NML Capital, Ltd. v. The Republic of Argentina
Plaintiff: NML Capital, Ltd.
Defendant: The Republic of Argentina
Respondent: Chevron Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012mc80185
Filed: August 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER of USCA as to #44 Notice of Appeal filed by NML Capital, Ltd.. (tnS) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
December 24, 2015 Filing 45 USCA Case Number 15-17520 USCA for #44 Notice of Appeal filed by NML Capital, Ltd.. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2015)
December 23, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 15-17520 filed by NML Capital, Ltd.. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10089216 paid.) (Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 12/23/2015) Modified on 12/28/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RESOLVING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DATED FEBRUARY 21, 2013. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/1/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
January 22, 2015 Filing 42 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 22, 2015 Filing 41 MANDATE of USCA Case 12-17738 as to #25 Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 5, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE by NML Capital, Ltd. of Notice of Supplemental Authority (Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
June 18, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua David Hess (Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 38 Letter from Joshua D.N. Hess Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 37 Letter from Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. and Neil A.F. Popovi, Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service (Ninth Circuit via ECF))(Popovic, Neil) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
April 5, 2013 Filing 36 OBJECTIONS to re #32 Objection FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DATED FEBRUARY 21, 2013 (DOCKET # 31) by NML Capital, Ltd.. (Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 35 RESPONSE to re #32 Objection to Nondispositive Order of Magistrate Judge Dated February 21, 2013 (ECF #31) by The Republic of Argentina. (Popovic, Neil) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 34 RESPONSE to re #31 Order, #32 Objection Chevron Corporation's Response to NML Capital, Ltd.'s Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Order of Magistrate Judge Dated February 21, 2013 (ECF #31) by Chevron Corporation. (Wallach, David) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE BRIEFING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE ORDERResponses due by 3/29/2013. Replies due by 4/5/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/18/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 7, 2013 Filing 32 OBJECTIONS to re #31 Order AND REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 72-2 by NML Capital, Ltd.. (Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DISCOVERY ORDER re #27 Letter Brief, filed by The Republic of Argentina, NML Capital, Ltd.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/21/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 4, 2013 Filing 30 Letter from David L. Wallach Responding to NML's letter of January 31, 2013. (Wallach, David) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 29 Letter from NML Capital Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 30, 2013 Filing 28 Letter from Non-Party Chevron Corporation. (Wallach, David) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 27 Letter Brief JOINT ATTESTATION THAT PARTIES MET AND CONFERRED IN PERSON filed byNML Capital, Ltd., The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Joint Meet & Confer Letter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
December 14, 2012 Filing 26 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #25 Notice of Appeal (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 12, 2012 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA The Republic of Argentina.(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-7340680 paid.) (Popovic, Neil) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 7, 2012 Filing 23 OBJECTIONS to re #9 Order re Discovery by Mag. J. by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neil A.F. Popovic in Support of Objections to Mag. J. Discovery Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order Sustaining Objections to Mag. J. Discovery Order)(Popovic, Neil) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Objection to Discovery Order Issued by Magistrate Judge James. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/31/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #9 Order Extending Time to File Objection to Discovery Order Issued by Magistrate Judge James filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neil A.F. Popovic in Support of Stipulated Request to Extend Time to File Objection to Discovery Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Popovic, Neil) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for DENNIS H. HRANITZKY (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice FOR DENNIS H. HRANITZKY ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7232116.) filed by NML Capital, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dennis H. Hranitzky, #2 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Blackman (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Carmine Boccuzzi (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Sara Sanchez (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michael Brennan (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael Brennan ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7206619.) filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Popovic Certification of Concurrence in Filing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Popovic, Neil) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Sara Sanchez ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7206599.) filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Popovic Certification of Concurrence in Filing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Popovic, Neil) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Carmine Boccuzzi ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7206570.) filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Popovic Certification of Concurrence in Filing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Popovic, Neil) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Blackman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7206503.) filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Popovic Certification of Concurrence in Filing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Popovic, Neil) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua David Hess (Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DISCOVERY ORDER re #8 Joint Discovery Letter BriefAttestation That Parties Met and Conferred in Person filed by The Republic of Argentina. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/17/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 15, 2012 Filing 8 Joint Discovery Letter BriefAttestation That Parties Met and Conferred in Person filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: #1 Joint Meet and Confer Letter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Popovic, Neil) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
September 6, 2012 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Republic of Argentina re #6 Order, #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery (Popovic, Neil) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order re Discovery)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO QUASH AND ALL OTHER DISCOVERY DISPUTES to randomly assigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 7, 2012 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Republic of Argentina re #1 MOTION to Quash, #3 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration in Support (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 Filing 3 Proposed Order re #1 MOTION to Quash by The Republic of Argentina. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 Filing 2 Declaration of Neil A.F. Popovic in Support of #1 MOTION to Quash filed byThe Republic of Argentina. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) (ga, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2012 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash filed by The Republic of Argentina.. Responses due by 8/21/2012. Replies due by 8/28/2012. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) Fee Paid $46.00, Receipt #34611077303 (ga, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NML Capital, Ltd. v. The Republic of Argentina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NML Capital, Ltd.
Represented By: Dennis H. Hranitzky
Represented By: Joshua David Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chevron Corporation
Represented By: David L. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Republic of Argentina
Represented By: Sara A. Sanchez
Represented By: Martin Daniel White
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan I Blackman
Represented By: Michael M. Brennan
Represented By: Neil A. Friedman Popovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?