Prutsman v. Rust Consulting, Inc et al
Plaintiff: James R. Prutsman
Defendant: Rust Consulting, Inc and Sourcehov Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv06448
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 23 motion to remand (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 30 Motion to Shorten Time and resetting hearing dates (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2013 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/10/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 16 Administrative Motion and setting schedule for briefing and hearing on defendants' Motion to Dismiss/Stay (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prutsman v. Rust Consulting, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Prutsman
Represented By: Daniel H. Qualls
Represented By: Robin Gibson Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rust Consulting, Inc
Represented By: Maria Ellinikos
Represented By: Kalia Christofides Petmecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sourcehov Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Ellinikos
Represented By: Kalia Christofides Petmecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?