LSI Corporation v. Vizio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zoran Corporation and LSI Corporation
Defendant: Vizio, Inc.
3rd_party_defendant: Zoran Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012mc80021
Filed: January 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Extend Briefing Schedule on LSI Corporation's Motion to Compel The Production of Documents And Deposition Testimony From Third-Party Zoran Corporation, filed by Zoran Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/27/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 7 Order to Further Extend Briefing Schedule on LSI Corporation's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony From Third-Party Zoran Corporation filed by Zoran Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/28/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LSI Corporation v. Vizio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Zoran Corporation
Represented By: Michael Gerald Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoran Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LSI Corporation
Represented By: Herbert J. Hammond
Represented By: Wayne Wilson Call
Represented By: Aaron Lewis Renfro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vizio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?