Bea et al v. Encompass Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carlos Bea and Louise Bea
Defendant: Encompass Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00008
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting Motion to Remand by Judge Justin L. Quackenbush (Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 7 granted in part and denied in part; granted to the extent that the matter is remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Francisco; denied as to the request for fees and costs) (jlqja, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re Reassignment and Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Justin L. Quackenbush on 03/27/2013. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Encompass Insurance Company Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bea et al v. Encompass Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffry Butler
Represented By: Michelle Anne Bradley
Represented By: Cynthia Louise Mellema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Bea
Represented By: Kelly M. Mannion
Represented By: Edward Gerard Mannion
Represented By: Wesley Martin Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Bea
Represented By: Kelly M. Mannion
Represented By: Edward Gerard Mannion
Represented By: Wesley Martin Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?