Sage Electrochromics, Inc. v. View, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sage Electrochromics, Inc.
Defendant: View, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06441
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 232 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER; -Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Sage Electrochromics, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 2, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER re 211 RESPONSE to Claim Construction Statement filed by View, Inc., 210 Claim Construction Statement filed by Sage Electrochromics, Inc., 202 Claim Construction Statement, filed by View, Inc., 203 Claim Construction Statement, filed by Sage Electrochromics, Inc., 209 RESPONSE to Claim Construction Statement, filed by View, Inc., 208 RESPONSE to Claim Construction Statement filed by Sage Electrochromics, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 6, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 5/31/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 30, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING re 217 Joint MOTION to Continue; Joint Request to Reschedule Markman Hearing filed by Sage Electrochromics, Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2015 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 15, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 200 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/11/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 182 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 179 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Assert Supplemental Counterclaim for Patent Infringement filed by View, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 9, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 177 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: Request to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by View, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 13, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 156 View's Motion to Strike.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER CONSTRUING TERMS OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 5,724,177, 5,831,851, 7,372,610, AND 8,243,357 re 108 Claim Construction Statement, filed by Sage Electrochromics, Inc.; 109 Claim Construction Statement, filed by View, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 7, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DIRECTING VIEW TO NOTICE MOTION TO STRIKE BEFORE JUDGE RYU re 152 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal A Portion of Its Motion to Strike Leybold's Patent L.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions filed by View, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 149 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by View, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 19, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 113 Motion to Amend/Correct. (jstlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 113 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 3-6 filed by Sage Electrochromics, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 6, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 85 Motion to Intervene. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 97 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending the Deadline to Complete Court-Appointed Mediation filed by Sage Electrochromics, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 23, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 66 , 72 Discovery Letter Briefs.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Sage Electrochromics, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 2, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sage Electrochromics, Inc. v. View, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sage Electrochromics, Inc.
Represented By: Terry W. Ahearn
Represented By: Sarah Chapin Columbia
Represented By: Leigh John Martinson
Represented By: Terrence Patrick McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: View, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?