byC.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Steven Reissman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #55 ) (Phleger, Dawn) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 55 RESPONSE (re #54 MOTION for Reconsideration ) filed byC.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Steven Reissman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Phleger, Dawn) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 3, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #54 MOTION for Reconsideration. Responses due by 12/16/2013. Replies due by 12/23/2013. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 54 MOTION for Reconsideration; Motion for Relief from Mistake or Inadvertence Under Rule 60(b) and Permitting the Filing of Proposed Second Amended Complaint filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Balisok, Russell) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting #43 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #46 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
October 23, 2013 Filing 52 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. (Nardoni, Silvio) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 51 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 9/12/2013) re #46 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ron Chapman, #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Steven Reissman, C.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa Service Corp., Country Villa East, LP. (Court Reporter: Julie Ralston.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 50 REPLY (re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim ) filed byC.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Steven Reissman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Phleger, Dawn) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 49 REPLY (re #46 Second MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byRon Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Elias, Nimrod) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 13, 2013 Filing 48 CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE to (re #46 Second MOTION to Dismiss,, re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim) and certificate of service filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Nardoni, Silvio) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
July 30, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 8/13/2013. Replies due by 8/23/2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting re #45 Stipulation. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 22, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1)&(6)); Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Ron Chapman. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 8/13/2013. Replies due by 8/23/2013. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order, #(2) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Elias, Nimrod) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 19, 2013 Filing 45 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Revise Briefing Schedule on re #43 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim; to revise briefing schedule filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. (Nardoni, Silvio) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 15, 2013 Filing 44 Request for Judicial Notice re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed byC.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Steven Reissman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #43 ) (Phleger, Dawn) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 15, 2013 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by C.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Steven Reissman. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 7/29/2013. Replies due by 8/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Phleger, Dawn) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 3, 2013 Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING DEADLINES re docket #41: The deadline to file Rule 12(b) motions is 7/22/2013. Responses due by 8/13/2013. Replies due by 8/23/2013. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re #40 Stipulation filed by Ron Chapman extending time to respond to complaint GRANTED. A clerk's notice will follow. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 3, 2013 Filing 40 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Ron Chapman. (Elias, Nimrod) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
June 25, 2013 Filing 39 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously set for 6/26/2013 is CONTINUED to 11/6/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2013. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting re #37 Stipulation. The case management conference is hereby continued to November 6, 2013. A clerk's notice will follow. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 37 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re 24 Clerk's Notice, to Continue Case Management Conference filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. (Nardoni, Silvio) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 36 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. (Balisok, Russell) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting re #8 Motion to Dismiss; granting re #16 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs have leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days of this Order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 34 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 5/28/2013) re #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Ron Chapman, #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steven Reissman, C.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa Service Corp., Country Villa East, LP. (Court Reporter: Joan Columbini.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/28/2013)
May 1, 2013 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing on re #16 MOTION to Dismiss, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants. The Motion hearings are continued to 5/28/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting re #31 Stipulation. Per the parties' stipulated request, the Court orders as follows. The hearing on the Country Villa Defendants Motion to Dismiss and the State Defendants Motion to Dismiss shall be held on May 28, 2013, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 9, 450 Golden Gate Ave., 19th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94102. No parties will propound any discovery until at least 7 days after the Court rules on the motions to dismiss. A clerk's notice will follow. It is so ordered.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Reschedule the Hearing Date for the re #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants, re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Country Villa Defendants filed by C.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Steven Reissman. (Phleger, Dawn) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 30 REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byC.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Steven Reissman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Phleger, Dawn) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearings as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss, #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants. Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Motion Hearings previously set for 5/2/2013 are continued to 5/6/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 28 RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants); REQUEST That the Court Consider the Supplemental Opposition to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. (Nardoni, Silvio) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 27 Request for Judicial Notice re #26 RESPONSE to (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants, and re #25 Response to (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss); Request for Judicial Notice filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. (Balisok, Russell) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 26 RESPONSE to (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants); Supplemental Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. (Balisok, Russell) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 25 RESPONSE to (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss); Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion by Country Villa Defendants to Dismiss Complaint filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. (Balisok, Russell) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2013. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 5/1/2013 is continued to 6/26/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE THE HEARING DATE FOR THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS; by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting #21 Stipulation. This is a text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 20, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/12/2013. Replies due by 4/25/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 20, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 18, 2013 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judge of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Reschedule the Hearing date for the re #17 Request for Judicial Notice, re #16 MOTION to Dismiss ; Declaration of Dawn A. Phleger; [Proposed] Order Adopting Stipulated Schedule filed by C.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Steven Reissman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Phleger, Dawn) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
February 27, 2013 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Statement by All Parties filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr, C.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Ron Chapman, Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Gail Dawson, Steven Reissman. (Nardoni, Silvio) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting #18 Stipulation. The Court grants the parties' Stipulation Between Country Villa Defendants And Plaintiffs, Dkt. No. 18. Plaintiffs' opposition to Country Villa Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is due March 16, 2013. Defendants' reply is due March 23, 2013. The Motion will be heard on April 18, 2013. Neither Country Villa Defendants nor Plaintiffs shall propound discovery requests on each other until at least seven days following the Court's ruling on Country Villa Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. It is so ordered. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013) Modified on 2/26/2013 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 21, 2013 Filing 18 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER to Reschedule the Hearing Date for re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Revise Briefing Schedule; Declaration of Silvio Nardoni; [Proposed] Order Adopting Stipulated Schedule, (continue motion hearing date and related dates) filed by C.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Gail Dawson, Steven Reissman. (Nardoni, Silvio) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 15, 2013 Filing 17 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by C.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Steven Reissman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Phleger, Dawn) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 15, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1)&(6); Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by C.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC, Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp., Steven Reissman. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/1/2013. Replies due by 3/8/2013. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Phleger, Dawn) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 2/11/13. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE THE HEARING DATE FOR THE MOTION TO DISMISS, VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO DELAY DISCOVERY by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #13 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 6, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 5, 2013 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants to continue motion hearing date and related dates filed by California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. (Nardoni, Silvio) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
February 5, 2013 Filing 12 REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants ) filed byRon Chapman. (Elias, Nimrod) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 29, 2013 Filing 11 RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants ) and Opposition filed byCalifornia Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc., Gail Dawson. (Balisok, Russell) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 28, 2013 Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS COUNTRY VILLA SERVICE CORP. AND COUNTRY VILLA EAST L.P.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wilson, William) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 24, 2013 Filing 9 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, by Country Villa East, LP, Country Villa Service Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wilson, William) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 15, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss State Defendants filed by Ron Chapman, Edmund G. Brown. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 1/29/2013. Replies due by 2/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Elias, Nimrod) (Filed on 1/15/2013) Modified on 1/17/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/9/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
December 21, 2012 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint, filed by Ron Chapman, Gail Dawson, California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Elias, Nimrod) (Filed on 12/21/2012) Modified on 12/26/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.Signed by Executive Committee on 12/20/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 20, 2012 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 19, 2012 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ron Chapman.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; No Process from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG-12653326. (Filing fee $350.00 receipt number 34611081590). Filed by Ron Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc. et al v. Chapman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Villa Service Corp.
Represented By: William Crawford Wilson
Represented By: Dawn Arnold Phleger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Chapman
Represented By: Nimrod Pitsker Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Reissman
Represented By: Dawn Arnold Phleger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Nimrod Pitsker Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.V. Westwood Single Purpose Entity, LLC
Represented By: Dawn Arnold Phleger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Villa East, LP
Represented By: William Crawford Wilson
Represented By: Dawn Arnold Phleger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Los Feliz Healthcare Center LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: North Point Health & Wellness Center LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Country Villa East LP
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Belmont Heights Healthcare Center LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Plaza Healthcare Center LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Country Villa Southbay LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Westwood Healthcare Center LP
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mountainside Operating Company LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Country Villa Nursing Center Inc.
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: North Healthcare Center LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: East Healtcare Center LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Plaza Convalescent Center LP
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Wilshire Healthcare Center LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Westwood Healthcare Center LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: South Healthcare Center LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sheraton Healthcare Center LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Claremont Healthcare Center Inc.
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Country Villa Imperial LLC
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: RRT Enterprises LP
Represented By: Ron Bender,
Represented By: Lindsey L. Smith
Represented By: Krikor John Meshefejian,
Represented By: Monica Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Dawson
Represented By: Silvio F. Nardoni
Represented By: Russell Steven Balisok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform, Inc.
Represented By: Silvio F. Nardoni
Represented By: Russell Steven Balisok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?