In re Carrier IQ, Inc., Consumer Privacy Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Accident Investigative Services, Inc., Michael Allan, Jeremy Bain, Matthew Branson, Laureen Briggs, Evan Brooks, Kenneth Cassine, Roseanne Castro, Kristina Cerrone, Lisa Clark, Justin Conley, Joseph Cosme, Timothy Dodson, Curtis Dubberly, Cheryl Eakins, Margaret Elliott, Kurt Fairfield, Greg Feitelson, Jeremy Feitelson, Dylan T Ferreira, Colleen Fischer, Elizabeth Fosson, Matthew Fosson, Duane Frisbie, Felipe Garcia, Josephine Gonzalez, Matthew Hiles, Leonard Hobbs, Lawrence Regis House, Jr., George Howell, Caprice Ieyoub, Brandon Ivy-Perry, Mario Jackson, Erin Janek, Ashley L. Jones, Cameron Jones, Andy Kacmarcik, Jay Katz, Patrick Kenny, Robert Kleer, Elizabeth Lammert, Benjamin Lancaster, Mark Laning, Andre Lavertue, Laura Lebryk, John Leinicke, Leron Levy, Scott Lewis, Joshua Libby, Jannet Linder, Melissa J. Link, Richard Lucarelli, Chad Maron, Daniel Massey, Lisa McClaskey, Ryan McKeen, Peter Medine, Hayley Medrano, Saima Mian, Jerimiah Thomas Moree, Thomas Naudus, Marcus Neal, Israel Olivares, Jeffrey Pacilli, Lindsay Padilla, Dennis Patrick, Jennifer Sue Patrick, Dao Phong, Eliezer Pilowsky, Daniel Pipkin, Clarissa Portals, Amy Roberts, Marilyn Robledo, Lisa Rosenburg, Richard Rosenfeld, Mark Rottschafer, Andrew Sanders, Brian Sandstrom, David Sarafian, Daniel Schlanger, Craig Schmidt, Adam Schwartz, Vishal Shah, Justin Sharp, Rodney Shively, Edward Shumate, Michael Siegel, Rowena Silvera, Amandeep Singh, Melissa Slater, Samuel Slaughter, Robert Spradley, Eric Steiner, Sam Stoltenbury, John Swafford, Luke Szulczewski, Eric Thomas, Matthew Thornton, Kenneth Tishenkel, Ilya Torchinsky, Vlad Twerskoi, Chad Ulrich, Yonatan Wadler, Steven Watts, Amber Westenberger, James Douglas White, William White, IV, David Williams, Jeffrey Wilson, Stephanie Wirth, Caryl Wolff, John Woods, David Yastrab and Michael Zemartis
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC, Carrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Peter Lowden, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Nextel and Sprint Spectrum LP
Petitioner: Scott Culp, Jimmy Thulestone, Amber Lambert and Jonathan Rich
Other: Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq. and Patrick S. Sweeney
Interested Party: Sandra Singer
Undetermined: Google Inc.
Amicus Curiae: David Ratner
Case Number: 3:2012md02330
Filed: April 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 526 NOTICE of Change of Address by Simon J. Frankel (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER of USCA dismissing appeal as to #261 Notice of Appeal filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 20, 2018 Filing 524 MANDATE of USCA as to #263 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Carrier IQ, Inc "Pursuant to the Corrected Joint Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry no. 49 ondocket for appeal no. 14-15843), appeal no. 14-15846 is voluntarily dismissed inits entirety and appeal no. 14-15843 is dismissed by all appellants except appellantPantech Wireless, Inc. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). All parties to the Corrected JointMotion shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs on appeal.A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court." (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 523 Mail sent to Christopher V. Tisi returned as undeliverable re #509 USCA Order, #510 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 522 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sam Andrew Miorelli (Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 521 Mail sent to Kevin Costello returned as undeliverable re #509 USCA Order, #510 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER of USCA temporarily closing the appeals, for administrative purposes only, until July 31, 2018 as to #263 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carrier IQ, Inc, and #261 Notice of Appeal filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 520 Mail sent to Jay P. Salzman returned as undeliverable re #509 USCA Order, #510 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 518 Mail sent to Andrea S. Hirsch returned as undeliverable re #510 Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 517 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating 3/15/18 CMC (Per Stipulation 512). Motions to appear by telephone are denied as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 516 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #512 MIORELLI'S SETTLEMENT filed by Daniel Pipkin. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/9/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 515 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the March 15, 2018 Case Management Conference filed by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Lin, Wilson) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 514 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 513 Declaration of Sam Andrew Miorelli, E.I., Esq. in Support of #512 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.. (Related document(s) #512 ) (Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 512 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 7, 2018 Filing 511 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at March 15, 2018 Case Management Conference filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.. (Scott, Jeff) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 6, 2018 Filing 510 CLERK'S Letter Spreading #509 Mandate to Counsel. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER of USCA dismissing the appeal without prejudice to its reinstatement upon the occurrence of any of the Triggering Occurrences as defined by the parties herein and the Objector-Appellants filing a timely motion to reinstate.as to #488 Notice of Appeal filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 1, 2018 Filing 508 CLERK'S NOTICE. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2018 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Objector Miorelli shall also appear at that time. Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
March 19, 2017 Filing 507 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosanne L. Mah (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 3/19/2017)
March 13, 2017 Filing 506 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Gordon M. Fauth, Jr (Fauth, Gordon) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER of USCA dismissing appeal for failure to perfect as to #489 Notice of Appeal filed by Patrick S. Sweeney. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
January 4, 2017 Filing 504 NOTICE OF FILING OF CHAPTER 11 BANKRUPTCY by Pantech Wireless, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lin, Wilson) (Filed on 1/4/2017) Modified on 1/5/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #501 Mr. Culp's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 502 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #501 MOTION to Alter Judgment ) of Plaintiffs filed byEric Thomas. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 17, 2016 Filing 501 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment filed by Scott Culp. Responses due by 12/1/2016. Replies due by 12/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 500 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 7/28/2016 before Judge Edward M. Chen, (Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
October 26, 2016 Filing 499 RESPONSE to re #498 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment by Michael Allan, Colleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Mark Laning, Leron Levy, Ryan McKeen, Jennifer Sue Patrick, Dao Phong, Daniel Pipkin, Clarissa Portals, Brian Sandstrom, Luke Szulczewski, Eric Thomas, James Douglas White. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #486 Objector Singer's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER of USCA as to #489 Notice of Appeal filed by Patrick S. Sweeney (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER of USCA as to #488 Notice of Appeal filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 18, 2016 Filing 494 USCA Case Number 16-16817 for #489 Notice of Appeal filed by Patrick S. Sweeney. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 18, 2016 Filing 493 USCA Case Number 16-16816 for #488 Notice of Appeal filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 12, 2016 Filing 492 REPLY (re #486 MOTION to Alter Judgment ) filed by Sandra Singer. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 491 RESPONSE (re #486 MOTION to Alter Judgment ) filed byDaniel Pipkin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
September 29, 2016 Filing 490 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 26, 2016 Filing 489 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Patrick S. Sweeney. Appeal of Order #483 , Order on Motion for Attorney Fees and Motion for Settlement #481 , Order, #482 , Judgment #485 (Appeal fee: FEE NOT PAID) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016) (USCA Case No. 16-16817)
September 23, 2016 Filing 488 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.. Appeal of Order #483 , Order, #482 , Judgment #485 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10796463 paid) (Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 9/23/2016) (USCA Case No. 16-16816)
September 20, 2016 Filing 487 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating 10/27/16 hearing on Sandra Singer's motion to alter or amend judgment. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 20, 2016 Filing 486 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Sandra Singer. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/4/2016. Replies due by 10/11/2016. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
August 25, 2016 Filing 485 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 25, 2016 Filing 484 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Re #481 , #482 and #483 . (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #424 Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/25/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER Granting #455 Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/25/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #455 Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval and Granting in Part and Denying in Part #424 Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, etc.(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 5, 2016 Filing 480 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Pipkin Re Notice of Errata on Objectors Sam Miorelli, Sandra Singer, Patrick Sweeney and Iris Campbell (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 5, 2016 Filing 479 ERRATA re #477 Declaration in Support, of Questions Regarding Dissemination of Notice by Daniel Pipkin. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 5, 2016 Filing 478 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Pipkin Re Service of Declaration of Alan Vasquez Responding to Questions Regarding Dissemination of Notice on Objectors Sam Miorelli, Sandra Singer, Patrick Sweeney and Iris Campbell (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 477 Declaration of Alan Vasquez in Support of #455 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) Responding to Questions Regarding Dissemination of Notice filed byDaniel Pipkin. (Related document(s) #455 ) (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 2, 2016 Filing 476 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/28/2016 before Edward M. Chen by Carrier IQ, Inc, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
August 2, 2016 Filing 475 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-28-2016, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2016. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 28, 2016 Filing 474 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2016 re #455 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) filed by Patrick Kenny, #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees.Total Time in Court 55 minutes. Court Reporter Name Debra Pas. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2016)
July 28, 2016 Filing 473 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on July 28, 2016 before Edward M. Chen by Daniel Pipkin, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 28, 2016 Filing 472 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2016 re #455 MOTION for Settlement and #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Supplemental briefing due 8/4/16 ( as soon as possible). Court will then take the matter under submission and to issue order.Total Time in Court 55 minutes. Court Reporter Name Debra Pas. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2016)
July 25, 2016 Filing 497 NOTICE of 2nd Supplement to Opposition and 2nd Supplement to Opposition to Proposed Settlement filed by Sandra Singer. (Attachments: #1 Email Transmission, #2 Fax Confirmation 1, #3 Fax Confirmation 2)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 471 Statement Notice of Incorrect Addresses by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.. (Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 20, 2016 Filing 470 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Pipkin Re Service of Supplemental Declaration of Daniel L. Warshaw in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Objections to Class Settlement on Objectors Sam Miorelli, Sandra Singer, Patrick S. Sweeney and Iris V. Campbell (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 20, 2016 Filing 469 Declaration of Daniel L. Warshaw in Support of #464 Response ( Non Motion ) Supplemental Declaration of Daniel L. Warshaw in Support of Response to Objections filed byDaniel Pipkin. (Related document(s) #464 ) (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #461 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 18, 2016 Filing 467 REQUEST for Docket Correction by Sandra Singer, Class Member Interested Party. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Fax Confirmation 1, #3 Fax Confirmation 2)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 14, 2016 Filing 465 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Pipkin Re Service of Plaintiffs' Response to Objections to Class Settlement on Objectors Sam Miorelli, Sandra Singer, Patrick S. Sweeney and Iris V. Campbell (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 14, 2016 Filing 464 RESPONSE to Objections to Class Settlement by Daniel Pipkin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel L. Warshaw)(Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 12, 2016 Filing 463 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eric Thomas re #462 Declaration in Support (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
July 11, 2016 Filing 466 NOTICE filed by Kasey F. Hoffman to separate from class (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
July 11, 2016 Filing 462 Declaration of KENNETH JUE On Behalf of Settlement Administrator filed byDaniel Pipkin. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 461 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 460 NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Affidavits in Support of Objection to Class Action Settlement by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 459 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Pipkin Re Service of Final Approval Documents on Objectors Sam A. Miorelli, Sandra Singer, Patrick S. Sweeney and Iris V. Campbell (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 23, 2016 Filing 458 Declaration of Kenneth Jue in Support of #455 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) on Behalf of Settlement Administrator filed byPatrick Kenny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #455 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 Filing 457 Declaration of Alan Vasquez in Support of #455 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) re Implementation of Notice Dissemination Plan filed byPatrick Kenny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) #455 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 Filing 456 Declaration of Daniel L. Warshaw in Support of #455 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) #455 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 Filing 455 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) filed by Patrick Kenny. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/7/2016. Replies due by 7/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 13, 2016 Filing 454 NOTICE of Opposition to Proposed Settlement filed by Sandra Singer. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 13, 2016 Filing 453 OBJECTION to settlement filed by Sandra Singer. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 7, 2016 Filing 452 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Settlement filed by Patrick Sweeney. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 6, 2016 Filing 451 MOTION for Declaration; for Summons; for Complaint filed by Scott Culp. Responses due by 6/20/2016. Replies due by 6/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 6, 2016 Filing 450 OBJECTIONS to Class Action Settlement filed by Sam A. Miorelli. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 19, 2016 Filing 449 Letter dated 5/14/16 from Sean A. Riker requesting to join class action suit. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 448 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pantech Wireless, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pantech Inc. for Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Lin, Wilson) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 447 Declaration of Douglas White in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 446 Declaration of Eric Thomas in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 445 Declaration of Luke Szulczewski in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byLuke Szulczewski. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 444 Declaration of Brian Sandstrom in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byBrian Sandstrom. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 443 Declaration of Clarissa Portales in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 442 Declaration of Daniel Pipkin in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 441 Declaration of Dao Phong in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 440 Declaration of Jennifer Patrick in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 439 Declaration of Ryan McKeen in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 438 Declaration of Leron Levy in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 437 Declaration of Mark Laning in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 436 Declaration of Patrick Kenny in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 435 Declaration of Shawn Grisham in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 434 Declaration of Colleen Fischer in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byColleen Fischer. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 433 Declaration of Gary Cribbs in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 432 Declaration of Bobby Cline in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 431 Declaration of Michael Allan in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 430 Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 429 Declaration of Charles E. Schaffer in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 428 Declaration of Paul R. Kiesel in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 427 Declaration of J. Paul Gignac in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 426 Declaration of Daniel L. Warshaw in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 425 Declaration of Robert F. Lopez in Support of #424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed byEric Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #424 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 424 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards to Class Representatives filed by Eric Thomas. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/6/2016. Replies due by 7/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 423 OBJECTION to settlement filed by Iris Campbell. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 422 NOTICE by Daniel Pipkin of Withdrawal of Attorney Robert G. Retana (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #403 motion for preliminary approval of settlement. Final approval hearing set for 7/28/16 at 1:30 p.m. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 29, 2016 Filing 420 Proposed Order re #403 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, Provisional Certification of Settlement Class, and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel by Daniel Pipkin. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 29, 2016 Filing 419 NOTICE by Daniel Pipkin of Filing Amended Stipulation of Settlement and Release (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 23, 2016 Filing 418 RESPONSE to re #416 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Court's Order of February 16, 2016) by Eric Thomas. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 16, 2016 Filing 417 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2016 re #403 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, Provisional Certification of Settlement Class, and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed by Eric Thomas Motion hearing for final approval of settlement set for 7/28/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.Total Time in Court 35 minutes. Court Reporter Name JoAnn Bryce. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part #410 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 11, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #403 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, Provisional Certification of Settlement Class, and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel . Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #414 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 9, 2016 Filing 414 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the February 16, 2016 hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Class filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.. (Scott, Jeff) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 8, 2016 Filing 413 NOTICE by Peter Medine of Withdrawal of Attorney (Gross, Marc) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 412 RESPONSE to re #408 Order JOINT Response to Section D Re Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence Regarding Scope of Release by Carrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 411 Supplemental Brief re #408 Order filed byDaniel Pipkin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel L. Warshaw in Support of Joint Response to Order Re Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence, #2 Declaration of Tyler Newby in Response to Order Re Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence, #3 Declaration of Alan Vasquez in Response to Order Re Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence, #4 Declaration Exhibits to Declaration of Alan Vasquez in Response to Order Re Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence, #5 Proposed Order [Amended Proposed] Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement; Appointing Class Representatives And Class Counsel; Appointing Claims Administrator; and Providing for Notice to Settlement Class Members)(Related document(s) #408 ) (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 410 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Responsive to Order re Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence filed by Eric Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Stipulation re the Filing Under Seal of Confidential Material Responsive to Order re Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Confidential Supplemental Agreement (for in camera review), #5 Declaration of Magnolia Mobley re Financial Condition of Carrier IQ Inc, #6 *document stricken pursuant to #416 Court Order*Confidential Supplemental Declaration of Robert F. Lopez in Response to Order re Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/2/2016) Modified on 2/18/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2016 Filing 409 NOTICE by Huawei Device USA, Inc. Notice of Signed Settlement Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER re #403 Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/26/2016. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 407 Declaration of Alan Vasquez in Support of #403 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, Provisional Certification of Settlement Class, and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed byEric Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #403 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 406 Declaration of Simon J. Frankel in Support of #403 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, Provisional Certification of Settlement Class, and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed byEric Thomas. (Related document(s) #403 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 405 Declaration of Daniel L. Warshaw in Support of #403 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, Provisional Certification of Settlement Class, and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed byEric Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #403 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 404 Declaration of Robert F. Lopez in Support of #403 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, Provisional Certification of Settlement Class, and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed byEric Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #403 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 403 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, Provisional Certification of Settlement Class, and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel filed by Eric Thomas. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/5/2016. Replies due by 2/12/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 402 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Consolidated Amended Complaint against Carrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc.. Filed byEric Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 401 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ryan Mark Ferrell (Ferrell, Ryan) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 400 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #399 Extending Time to File Settlement Agreement and Continuing Preliminary Approval Hearing Date filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/19/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 399 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Settlement Agreement and Continuing Preliminary Approval Hearing Date filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 14, 2016 Filing 398 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. re #397 Notice of Change In Counsel (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 14, 2016 Filing 397 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Krista M. Enns (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
November 18, 2015 Filing 396 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/17/2015. Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Hearing set for 1/28/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Motion due: 1/15/16. FTR Time 11:52-11:55. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 395 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.. (Scott, Jeff) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 394 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #393 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Changing Date of Case Management Conference filed by Daniel Pipkin. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2015 11:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 21, 2015 Filing 393 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Changing Date of Case Management Conference filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 392 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/15/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2015 11:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.FTR Time 11:31-11:35. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/16/2015)
October 8, 2015 Filing 391 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Leung, Shouying) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 390 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Krista M. Enns (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Enns, Krista) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 3, 2015 Filing 389 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/3/2015. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2015 11:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.FTR Time 11:21-11:28. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/3/2015)
August 27, 2015 Filing 388 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 387 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Gary Edward Klein Regarding Klein Kavanagh Costello, LLP (Klein, Gary) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 24, 2015 Filing 386 CLERK'S NOTICE. Parties shall appear in person at the 9/3/15 11:15 a.m. Further CMC. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015) Modified on 8/24/2015 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2015 Filing 385 CLERK'S NOTICE advancing CMC from 10/8/15 to 9/3/15 at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2015.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 21, 2015 Filing 384 Letter from Plaintiffs and Defendants . (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 383 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/30/2015. Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2015. Further telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2015 11:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Plaintiff counsel Dan Warshaw to coordinate the conference call.Court Reporter Name Debra Pas. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/31/2015)
July 28, 2015 Filing 382 Letter from Robert G. Retana Re CourtCall Information for 7/30/15 Telephonic Status Conference. (Retana, Robert) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 381 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Carrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc.. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 380 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Telephonic Further Case Management Conference from 11:15 a.m. to 1:15 p.m. on 7/30/2015 in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Counsel Dan Warshaw to coordinate conference call and to provide the Court the dial in number with a list of counsel to appear by 7/28/15. Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
June 30, 2015 Filing 379 CLERK'S NOTICE - 7/2/15 CMC has been rescheduled for 7/30/15 at 11:15 a.m. Please see Docket #378. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC CMC. Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset for 7/30/2015 11:15 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/29/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 28, 2015 Filing 377 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Reginald Von Terrell (Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 6/28/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 376 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by Carrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc.. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #373 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 374 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Rodger R. Cole (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 17, 2015 Filing 373 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the July 2, 2015 Case Management Conference filed by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Lin, Wilson) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
May 26, 2015 Filing 372 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/21/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2015.FTR Time 10:35-10:51. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/26/2015)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #369 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 14, 2015 Filing 370 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Retana, Robert) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 369 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the May 21, 2015 Case Management Conference filed by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lin, Wilson) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #367 Stipulation (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
May 4, 2015 Filing 367 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Statement Regarding Status of Mediation Efforts and Stipulation and [PROPOSED] Order Regarding Filing of Third Consolidated Amended Complaint) filed by Eric Thomas. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 366 NOTICE by Lindsay Padilla, Eliezer Pilowsky, Steven Watts of Withdrawal of Counsel (Parekh, Behram) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #357 Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 29, 2015 Filing 364 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Shub (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 10, 2015 Filing 363 RESPONSE (re #357 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byDaniel Pipkin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Retana, Robert) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #360 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Deadline to File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Daniel Pipkin. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/8/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER RESETTING CMC FOR 5/21/15 at 10:30 am. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/7/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
April 8, 2015 Filing 360 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Deadline to File Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 4/13/15 to 5/21/15 at 10:30 am in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2015. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/7/15. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. See #361.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015) Modified on 4/8/2015 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2015 Filing 359 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Retana, Robert) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
March 19, 2015 Filing 358 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Bryan H. Heckenlively Regarding Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California creating MDL No. 3:12-md-2330 EMC. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
March 13, 2015 Filing 357 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs filed by Amber Lambert, Jimmy Thulestone, Jonathan Rich. Responses due by 4/10/2015. Replies due by 4/24/2015. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying # 354 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 9, 2015 Filing 355 RESPONSE (re # 354 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the March 17, 2015 Mediation ) filed byEric Thomas. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 354 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the March 17, 2015 Mediation filed by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Lin, Wilson) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 5, 2015 Filing 353 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Further CMC from 3/23/15 to Monday 4/13/15 at 2:30 p.m. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
February 26, 2015 Filing 352 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Pantech Wireless, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lin, Wilson) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 10, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference reset for 3/23/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 351 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 01/29/15, before Judge Edward M. Chen. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 10:39 - 10:53. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re # 350 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2015. (Related documents(s) # 350 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 350 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by HTC America Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 349 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/29/2015. Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. FTR Time 10:39-10:53. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/2/2015)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying # 347 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel with full authority (even if not lead counsel) shall appear personally. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 28, 2015 Filing 347 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the January 29, 2015 Case Management Conference filed by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Lin, Wilson) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 28, 2015 Filing 346 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Wilson W Lin for Pantech Wireless, Inc. (Lin, Wilson) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting # 342 Motion to Appear by Telephone (as modified). Court to call counsel. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting # 340 Motion to Appear by Telephone (as modified, court to call counsel) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 22, 2015 Filing 343 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Bryan H. Heckenlively Regarding Jennifer Stevens, Esq. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 22, 2015 Filing 342 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the January 29, 2015 Case Management Conference filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Letkewicz, Christopher) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 22, 2015 Filing 341 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eric Thomas. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 22, 2015 Filing 340 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the January 29, 2015 CMC filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.. (Scott, Jeff) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part # 304 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2015: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (emcsec, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2015 Filing 338 Certificate of Interested Entities by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc. (Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER of USCA as to # 263 Notice of Appeal filed by Carrier IQ, Inc; # 261 Notice of Appeal filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
January 7, 2015 Filing 336 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Further CMC from 1/15/15 to 1/29/15 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2015. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
December 19, 2014 Filing 335 NOTICE by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. re # 331 Order, Set Deadlines, Set Hearings [Joint] Re Status of 12/16/2014 Mediation (Scott, Jeff) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 334 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Defendant Carrier IQ, Inc.'s Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Only as to Carrier IQ (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 333 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 332 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Responsive Pleading Deadline for Defendant LG Electronic, Inc. filed by Daniel Pipkin. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/16/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 332 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Responsive Pleading Deadline for Defendant LG Electronic, Inc. filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER Further Case Management Conference reset for 1/15/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Updated joint CMC Statement due 1/8/2015. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 330 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [FURTHER] filed by Carrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc.. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 329 Statement (Plaintiffs) Regarding Status of Mediation Efforts Among the Parties by Eric Thomas. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying # 324 Pantech Wireless Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion for Relief from Court-Ordered Mediation (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 327 RESPONSE to re # 325 Order, # 324 Ex Parte Application for Relief from Court Order Mediation Defendants' Joint Statement Regarding Ex Parte Application of Defendant Pantech Wireless, Inc. for Relief From Court-Ordered Mediation by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 326 RESPONSE (re # 324 Ex Parte Application for Relief from Court Order Mediation ) filed byEric Thomas. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER Re Pantech Wireless, Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion for Relief from Court-Ordered Mediation (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 324 Ex Parte Application for Relief from Court Order Mediation filed by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Aug. 19, 2014 Decision of Seoul Central District Court, Third Bankruptcy Division, # 3 Oct. 29, 2014 Order and Notice, U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Georgia)(Ajayi, Oluwaseun) (Filed on 11/7/2014) Modified on 11/10/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2014 Filing 323 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 18, 2014, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, Telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re # 321 Transcript Order, # 320 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2015. (Related documents(s) # 321 , # 320 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 3, 2014 Filing 322 NOTICE by Carrier IQ, Inc Joint Notice of Settlement (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 321 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Michael Allan for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 320 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carrier IQ, Inc for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Johnson, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 319 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 318 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/18/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 9/18/2014) re # 304 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., HTC America Inc, Carrier IQ, Inc, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., HTC Corporation. Under submission (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting # 315 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 316 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC of Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorney Andrew A. Nicely (Nicely, Andrew) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 315 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Ajayi, Oluwaseun) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 11, 2014 Filing 314 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobby Pouya (Pouya, Bobby) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 9, 2014 Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert George Retana (Retana, Robert) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 312 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. ADR deadline reset for 11/25/14. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 4, 2014 Filing 311 REPLY (re # 304 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint ) DEFENDANTS' CONSOLIDATED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byCarrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc.. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 310 NOTICE by Daniel Massey, Adam Schwartz, Edward Shumate, Eric Steiner, Matthew Thornton, Yonatan Wadler NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 309 RESPONSE (re # 304 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint ) filed byEric Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 308 STIPULATION AND ORDER # 307 TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/11/14. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 307 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline for Mediation filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
July 24, 2014 Filing 306 ERRATA re # 304 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint Corrected Table of Authorities by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Table of Authorities)(Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 24, 2014 Filing 305 Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to # 304 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint (Reason: Correcting an error) filed byCarrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc.. Responses due by 8/21/2014. Replies due by 9/4/2014. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 23, 2014 Filing 304 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Carrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/6/2014. Replies due by 8/13/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exh. A to Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Declaration of Tyler G. Newby In Support of Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Newby Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Newby Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Newby Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Newby Declaration, # 8 Proposed Order)(Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 303 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 298 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re # 286 Motion Hearing, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss Page Limit and Briefing filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/22/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 302 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ryan Mark Ferrell (Ferrell, Ryan) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 301 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. re # 300 Notice of Change In Counsel, # 299 Notice of Appearance of Christopher J. Letkewicz (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 300 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Krista M. Enns (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 299 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista M. Enns NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CHRISTOPHER J. LETKEWICZ (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 298 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re # 286 Motion Hearing,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss Page Limit and Briefing filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 297 USCA Case Number 14-15846 for # 263 Notice of Appeal filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 296 USCA Case Number 14-15843 for # 261 Notice of Appeal filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 295 NOTICE of Appearance by Annasara Guzzo Purcell (Purcell, Annasara) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/3/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
June 30, 2014 Filing 293 Letter from Joint Letter Regarding Selection of ADR Process . (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 24, 2014 Filing 292 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/12/2014, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re # 289 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2014. (Related documents(s) # 289 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 291 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Consolidated Amended Complaint against Carrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc.. Filed byDaniel Pipkin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Newsom, William) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 20, 2014 Filing 290 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carrier IQ, Inc for Court Reporter Kelly Bryce. (Melcher, Molly) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 18, 2014 Filing 289 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carrier IQ, Inc for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Melcher, Molly) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 288 Transcript of Official Electronic Proceedings held on 11/14/13, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candace Yount, e-mail: candace.yount@gmail.com, Telephone number 415-994-5619. Tape Number: 10:58-11:01. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re # 272 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2014. (Related documents(s) # 272 ) (Yount, Candace) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 Filing 287 Transcript of Official Electronic Proceedings held on 8/22/13, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candace Yount, e-mail: candace.yount@gmail.com, Telephone number 415-994-5619. Tape Number: 10:35-10:43. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re # 272 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2014. (Related documents(s) # 272 ) (Yount, Candace) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 16, 2014 Filing 286 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/12/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 6/16/2014) re # 267 First MOTION to Stay re # 251 Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Huawei Device USA, Inc.. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 9/18/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/21/2014. Replies due by 9/4/2014.Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/16/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying # 267 Defendants' Motion to Stay. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 9, 2014 Filing 284 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING held on 5/15/14, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jill R. Bryce/Bryce Reporting Services, Telephone number (510)828-9404, Email: Info@brycereporting.com. Tape Number: FTR 10:35-10:57. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re # 278 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2014. (Related documents(s) # 278 ) (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 283 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
May 28, 2014 Filing 282 REPLY (re # 267 First MOTION to Stay re # 251 Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration ) filed byHuawei Device USA, Inc.. (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 25, 2014 Filing 281 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-30-12, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224 wyattkathy994@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (Related documents(s) # 270 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2014)
May 21, 2014 Filing 280 RESPONSE (re # 267 First MOTION to Stay re # 251 Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration ) filed byDaniel Pipkin. (Newsom, William) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 279 Refund re # 264 Application for Refund; Approved. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 19, 2014 Filing 278 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Colleen Fischer for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 277 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/15/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 5/16/2014). Defendants' motion to stay/further CMC already se for 6/12/14 at 1:30 pm. (Recording #FTR 10:35-010:57.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 276 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 11/14/13, 03/12/14 before Judge EMC, re # 261 Notice of Appeal Transcript due by 4/28/2014. (Ballon, Ian) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 275 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Ballon, Ian) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 274 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ballon, Ian) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 273 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 5/24/12, 7/12/12, 11/30/12, 8/22/13, 9/18/13, 9/25/13 before Judge EMC, re # 261 Notice of Appeal Transcript due by 4/28/2014. (Ballon, Ian) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 272 **Correction: this is an order for FTR hearings held before EMC on 8/22/13 (not 8/23/13) and 11/14/13. ** TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 5/15/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2014 Filing 271 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 270 **Correction: this is an order for a transcript of the hearing Kathy Wyatt reported before EMC on 11/30/12 (not 12/3/12). ** TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 5/15/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2014 Filing 269 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 05/24/2012; 07/12/2012; 12/03/2012; 08/23/2013; 09/19/2013; 09/25/2013; 11/14/2013; 03/12/2014 before Judge Chen and Magistrate Judge Cousins, re # 263 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 6/27/2014. (Heckenlively, Bryan) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 8, 2014 Filing 268 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 7, 2014 Filing 267 First MOTION to Stay re # 251 Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Huawei Device USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/21/2014. Replies due by 5/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Appeal of March 28, 2014 Order Denying Motion to Compel Arbitration)(Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 266 Letter from LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. regarding Service (Amended Letter) . (Scott, Jeff) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 265 Letter from LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. regarding Service . (Scott, Jeff) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 264 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-8571390 by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Melcher, Molly) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 263 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Carrier IQ, Inc.(Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-8571439 paid.) Defendants Carrier IQ, Inc., HTC America, Inc. Huawei Devices USA, Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC's Notice of Appeal From Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation [Dkt. No. 129] (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement)(Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (USCA Case No. 14-15846)
April 28, 2014 Filing 262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. re # 261 Notice of Appeal (Scott, Jeff) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 261 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.. Appeal of Order on Motion to Compel # 251 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-8570143 paid) (Scott, Jeff) (Filed on 4/28/2014) (USCA Case No. 14-15843)
April 24, 2014 Filing 260 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/15/2014, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email leomank@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2014. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 259 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carrier IQ, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Melcher, Molly) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 258 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/15/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 4/16/2014), Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/15/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 4/16/2014). Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Def's Motion to stay Hearing set for 6/12/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (Recording #10:35-11:02.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 257 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Lance Allan Etcheverry (Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 8, 2014 Filing 256 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting # 254 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 Filing 254 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at April 15, 2014 CMC filed by Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 1, 2014 Filing 253 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine RH Gasztonyi (Gasztonyi, Katherine) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 252 CLERKS NOTICE setting CMC for Tuesday 4/15/14 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying # 129 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 250 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/12/14, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Official Reporter, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2014. (Related documents(s) # 248 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 249 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Colleen Fischer for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 14, 2014 Filing 248 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carrier IQ, Inc for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah Susan Strawn Guyon as counsel for Defendant LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. (Guyon, Rebekah) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 246 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 3/12/2014) re # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Under submission (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/12/2014)
March 11, 2014 Filing 245 Letter regarding Defendants' Consolidated Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation . (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 244 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 243 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re # 238 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [UNREDACTED] PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS by Colleen Fischer. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 242 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re # 238 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Declaration of Robert F. Lopez by Colleen Fischer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 241 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND CMC from 3/13/14 to Wednesday 3/12/14 at 10:00 a.m. Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof . Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 240 Declaration of Tyler G. Newby in Support of # 239 Reply to Opposition/Response, Reply Declaration of Tyler G. Newby in Support of Defendants' Consolidated Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation filed byCarrier IQ, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) # 239 ) (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 239 REPLY (re # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof ) Defendants' Consolidated Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation filed byCarrier IQ, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting # 231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 237 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (re Notices of Appearance by Jeff Scott, Ian Ballon, Lori Chang) (Scott, Jeff) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Chang for Defendant LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. (Chang, Lori) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Ballon for Defendant LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. (Ballon, Ian) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff Eric Scott for Defendant LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. (Scott, Jeff) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL re (36 in 3:11-cv-06199-EMC) Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., (232 in 3:12-md-02330-EMC) Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., (28 in 3:11-cv-06160-EMC) Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics Mobile Research U.S.A., LLC, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/7/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 232 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jeff Eric Scott for Defendant LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (Scott, Jeff) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Patrick Kenny. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Opposition, # 4 Unredacted Version of Opposition)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 230 DECLARATION of Eric Thomas in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 229 DECLARATION of Luke Szulczewski in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 228 DECLARATION of Brian Sandstrom in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 227 DECLARATION of Clarissa Portales in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 226 DECLARATION of Daniel Pipkin in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 225 DECLARATION of Dao Phong in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 224 DECLARATION of Ryan McKeen in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 223 DECLARATION of Leron Levy in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 222 DECLARATION of Mark Laning in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 221 DECLARATION of Patrick Kenny in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 220 DECLARATION of Shawn Grisham in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 219 DECLARATION of Colleen Fischer in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 218 DECLARATION of Gary Cribbs in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 217 DECLARATION of Bobby Cline in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 216 DECLARATION of Michael Allan in Opposition to # 215 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPatrick Kenny. (Related document(s) # 215 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 215 RESPONSE (re # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof ) filed byPatrick Kenny. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 214 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jason S. Cowart (Withdrawal of Jason S. Cowart) (Cowart, Jason) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 212 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Carrier IQ, Inc, Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 212 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Compel Arbitration , # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof . Responses due by 1/21/2014. Replies due by 2/20/2014.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 212 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE of Change in of Counsel by Oluwaseun O. Ajayi (Ajayi, Oluwaseun) (Filed on 1/8/2014) Modified on 1/9/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2013 Filing 210 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jesse Bernard Levin - Withdrawal (Levin, Jesse) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 209 Letter from Joint Letter re Status of Google Discovery . (Newsom, William) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
November 19, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof . Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 18, 2013 Filing 208 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2013 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 11/18/2013). Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Responses due by 1/20/2014. Replies due by 2/19/2014. Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Compel Arbitration #129 Hearing set for 3/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (Recording #1058-1101.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2013) Modified on 11/18/2013 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting plaintiffs' and Google's stipulation # 206 . Plaintiffs and Google must file an updated joint letter regarding the status of the discovery by December 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/15/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 13, 2013 Filing 206 Letter from Plaintiffs and Google re: Compromise . (Newsom, William) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins GRANTING AS MODIFIED # 203 Stipulation. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 7, 2013 Filing 204 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [FURTHER] filed by Carrier IQ, . (Johnson, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/7/2013) Modified on 11/8/2013 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2013 Filing 203 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Time for Defendant HTC America, Inc. to Respond to Interrogatory No. 13 as Provided in Discovery Order filed by HTC America Inc. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying # 200 # 201 Defendants' and Google's Motion for Partial Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 201 Joinder re # 200 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. No. 194) by Google Inc.. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 200 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. No. 194) filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Responses due by 10/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tyler G. Newby, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Tyler G. Newby, # 3 Proposed Order)(Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 199 Letter from Joint Discovery Letter re Plaintiffs and Google . (Newsom, William) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER [AS MODIFIED] CONTINUING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES 11-13 AS PROVIDED IN DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 7, 2013 Filing 197 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Time for Defendants to Respond to Interrogatories 11-13 as Provided in Discovery Order filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 7, 2013 Filing 196 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING FURTHER CMC FOR 11/14/13 at 11:00 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
September 29, 2013 Filing 195 Transcript of Proceedings of Official Electronic Sound Recording held on 9-25-13, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Oourder No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2013)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS # 172 , # 173 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/27/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 193 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by HTC America Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 192 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Page, Michael) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 191 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carrier IQ, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 25, 2013 Filing 190 Minute Entry: Further Discovery Hearing re # 172 # 173 held on 9/25/2013 before Nathanael Cousins. Court to issue order. (FTR: 1:46pm-2:12pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2013)
September 23, 2013 Filing 189 Transcript of Proceedings of Official Electronic sound recording held on 9-18-13, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 23, 2013 Filing 188 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by HTC America Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ring, Rosemarie) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 187 Proposed Order re # 172 Joint Discovery Letter Brief by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 186 Proposed Order re # 173 Joint Discovery Letter Brief with third-party Google, Inc. by Daniel Pipkin. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 185 Proposed Discovery Letter Brief [Proposed] Order re Joint Discovery Letter Brief with Non-Party Google filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Newsom, William) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 184 Proposed Order re # 172 Joint Discovery Letter Brief by Daniel Pipkin. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 183 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing re Joint Discovery Letter Briefs # 172 # 173 held on 9/18/2013 before Nathanael Cousins. Further Hearing re # 173 set for 9/25/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (FTR: 3:12pm-4:02pm.) (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 182 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Colleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Eric Thomas for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 181 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carrier IQ, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Melcher, Molly) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 180 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Tangri, Ragesh) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE HEARING RE JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF # 178 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 18, 2013 Filing 178 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 176 Clerks Notice, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Google Inc.. (Tangri, Ragesh) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 177 Letter from Emily Griffen to Judge Cousins . (Donato, James) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 176 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS # 172 # 173 for 9/18/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text-only entry generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 10, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for Discovery docket nos. # 172 and # 173 only (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Disputes (joint letters Docket Nos. 172 and 173 only). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 174 STATUS REPORT re Arbitration Related Discovery Disputes with Third Parties by Daniel Pipkin. (Newsom, William) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 173 Joint Discovery Letter Brief with third-party Google, Inc. filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A - Subpoena)(Newsom, William) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 172 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A - Excerpted Discovery Requests, # 2 Exhibit Attachment B - Excerpted Discovery Responses and Objections)(Newsom, William) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT LETTER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/23/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 170 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/22/2013 before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint letter due 9/6/13. (Date Filed: 8/23/2013). (Recording #1035-1042.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/23/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 169 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Colleen Fischer. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 16, 2013 Filing 168 CLERKS NOTICE - FURTHER CMC SET FOR 8/22/13 at 10:30 a.m. UPDATED JOINT CMC STATEMENT WAS DUE ON 8/15/13. PLEASE FILE JOINT STATEMENT BY 8/19/13 NOON. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Rodger R. Cole in Yastrab v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al., Case No. 3:12-cv-02318-EMC (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodger R. Cole on behalf of Defendant Carrier IQ, Inc. in Yastrab v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al., Case No. 3:12-cv-02318 (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 19, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE by Daniel Massey NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Kiesel, Paul) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
June 27, 2013 Filing 164 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' status report re third party discovery by Daniel Pipkin. (Newsom, William) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 7, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2013. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 162 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/7/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 162 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 161 STATUS REPORT Re: Arbitration-Related Discovery by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Carrier IQ, Inc Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 8, 2013 Filing 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 11, 2013 Filing 158 Letter Joint Status Letter . (Newsom, William) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen re # 155 Joint Letter of March 21, 2013 (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 22, 2013 Filing 156 NOTICE by Daniel Pipkin OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND E-MAIL ADDRESSES (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 155 Joint Discovery Letter Brief On Behalf of All Plaintiffs and Defendants filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Newsom, William) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen withdrawing # 152 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting # 153 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Diamand) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 16, 2013 Filing 153 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Nicholas Diamand - with attached State of New York Certificate of Good Service CORRECTION OF DOCKET #152 ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7553942.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/15/2013 filed by Michael Allan. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/16/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 152 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT # 153 . *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7553942.) filed by Michael Allan. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/15/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (fff, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2013 Filing 151 NOTICE by Michael Allan of Withdrawal of Eduardo E. Santacana (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 149 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 12, 2013 Filing 149 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
February 15, 2013 Filing 148 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND SETTING CMC FOR 5/16/13 AT 10:30 A.M. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2013. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 14, 2013 Filing 147 STATUS REPORT : Further Joint Status Report and Request for Vacation of March 7, 2013 Hearing Date On Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 146 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Krista M. Enns (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 23, 2013 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista M. Enns (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 18, 2013 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry Sachiko Kumabe (Kumabe, Kerry) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
January 17, 2013 Filing 143 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
December 3, 2012 Filing 142 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/30/2012 before Edward M. Chen. Plaintiffs to provide discovery to defendants by 12/7/12. Carrier IQs Motion to Compel Arbitration is scheduled for 3/7/13 at 1:30 p.m. By 1/17/13, parties to submit a joint status report to the Court as to whether the motion to compel arbitration and the briefing schedule need to be extended. (Date Filed: 12/3/2012). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2012)
November 27, 2012 Filing 141 Certificate of Interested Entities by Carrier IQ, Inc (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 26, 2012 Filing 140 Certificate of Interested Entities by Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc. (Etcheverry, Lance) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 26, 2012 Filing 139 Certificate of Interested Entities by Huawei Device USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. for Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 23, 2012 Filing 138 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Further Joint Case Management Conference Statement) filed by Daniel Pipkin. (Newsom, William) (Filed on 11/23/2012)
November 23, 2012 Filing 137 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pantech Wireless, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pantech Co., Ltd. for Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Helge, Wayne) (Filed on 11/23/2012)
November 21, 2012 Filing 136 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION FROM 3/8/13 TO 3/7/13 at 1:30 p.m. (Judge Chen's new law and motions are heard on Thursday), Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof . Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Parties to discuss briefing schedule at next CMC. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 20, 2012 Filing 135 Declaration of STEPHANIE MILLER in Support of # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byCarrier IQ, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ, # 44 Exhibit RR, # 45 Exhibit SS, # 46 Exhibit TT, # 47 Exhibit UU, # 48 Exhibit VV, # 49 Exhibit WW, # 50 Exhibit XX, # 51 Exhibit YY, # 52 Exhibit ZZ, # 53 Exhibit AAA, # 54 Exhibit BBB, # 55 Exhibit CCC, # 56 Exhibit DDD, # 57 Exhibit EEE, # 58 Exhibit FFF, # 59 Exhibit GGG, # 60 Exhibit HHH)(Related document(s) # 129 ) (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 20, 2012 Filing 134 Declaration of RICK BAUGHMAN in Support of # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byCarrier IQ, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Baughman Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Baughman Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Baughman Declaration)(Related document(s) # 129 ) (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 20, 2012 Filing 133 Declaration of SCOTT WILLIAMSON in Support of # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byCarrier IQ, Inc. (Related document(s) # 129 ) (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 20, 2012 Filing 132 Declaration of CHENELL CUMMINGS in Support of # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byCarrier IQ, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Cummings Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Cummings Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Cummings Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Cummings Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Cummings Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Cummings Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Cummings Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Cummings Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Cummings Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Cummings Declaration)(Related document(s) # 129 ) (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 20, 2012 Filing 131 Declaration of JOHN THROCKMORTON in Support of # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byCarrier IQ, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Throckmorton Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Throckmorton Declaration)(Related document(s) # 129 ) (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 20, 2012 Filing 130 Declaration of STACIE DOBBS in Support of # 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byCarrier IQ, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Dobbs Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Dobbs Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Dobbs Declaration)(Related document(s) # 129 ) (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 20, 2012 Filing 129 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 1/22/2013. Replies due by 2/21/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation, # 2 Declaration of Tyler G. Newby In Support of Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Newby Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Newby Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Newby Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Newby Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Newby Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 6 to Newby Declaration, # 9 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation)(Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 127 Regarding Page Limits for Motion to Compel Arbitration Briefing filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/19/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 16, 2012 Filing 127 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Page Limits for Motion to Compel Arbitration Briefing filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 16, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions to compel arbitration due by 11/20/2012. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 5, 2012 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne Michael Helge for Defendant Pantech Wireless, Inc. (Helge, Wayne) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 123 Second Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Continuance of Time for Defendants to File Motion(s) to Compel Arbitration and Regarding A Briefing Schedule filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 1, 2012 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jane Johnson (Johnson, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
November 1, 2012 Filing 123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Continuance of Time for Defendants to File Motion(s) to Compel Arbitration and Regarding A Briefing Schedule filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 25, 2012 Filing 122 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING FURTHER CMC FOR 11/30/12 AT 11:45 A.M. WITH PROCEDURE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2012 11:45 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 25, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Def's Motion to compel arbitration due by 11/6/2012. Opposition due 40 days of completion of arbitration discovery. Reply due 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff to serve arbitration related discovery by 11/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 24, 2012 Filing 121 Certificate of Interested Entities by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Amended) (Beck, Norman) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by James Donato on behalf of Defendant LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. (Donato, James) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 118 for Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by Carrier IQ, Inc Case Management Statement due by 11/19/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2012 10:31 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/19/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 118 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Melcher, Molly) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE MOTION(S) TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND REGARDING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE re # 116 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on October 10, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
October 8, 2012 Filing 116 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Time for Defendants to file Motion(s) to Compel Arbitration and Regarding A Briefing Schedule filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 10/8/2012)
September 28, 2012 Filing 115 Mail sent to Daniel Dennis Dolan II returned as undeliverable re # 20 Pretrial Order. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Protective Order filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 111 for Continuance of Time for Plaintiffs to File a Stipulation Regarding Entry of a Protective Order filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 10, 2012 Filing 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Continuance of Time for Plaintiffs to File a Stipulation Regarding Entry of a Protective Order filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Melcher, Molly) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re # 108 Plaintiffs' Proposed Guidelines to Limit Costs and Expenses. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 5, 2012 Filing 109 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 27, 2012 Filing 108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [PROPOSED] GUIDELINES TO LIMIT COSTS AND EXPENSES, INCLUDING ATTORNEYS FEES filed by Daniel Pipkin, Chad Ulrich. (Newsom, William) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 27, 2012 Filing 107 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Consolidated Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byColleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Eric Thomas. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 105 for Continuance of Time for Plaintiffs to File a Stipulation Regarding Entry of a Protective Order filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/14/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 10, 2012 Filing 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Continuance of Time for Plaintiffs to File a Stipulation Regarding Entry of a Protective Order filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. (Melcher, Molly) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 Filing 104 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew Laurence Tuccillo (Tuccillo, Matthew) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Re Plaintiff Shively's Motion to Remand (Docket No. 10, Case No. C-12-0290 EMC). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/24/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 102 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 12, 2012, before Judge Jospeh C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 101 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Withour Prejudice of Defendant Research in Motion by John Leinicke, Leron Levy, Peter Lowden, Lisa McClaskey, Hayley Medrano, Craig Schmidt, Ilya Torchinsky (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Voluntary Dismissal)(Moss, Andrew) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re # 68 # 77 Plaintiffs' Motions to Appoint Lead Counsel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 12, 2012 Filing 99 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2012 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 7/12/2012) re (10 in 3:12-cv-00290-EMC) MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Rodney Shively, (77 in 3:12-md-02330-EMC) Joint MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND PLAINTIFFS LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by James Douglas White, Mark Laning, Israel Olivares, Clarissa Portals, Lisa Clark, (68 in 3:12-md-02330-EMC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Pearson, Simon, Warshaw & Penny, LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Colleen Fischer, Jerimiah Thomas Moree, Patrick Kenny. (1) Court took motion to remand under submission and will issue order. (2) Court appointed Hagens Berman and Pearson Simon firms as co-lead counsel. Court to issue detailed order. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/12/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 98 NOTICE by Lindsay Padilla, Eliezer Pilowsky, Steven Watts Change of Attorney's Name (Baker, Heather) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 97 Declaration of Robert F. Lopez In Support of Administrative Motion To File Ex Parte In Camera Berman Declaration Under Seal filed byColleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Eric Thomas. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 96 NOTICE by Colleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Eric Thomas of Retrieval of Ex Parte In Camera Declaration of Steve W. Berman In Support of Application To Appoint Hagens Berman and Pearson Simon as Interim Co-Lead Counsel (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 9, 2012 Filing 95 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byRodney Shively. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) # 25 ) (Scarlett, Gregory) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying # 75 Kenny, Thomas, and Fischer Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 28, 2012 Filing 93 REPLY (re # 65 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae ) filed byDavid Ratner. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ratner, David) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 92 RESPONSE (re # 65 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae ) of Morelli Ratner PC in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed byCarrier IQ, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 12, 2012 Filing 91 RESPONSE (re # 75 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) the Ex Parte In Camera Declaration of Steve W. Berman In Support of Application to Appoint Hagens Berman and Pearson Simon as Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed byCarrier IQ, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Ex Parte In Camera Declaration of Steve W. Berman In Support of Application to Appoint Hagens Berman and Pearson Simon as Interim Co-Lead Counsel)(Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 Filing 90 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION TO FILE BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE FOR 7/12/12 at 2:30 p.m. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (65 in 3:12-md-02330-EMC) MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae, (32 in 3:12-cv-00290-EMC) MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae, (10 in 3:12-cv-00290-EMC) MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities . Responses due by 6/22/2012. Replies due by 6/29/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012) Modified on 6/12/2012 (bpf, COURT STAFF).This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL (C12-2402). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/12/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:12-md-02330-EMC; granting (12) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 3:12-cv-02324-EMC (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:12-md-02330-EMC; granting (18) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Todd M. Raskin terminated in case 3:12-cv-02323-EMC (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:12-md-02330-EMC; granting (19) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Charles E. Vermette, Jr terminated in case 3:12-cv-02321-EMC (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:12-md-02330-EMC; granting (29) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gail C. Bradford terminated in case 3:12-cv-02319-EMC (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:12-md-02330-EMC; granting (20) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Christopher E. Carey terminated in case 3:12-cv-02313-EMC (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:12-md-02330-EMC; granting (26) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney James Christie terminated in case 3:12-cv-02312-EMC (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:12-md-02330-EMC; granting (16) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Neil E. Holmen and Ryan Jason Rodman terminated in case 3:12-cv-02150-EMC (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen in case 3:12-md-02330-EMC; granting (15) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Rodger R. Cole for Carrier IQ, Inc,. Attorney Edward P. Gibbons terminated in case 3:12-cv-02058-EMC (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 11, 2012 Motions for appointment of Plaintiffs' counsel set for 7/12/12 at 2:30 p.m. Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 65 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae, # 77 Joint MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND PLAINTIFFS LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF , # 75 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , # 68 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Pearson, Simon, Warshaw & Penny, LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof . Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 11, 2012 Filing 80 Proposed Order re # 68 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Pearson, Simon, Warshaw & Penny, LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Colleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Eric Thomas. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 11, 2012 Filing 79 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of # 68 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Pearson, Simon, Warshaw & Penny, LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byColleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Eric Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) # 68 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 78 Brief re # 77 Joint MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND PLAINTIFFS LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byLeron Levy, Peter Lowden, Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo, Craig Schmidt, Amandeep Singh. (Related document(s) # 77 ) (Strange, Brian) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 77 Joint MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND PLAINTIFFS LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Lisa Clark, Mark Laning, Israel Olivares, Clarissa Portals, James Douglas White. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/22/2012. Replies due by 6/29/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian R. Strange, # 2 Exhibit)(Strange, Brian) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 76 Declaration (submitted under seal) re # 75 Administrative Motion To File Ex Parte In Camera Berman Declaration Under Seal filed by Colleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Eric Thomas. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/8/2012) Modified on 6/11/2012 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2012 Filing 75 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Colleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Eric Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 74 Declaration of Paul R. Kiesel in Support of # 68 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Pearson, Simon, Warshaw & Penny, LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byColleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Eric Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) # 68 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 73 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Louis Kelly (Kelly, Michael) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 72 Declaration of Rosemary Rivas in Support of # 68 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Pearson, Simon, Warshaw & Penny, LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byColleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Eric Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) # 68 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 71 Declaration of Charles E. Schaffer in Support of # 68 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Pearson, Simon, Warshaw & Penny, LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byColleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Eric Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) # 68 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 70 Declaration of J. Paul Gignac in Support of # 68 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Pearson, Simon, Warshaw & Penny, LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byColleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Eric Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) # 68 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 69 Declaration of Bruce L. Simon in Support of # 68 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Pearson, Simon, Warshaw & Penny, LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byColleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Jerimiah Thomas Moree. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) # 68 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 68 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Pearson, Simon, Warshaw & Penny, LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Colleen Fischer, Patrick Kenny, Jerimiah Thomas Moree. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) *** PROPOSED ORDER FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT # 80 . *** (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/8/2012) Modified on 6/11/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2012 Filing 67 NOTICE by Greg Feitelson, Jeremy Feitelson, Patrick Kenny, Justin Sharp Manual Filing Notification (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Ratner re # 65 Supplemental MOTION to Remand TO STATE COURT (Ratner, David) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of MOTION to Remand filed by David Ratner. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/6/2012. Replies due by 7/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ratner, David) (Filed on 6/8/2012) Modified on 6/11/2012 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Louis Kelly (Kelly, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
May 31, 2012 Filing 63 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/24/12, before Judge EDWARD M. CHEN. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2012. (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 30, 2012 Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Andy Kacmarcik. Service waived by Carrier IQ, Inc waiver sent on 5/2/2012, answer due 7/2/2012. (Mather, Corey) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 30, 2012 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Andy Kacmarcik. Service waived by Sprint Spectrum LP waiver sent on 5/23/2012, answer due 7/23/2012. (Mather, Corey) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Re Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motions to Appoint Lead Counsel. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall file their motions for appointment as lead counsel by June 8, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/24/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 24, 2012 Filing 59 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/24/2012 before Edward M. Chen Plaintiff's motion to appoint leadership and Shively's motion to remand are set for 7/12/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Plaintiffs to file a motion to appoint leadership by 6/8/12. Plaintiffs to file a consolidated amended complaint 45 days after appointment of lead counsel. Plaintiffs to file stipulations re: protective order, etc. 30 days after appointment of lead counsel. Defendants to file a motion to compel arbitration 45 days after the consolidated amended complaint is filed. Parties shall file the Rule 26(a) initial disclosures 30 days after the consolidated amended complaint is filed. Formal discovery otherwise stayed pending further order or stipulation. Arbitration related discovery shall be deferred until after the motion to compel arbitration is filed. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.)(Date Filed: 5/24/2012). (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2012)
May 24, 2012 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Nextel, Sprint Spectrum LP re # 57 Notice of Appearance (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 24, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Alger (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 23, 2012 Filing 56 CLERKS NOTICE re check in process at CMC on 5/24/12 at 9:00 a.m. - Counsel who will appear in Court: Please have two business cards ready for check in. Please write down the following information on the front of both cards then hand them to the Clerk:(1) Case number(2) Who do you represent (i.e. Plaintiff Kenny, Defendant Apple) This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 18, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Mark Ferrell (Ferrell, Ryan) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 18, 2012 Filing 54 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Michael Siegel v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Northern District of Illinois. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 18, 2012 Filing 53 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Cheryl Eakins v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Western District of Tennessee. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RELATING CASE. (C12-1890 EMC). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/18/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 51 JOINT PROPOSED AGENDA by Certain Plaintiffs and Defendants in Advance of the May 24, 2012 Initial Case Management Conference filed by Lisa Clark, Felipe Garcia, Mark Laning, Israel Olivares, Clarissa Portals, Robert Spradley, James Douglas White. (Strange, Brian) (Filed on 5/17/2012) Modified on 5/18/2012 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE by Saima Mian, Jeffrey Pacilli, Marilyn Robledo, Amandeep Singh Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (Sianni, Ralph) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carrier IQ, Inc, HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation, Sprint Spectrum LP. Filed byAndy Kacmarcik. (Mather, Corey) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 16, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Tager for AT&T Mobility LLC (Tager, Evan) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher John Kelly (Kelly, Christopher) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Archis Ashok Parasharami for AT&T Mobility LLC (Parasharami, Archis) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Abbott Nicely for AT&T Mobility LLC (Nicely, Andrew) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 15, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/15/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 43 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Mark Rottschafer v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Northern District of Georgia. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 42 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Cerrone v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Eastern District of New York. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 41 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Duane Frisbie, et al v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Eastern District of New York. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 40 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Lisa Clark, et al v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Central District of California. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 39 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Janet Linder v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Central District of California. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 38 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Caryl Wolff, et al v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Central District of California. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Arthur Lapping (Lapping, Richard) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 36 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Actions Caprice Ieyoub v. Carrier IQ, Inc., etal and Richard Lucarelli v. Carrier IQ, Inc., etal from the Northern District of Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Lucarelli v. Carrier IQ) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 35 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Actions Mario Jackson v. Carrier IQ, Inc.,etal and Ashley L. Jones v. Carrier IQ, Inc., etal from the Northern District of Ohio. (Attachments: # 1 Jones v. Carrier IQ) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 34 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Vlad Twerskoi v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the District of Colorado. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 33 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Ryan McKeen v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the District of Connecticut. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 32 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Curtis Dubberly v. Carrier IQ, Inc., etal from the Southern District of Florida. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 31 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action William White, IV v. Carrier IQ, Inc., etal from the Middle District of Florida. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 30 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action David Yastrab v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Eastern District of New York. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 9, 2012 Filing 29 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of Action Jay Katz v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Eastern District of New York. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by MDL Panel Vacating Transfer Order as to Cindy Leong v. Carrier IQ Inc (C.D. California, C.A. No. 2:12-01562) and Carey Eckert v. Carrier IQ Inc (CD. California, C.A. No. 2:12-01564). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 27 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING CMC STATEMENT DUE DATE. JOINT CMC STATEMENT IS NOT REQUIRED. However, if counsel has suggestions as to any case management orders or additional agenda items, one should be filed by 5/17/12 - see pretrial order, paragraph 3, lines 20 and 21). CMC is set for 5/24/12 at 9:00 am. in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER vacating Hearing Date for Plaintiff Shively's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/4/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 25 Renotice motion hearing for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed byRodney Shively. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Service)(Levin, Jesse) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Maron, et al v. Carrier IQ, Inc. from the Southern District of New York. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Schlanger v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the District of New Jersey. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE ORDER RELATING CASES TO MDL ACTION (Re: 12-290 Rodney Shively v. Carrier IQ) re # 11 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Rodney Shively. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 *** DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY *** PRETRIAL ORDER Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/1/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified TEXT on 5/1/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/1/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 30, 2012 Filing 19 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Link v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the District of Rhode Island. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 Filing 18 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of Action Wilson v. Carrier IQ, Inc. from the Northern District of Illinois. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Erin Janek v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Northern District of Illinois. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Ferreira v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al and the Action Libby v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the District of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Clerk's Notice) (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Pacilli, et al v. Carrier IQ Inc., et al, from the District of Delaware. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Elliott, et al v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Eastern District of Missouri. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Schmidt, et al v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from from the Southern District of Florida. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 Filing 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by MDL Panel transferring actions to the Northern District of California. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 27, 2012 Filing 11 RESPONSE to re # 2 Order Relating Case To MDL Action by Rodney Shively. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Levin, Jesse) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 25, 2012 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Joseph Cosme v. Carrier IQ, Inc., et al from the Eastern District of Texas. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Justin Conley, et al v. Carrier IQ, Inc. from the Southern District of Illinois. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING CMC AND DEADLINES, Motions terminated: (19 in 3:11-cv-06160-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation for Continuance and (Proposed) Order filed by Carrier IQ, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING CMC AND RELATED DEADLINES re (18 in 3:11-cv-06151-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation for Continuance and (Proposed) Order filed by Carrier IQ, Inc, Motions terminated: (18 in 3:11-cv-06151-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation for Continuance and (Proposed) Order filed by Carrier IQ, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING CMC AND RELATED DEADLINES re (19 in 3:11-cv-05975-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation for Continuance and (Proposed) Order filed by Carrier IQ, Inc, Motions terminated: (19 in 3:11-cv-05975-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation for Continuance and (Proposed) Order filed by Carrier IQ, Inc, (12 in 3:11-cv-05975-EMC) MOTION to Relate Case.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING CMC AND RELATED DEADLINES re (17 in 3:11-cv-05842-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation for Continuance and (Proposed) Order filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re (39 in 3:11-cv-05821-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER VACATING CMC AND RELATED DEADLINES filed by Carrier IQ, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RELATING CASE (C11-6338 to 12-1449). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/23/12. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012) Modified on 4/23/2012 (bpfS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER RELATING CASES TO MDL CASE.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/23/12. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District of California creating MDL No. 3:12-md-2330 EMC. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Carrier IQ, Inc., Consumer Privacy Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accident Investigative Services, Inc.
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Gary Edward Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Allan
Represented By: Nicholas Diamand
Represented By: Eduardo Enrique Santacana
Represented By: Eduardo E. Santacana
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Bain
Represented By: David I. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Branson
Represented By: Allan Steyer
Represented By: Allan Howard Steyer
Represented By: Gabriel Dash Zeldin
Represented By: Hamilton P. Lindley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laureen Briggs
Represented By: David S Ratner
Represented By: Dale Bernardo Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Brooks
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Cassine
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Jason S Rathod
Represented By: Donna F Solen
Represented By: Jamie E. Weiss
Represented By: Jason Samual Rathod
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseanne Castro
Represented By: Ryan Mark Ferrell
Represented By: James Byron Hardin
Represented By: Scott J. Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Cerrone
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Represented By: Gary Edward Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Clark
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Represented By: Brian R Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Conley
Represented By: David I. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cosme
Represented By: Eric Davis Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Dodson
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Dubberly
Represented By: Jonathan Stephen Burns
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Eakins
Represented By: Curtis D. Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Elliott
Represented By: Eric Davis Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Fairfield
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Feitelson
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Feitelson
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan T Ferreira
Represented By: John T. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Fischer
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Fosson
Represented By: Daniel L. Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Fosson
Represented By: Daniel L. Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Frisbie
Represented By: David S Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Garcia
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Represented By: Brian R Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Gonzalez
Represented By: Ryan Mark Ferrell
Represented By: James Byron Hardin
Represented By: Scott J. Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hiles
Represented By: J. Paul Gignac
Represented By: Robert A. Curtis
Represented By: Peter J. Bezek
Represented By: Helen U Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Hobbs
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Regis House, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Meeker Harnett
Represented By: Jesse Bernard Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Howell
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Represented By: Joseph C Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caprice Ieyoub
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Represented By: Daniel H Charest
Represented By: Arthur M Murray
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray
Represented By: Korey Arthur Nelson
Represented By: Terrell W. Oxford
Represented By: Rebecca S Tinio
Represented By: Daniel Henry Charest
Represented By: Stephen Murray, Sr.
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Ivy-Perry
Represented By: David I. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Jackson
Represented By: John A. Peca, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick G. Warner
Represented By: D. Scott Kalish
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Janek
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Eric Davis Holland
Represented By: Christopher M Ellis
Represented By: Steven Lee Groves
Represented By: Shane M Mendenhall
Represented By: Steven J. Stolze
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley L. Jones
Represented By: John A. Peca, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick G. Warner
Represented By: Kip T. Bollin
Represented By: John R. Climaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Jones
Represented By: Paul Marett Brannon
Represented By: Eric J. O'Bell
Represented By: Paul Marett Brannon,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Kacmarcik
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Represented By: Blake Anthony Strautins
Represented By: David J Syrios
Represented By: Corey M Mather
Represented By: Blake Anthony Strautins,
Represented By: Guri Ademi
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Katz
Represented By: David I. Pankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Kenny
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kleer
Represented By: Christopher Collins
Represented By: Frank James Janecek, Jr.
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lammert
Represented By: Eric Davis Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Lancaster
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Laning
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Lavertue
Represented By: Nance Felice Becker
Represented By: Mark Andrew Chavez
Represented By: Gary Edward Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Lebryk
Represented By: David I. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Leinicke
Represented By: Eric Bluestein
Represented By: Andrew Mitchell Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leron Levy
Represented By: Eric Bluestein
Represented By: Andrew Mitchell Moss
Represented By: Randy Rosenblum
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Daniel Dennis Dolan, II
Represented By: Manuel Dobrinsky
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Lewis
Represented By: John R. Parker, Jr.
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Represented By: Jared Robinson Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Libby
Represented By: Gary E. Klein
Represented By: Gary Edward Klein
Represented By: Kevin Costello
Represented By: Shennan Alexandra Kavanagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannet Linder
Represented By: Christopher Collins
Represented By: Frank James Janecek, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa J. Link
Represented By: Peter Wasylyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lucarelli
Represented By: David M Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Maron
Represented By: David S Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Massey
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa McClaskey
Represented By: Eric Bluestein
Represented By: Andrew Mitchell Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan McKeen
Represented By: Gary Edward Klein
Represented By: Peter M. Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Medine
Represented By: Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: Marc Ian Gross
Represented By: Matthew Laurence Tuccillo
Represented By: Jason S. Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayley Medrano
Represented By: Eric Bluestein
Represented By: Andrew Mitchell Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saima Mian
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerimiah Thomas Moree
Represented By: Eric Davis Holland
Represented By: Steven Lee Groves
Represented By: Steven J. Stolze
Represented By: Burton Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Naudus
Represented By: David S Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Neal
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Olivares
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Pacilli
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Padilla
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Heather Baker Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Patrick
Represented By: Reginald Von Terrell
Represented By: Sydney J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Sue Patrick
Represented By: John R. Parker, Jr.
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Represented By: Jared Robinson Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dao Phong
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Danielle A Stoumbos
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: Mark Punzalan
Represented By: Danielle A. Stoumbos
Represented By: Gordon M. Fauth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezer Pilowsky
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Heather Baker Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Pipkin
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Thomas Kay Boardman
Represented By: William James Newsom
Represented By: Clifford H. Pearson
Represented By: Bobby Pouya
Represented By: Robert George Retana
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon
Represented By: Daniel L. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarissa Portals
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Roberts
Represented By: Brett Louis Rosenthal
Represented By: Peter J. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Robledo
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Rosenburg
Represented By: Eric Davis Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rosenfeld
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rottschafer
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Eric Davis Holland
Represented By: Christopher M Ellis
Represented By: Steven Lee Groves
Represented By: Shane M Mendenhall
Represented By: Steven J. Stolze
Represented By: Scott L. Keniley
Represented By: Jon D. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Sanders
Represented By: Mark G. Crawford
Represented By: Andrea S. Hirsch
Represented By: Steven James Skikos
Represented By: Christopher V. Tisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Sandstrom
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sarafian
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Schlanger
Represented By: Michael M. Weinkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Schmidt
Represented By: Eric Bluestein
Represented By: Andrew Mitchell Moss
Represented By: Randy Rosenblum
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Daniel Dennis Dolan, II
Represented By: Manuel Dobrinsky
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Schwartz
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vishal Shah
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Jason S Rathod
Represented By: Donna F Solen
Represented By: Jamie E. Weiss
Represented By: Jason Samual Rathod
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Sharp
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Shively
Represented By: Melissa Meeker Harnett
Represented By: Jesse Bernard Levin
Represented By: Gregory B Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Shumate
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Siegel
Represented By: Larry Daniel Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowena Silvera
Represented By: Mark G. Crawford
Represented By: Andrea S. Hirsch
Represented By: Steven James Skikos
Represented By: Christopher V. Tisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amandeep Singh
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: David A. Straite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Slater
Represented By: David S Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Slaughter
Represented By: David S Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Spradley
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Represented By: Brian R Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Steiner
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Stoltenbury
Represented By: Daniel Lee Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Swafford
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Szulczewski
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Thomas
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Thornton
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Tishenkel
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilya Torchinsky
Represented By: Eric Bluestein
Represented By: Andrew Mitchell Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vlad Twerskoi
Represented By: Eric Davis Holland
Represented By: Richard Joseph Arsenault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Ulrich
Represented By: Thomas Kay Boardman
Represented By: William James Newsom
Represented By: Clifford H. Pearson
Represented By: Bobby Pouya
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon
Represented By: Daniel L. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yonatan Wadler
Represented By: Paul O. Paradis
Represented By: Jay P. Salzman
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Watts
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Heather Baker Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Westenberger
Represented By: Daniel Lee Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Douglas White
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William White, IV
Represented By: Andrew F. Knopf
Represented By: C. Richard Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Williams
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Wilson
Represented By: Judy L. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Wirth
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caryl Wolff
Represented By: Daniel L. Germain
Represented By: Timothy G. Blood
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Represented By: Brian Gudmundson
Represented By: Paula Michelle Roach
Represented By: Paula R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Woods
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Yastrab
Represented By: Bernard Daskal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Zemartis
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Christopher John Kelly
Represented By: Archis Ashok Parasharami
Represented By: Evan Tager
Represented By: Andrew A Nicely
Represented By: Andrew A Nicely,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier IQ, Inc
Represented By: Tyler Alexander Baker
Represented By: Christopher E. Carey
Represented By: James Christie
Represented By: Jennifer J Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Jane Johnson
Represented By: Molly Roberta Melcher
Represented By: Tyler Griffin Newby
Represented By: Eugene J. Podesta, Jr.
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Edward P. Gibbons
Represented By: Neil E. Holmen
Represented By: Ryan Jason Rodman
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Alexander
Represented By: Ellen D. Bailey
Represented By: Jennifer Amy Baker
Represented By: Albert G. Bixler
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Bryan H. Heckenlively
Represented By: Catherine A. Miller
Represented By: Ross Eric Morrison
Represented By: Sean F. O'Shea
Represented By: Rosemarie Theresa Ring, Esq.
Represented By: Rosemarie T Ring
Represented By: Warren L. Soffian
Represented By: J. Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Rosemarie Theresa Ring
Represented By: Henry Weissman
Represented By: Jonathan Hugh Blavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Device USA, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine RH Gasztonyi
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Ian Ballon
Represented By: Lori Chang
Represented By: Rebekah Susanne Strawn Guyon
Represented By: Jeff Eric Scott
Represented By: James Donato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Lowden
Represented By: Eric Bluestein
Represented By: Andrew Mitchell Moss
Represented By: Randy Rosenblum
Represented By: Ralph N. Sianni
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Daniel Dennis Dolan, II
Represented By: Manuel Dobrinsky
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Norman Kenneth Beck
Represented By: Krista M. Enns
Represented By: Peter Charles McCabe, III
Represented By: Richard A. Lapping
Represented By: Scott Tadashi Sakiyama
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Letkewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pantech Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Oluwaseun O. Ajayi
Represented By: Wilson W Lin
Represented By: Wayne Michael Helge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Eugene J. Podesta, Jr.
Represented By: Shouying Sheryl Leung
Represented By: Lance Allan Etcheverry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd
Represented By: Shouying Sheryl Leung
Represented By: Lance Allan Etcheverry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene J. Podesta, Jr.
Represented By: Shouying Sheryl Leung
Represented By: Kerry Sachiko Kumabe
Represented By: R. Patrick Vance
Represented By: Lance Allan Etcheverry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Represented By: Eugene J. Podesta, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda J Beane
Represented By: Kevan A. Fornasero
Represented By: Timothy L. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel
Represented By: Eugene J. Podesta, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda J Beane
Represented By: Kevan A. Fornasero
Represented By: Timothy L. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Spectrum LP
Represented By: Amanda J Beane
Represented By: Kevan A. Fornasero
Represented By: Timothy L. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.
Represented By: Sam Andrew Miorelli
Search News [ Google News |